This case was last updated from Florida Pinellas Court System on 02/04/2020 at 08:06:53 (UTC).

PAUL RAND Vs. RACHEL HARRINGTON CAMPBELL

Case Summary

On 12/06/2019 PAUL RAND filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against RACHEL HARRINGTON CAMPBELL. This case was filed in Florida Pinellas Court System, St. Petersburg Branch Office - Circuit located in Pinellas, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is MINKOFF, THOMAS H. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********7-CI

  • Filing Date:

    12/06/2019

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    Florida Pinellas Court System

  • Courthouse:

    St. Petersburg Branch Office - Circuit

  • County, State:

    Pinellas, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

MINKOFF, THOMAS H

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

RAND, PAUL

St. Petersburg, FL 33713

Defendant

HARRINGTON CAMPBELL, RACHEL

Pinellas Park, FL 33781

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

JEROME B BLEVINS, ESQ

Attorney at BRADHAM BENSON LINDLEY

4141 Central Ave

St Petersburg, FL 33713

Defendant Attorney

KYLE W MAXSON

Attorney at MARTINEZ DENBO LLC

2935 First Ave N 2Nd Fl

St Petersburg, FL 33713

 

Court Documents

AFFIDAVIT-SERVICE OF PROCESS

12/23/2019: AFFIDAVIT-SERVICE OF PROCESS

CIVIL COVER SHEET

12/06/2019: CIVIL COVER SHEET

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

01/08/2020: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

ANSWER-AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES OF

01/08/2020: ANSWER-AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES OF

REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

01/08/2020: REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

12/06/2019: SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (SUBSEQUENT PLEADINGS)

12/09/2019: SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (SUBSEQUENT PLEADINGS)

COMPLAINT

12/06/2019: COMPLAINT

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/08/2020
  • DocketANSWER-AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES OF; Doc # 6; Party: HARRINGTON CAMPBELL, RACHEL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2020
  • DocketREQUEST FOR PRODUCTION; Doc # 7

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2020
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES; Doc # 8

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2019
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT-SERVICE OF PROCESS; Doc # 5; 121719; Party: HARRINGTON CAMPBELL, RACHEL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2019
  • DocketSUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (SUBSEQUENT PLEADINGS); Doc # 4; ISSUED; Party: HARRINGTON CAMPBELL, RACHEL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • FinancialPLAINTIFF; RAND, PAUL; Total Financial Assessment; 410.00; Total Payments and Credits; 410.00; Balance Due 0.00; E-FILE PAYMENT; Receipt # EF-2019-46058; RAND, PAUL; (410.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • FinancialPLAINTIFF; RAND, PAUL; Total Financial Assessment; 410.00; Total Payments and Credits; 410.00; Balance Due 0.00; Transaction Assessment; 410.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET; Doc # 1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • DocketCOMPLAINT; Doc # 2

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • DocketSUMMONS TO BE ISSUED; Doc # 3; NOT ISSUED - DEFT NAME DOES NOT MATCH THE COMPLAINT; Party: HARRINGTON CAMPBELL, RACHEL

    Read MoreRead Less