Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Florida Pinellas Court System on 05/23/2021 at 20:03:35 (UTC).

PATRICIA PASQUINI Vs. UNIVERSAL PROPERTY AND CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY

Case Summary

On 02/22/2021 PATRICIA PASQUINI filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against UNIVERSAL PROPERTY AND CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY. This case was filed in Florida Pinellas Court System, Clearwater Branch Office - Circuit located in Pinellas, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is MEYER, KEITH. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********9-CI

  • Filing Date:

    02/22/2021

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Florida Pinellas Court System

  • Courthouse:

    Clearwater Branch Office - Circuit

  • County, State:

    Pinellas, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

MEYER, KEITH

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

PASQUINI, PATRICIA

Safety Harbor, FL 34695

Defendant

UNIVERSAL PROPERTY AND CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY

1110 W Commercial Blvd

Fort Lauderdale, FL 33309

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

JAMES S CONSTABLE, ESQ

Attorney at CONSTABLE LAW PA

139 Sixth Ave South

Safety Harbor, FL 34695-3901

Defendant Attorneys

CHELSEY A POLGAR

Attorney at GROELLE AND SALMON PA

1715 N Westsore Blvd Suite 320

Tampa, FL 33607

J CORY WILKINSON, ESQ

Attorney at GROELLE & SALMON P A

646 - 94Th Ave N

St Petersburg, FL 33702

CHELSEY A POLGAR, ESQ

Attorney at GROELLE AND SALMON P A

1715 N Westsore Blvd Ste 320

Tampa, FL 33607

 

Court Documents

DEF-RESP'S MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME

03/26/2021: DEF-RESP'S MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

03/18/2021: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

ANSWER, AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES, DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

04/01/2021: ANSWER, AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES, DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

SUMMONS - ISSUED

02/22/2021: SUMMONS - ISSUED

NOTICE OF COMPLIANCE

02/22/2021: NOTICE OF COMPLIANCE

COMPLAINT E-FILED

02/22/2021: COMPLAINT E-FILED

CIVIL COVER SHEET - E-FILED

02/22/2021: CIVIL COVER SHEET - E-FILED

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/01/2021
  • DocketANSWER, AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES, DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL; Doc # 7; Party: UNIVERSAL PROPERTY AND CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2021
  • DocketDEF-RESP'S MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME; Doc # 6; TO RESPOND TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE; Doc # 5; /DESIGNATION OF E-MAIL ADDRESS(ES); Party: UNIVERSAL PROPERTY AND CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2021
  • FinancialPLAINTIFF; PASQUINI, PATRICIA; Total Financial Assessment; 410.00; Total Payments and Credits; 410.00; Balance Due 0.00; E-FILE PAYMENT; Receipt # EF-2021-06880; PASQUINI, PATRICIA; (410.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2021
  • FinancialPLAINTIFF; PASQUINI, PATRICIA; Total Financial Assessment; 410.00; Total Payments and Credits; 410.00; Balance Due 0.00; Transaction Assessment; 410.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2021
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET - E-FILED; Doc # 1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2021
  • DocketCOMPLAINT E-FILED; Doc # 2

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF COMPLIANCE; Doc # 3; AND DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2021
  • DocketSUMMONS - ISSUED; Doc # 4; ISSUED; Party: UNIVERSAL PROPERTY AND CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Universal Property & Casualty Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer WILKINSON , JAMES CORY