This case was last updated from Pinellas County 6th Judicial Circuit Courts on 01/21/2023 at 06:31:27 (UTC).

PATRICIA MARCADIS Vs. CITY OF CLEARWATER, et al

Case Summary

On 11/14/2022 PATRICIA MARCADIS filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against CITY OF CLEARWATER,. This case was filed in Pinellas County 6th Judicial Circuit Courts, St. Petersburg Branch Office - Circuit located in Pinellas, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is NEWTON, CYNTHIA J. The case status is Not Classified By Court.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********2-CI

  • Filing Date:

    11/14/2022

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Pinellas, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

NEWTON, CYNTHIA J

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MARCADIS, PATRICIA

Clearwater, FL 33767

Defendants

CITY OF CLEARWATER A MUNICIPALITY

Clearwater, FL 33755

WHITLEY, DARRELL E, INDIVIDUALLY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MICHAEL L JONES

Attorney at MICHAEL L JONES PA

3134 North Boulevard

Tampa, FL 33603

Defendant Attorney

MICHAEL P FUINO, ESQ

Attorney at ASSISTANT CITY ATTORNEY

4748

Clearwater, FL 33758

 

Court Documents

CIVIL COVER SHEET - E-FILED

11/14/2022: CIVIL COVER SHEET - E-FILED

COMPLAINT WITH DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

11/14/2022: COMPLAINT WITH DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

SUMMONS - ISSUED

11/14/2022: SUMMONS - ISSUED

SUMMONS - SERVED

11/18/2022: SUMMONS - SERVED

AMENDED COMPLAINT

11/16/2022: AMENDED COMPLAINT

AMENDED COMPLAINT

11/17/2022: AMENDED COMPLAINT

ORDER

01/12/2023: ORDER

DESIGNATION OF E-MAIL ADDRESS(ES)

12/15/2022: DESIGNATION OF E-MAIL ADDRESS(ES)

MOTION TO DISMISS

12/15/2022: MOTION TO DISMISS

REQ COURT TO CONSIDER MTN - WRITTEN SUBMISSIONS WITHOUT HRG

12/15/2022: REQ COURT TO CONSIDER MTN - WRITTEN SUBMISSIONS WITHOUT HRG

RESPONSE

12/30/2022: RESPONSE

NOTICE OF UNAVAILABILITY

01/03/2023: NOTICE OF UNAVAILABILITY

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/12/2023
  • DocketORDER; Doc # 14; ON MOTION TO DISMISS COUNTS 2 AND 4 GRANTED 10 DAYS TO AMEND

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/03/2023
  • DocketNOTICE OF UNAVAILABILITY; Doc # 13

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/30/2022
  • DocketRESPONSE; Doc # 12; TO DEFENDANT, CITY OF CLEARWATER, MOTION TO DISMISS COUNTS II AND IV OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE, MOTION FOR MORE DEFINITE STATEMENT AS TO COUNT IV

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/15/2022
  • DocketDESIGNATION OF E-MAIL ADDRESS(ES); Doc # 9

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/15/2022
  • DocketMOTION TO DISMISS; Doc # 10; COUNTS II AND IV OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE, MOTION FOR MORE DEFINITIVE STATEMENT AS TO COUNT IV; Party:; CITY OF CLEARWATER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/15/2022
  • DocketREQ COURT TO CONSIDER MTN - WRITTEN SUBMISSIONS WITHOUT HRG; Doc # 11

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/18/2022
  • DocketSUMMONS - SERVED; Doc # 8; 11162022; Party:; CITY OF CLEARWATER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/17/2022
  • DocketDEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL Doc # 6

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/17/2022
  • DocketAMENDED COMPLAINT; Doc # 7

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/16/2022
  • DocketAMENDED COMPLAINT; Doc # 5

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/14/2022
  • FinancialPLAINTIFF; MARCADIS, PATRICIA; Total Financial Assessment; 420.00; Total Payments and Credits; 420.00; Balance Due 0.00; E-FILE PAYMENT; Receipt # EF-2022-41139; MARCADIS, PATRICIA; (420.00)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/14/2022
  • FinancialPLAINTIFF; MARCADIS, PATRICIA; Total Financial Assessment; 420.00; Total Payments and Credits; 420.00; Balance Due 0.00; Transaction Assessment; 420.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/14/2022
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET - E-FILED; Doc # 1

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/14/2022
  • DocketCOMPLAINT WITH DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL; Doc # 2

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/14/2022
  • DocketSUMMONS - ISSUED; Doc # 3; Party:; CITY OF CLEARWATER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer FUINO, MICHAEL