Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Florida Pinellas Court System on 02/11/2021 at 23:21:53 (UTC).

PETERBOROUGH APARTMENTS Vs. GLENDA AVERY

Case Summary

On 09/27/2019 PETERBOROUGH APARTMENTS filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against GLENDA AVERY. This case was filed in Florida Pinellas Court System, St. Petersburg Branch Office - County located in Pinellas, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is JAGGER, EDWIN. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********4-CO

  • Filing Date:

    09/27/2019

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Court:

    Florida Pinellas Court System

  • Courthouse:

    St. Petersburg Branch Office - County

  • County, State:

    Pinellas, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

JAGGER, EDWIN

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

PETERBOROUGH APARTMENTS

5300 W Cypress Street Suite 200

Tampa, FL 33607

Defendant

AVERY, GLENDA

St Petersburg, FL 33701

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

JASON M LUCAS

Attorney at THE LUCAS LAW FIRM PA

17833 Murdock Circle Suite B

Port Charlotte, FL 33948

 

Court Documents

WRIT OF POSSESSION

12/23/2019: WRIT OF POSSESSION

WRIT OF POSSESSION

01/03/2020: WRIT OF POSSESSION

ATTORNEY COVER LETTER

10/18/2019: ATTORNEY COVER LETTER

FINAL JUDGMENT- COUNT 1 POSSESSION

10/18/2019: FINAL JUDGMENT- COUNT 1 POSSESSION

MOTION FOR FINAL JUDGMENT

10/14/2019: MOTION FOR FINAL JUDGMENT

MOTION FOR DEFAULT

10/15/2019: DEFAULT ENTERED

CERT OF MAILING - CO

CERT OF MAILING - CO

AFFIDAVIT-SERVICE OF PROCESS

10/02/2019: AFFIDAVIT-SERVICE OF PROCESS

AFFIDAVIT AS TO MILITARY SERVICE

10/02/2019: AFFIDAVIT AS TO MILITARY SERVICE

SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

09/27/2019: SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

COMPLAINT

09/27/2019: COMPLAINT

CIVIL COVER SHEET - E-FILED

09/27/2019: CIVIL COVER SHEET - E-FILED

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/03/2020
  • DocketWRIT OF POSSESSION; Doc # 14; RETD EXECUTED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2019
  • DocketWRIT OF POSSESSION; Doc # 13; ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2019
  • DocketDEFAULT JUDGMENT (SRS DISPO); Doc # 10

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2019
  • DocketFINAL JUDGMENT- COUNT 1 POSSESSION; Doc # 11; Vol./Book 20741, Page 1410, 1 pages

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2019
  • DocketATTORNEY COVER LETTER; Doc # 12

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2019
  • DocketDEFAULT ENTERED; Doc # 9; Party: AVERY, GLENDA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2019
  • DocketMOTION FOR FINAL JUDGMENT; Doc # 7; Party: PETERBOROUGH APARTMENTS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2019
  • DocketMOTION FOR DEFAULT; Doc # 8; ENTERED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2019
  • DocketCERTIFICATE OF MAILING; Doc # 6; Party: AVERY, GLENDA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2019
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT AS TO MILITARY SERVICE; Doc # 4; NONMILITARY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2019
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT-SERVICE OF PROCESS; Doc # 5; POSTED 100219; Party: AVERY, GLENDA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2019
  • FinancialPLAINTIFF; PETERBOROUGH APARTMENTS; Total Financial Assessment; 195.00; Total Payments and Credits; 195.00; Balance Due 0.00; E-FILE PAYMENT; Receipt # EF-2019-36998; PETERBOROUGH APARTMENTS; (195.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2019
  • FinancialPLAINTIFF; PETERBOROUGH APARTMENTS; Total Financial Assessment; 195.00; Total Payments and Credits; 195.00; Balance Due 0.00; Transaction Assessment; 195.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2019
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET - E-FILED; Doc # 1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2019
  • DocketCOMPLAINT; Doc # 2; WITH ATTACHMENTS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2019
  • DocketSUMMONS TO BE ISSUED; Doc # 3; ISSUED; Party: AVERY, GLENDA

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer LUCAS, JASON