Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Florida Pinellas Court System on 05/21/2021 at 06:03:39 (UTC).

PAM TALLON Vs. MAGGE BARBER

Case Summary

On 05/07/2021 PAM TALLON filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against MAGGE BARBER. This case was filed in Florida Pinellas Court System, Clearwater Historic Courthouse - County located in Pinellas, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is McNARY, MYRA SCOTT. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********9-CO

  • Filing Date:

    05/07/2021

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Florida Pinellas Court System

  • Courthouse:

    Clearwater Historic Courthouse - County

  • County, State:

    Pinellas, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

McNARY, MYRA SCOTT

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

TALLON, PAM

Clearwater, FL 33755

Defendants

BARBER, MAGGE

Clearwater, FL 33755

BARBER, MAGGE DOING BUSINESS AS THOSE TWO GIRLS ESTATE SALES

Clearwater, FL 33755

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

THEO J KARAPHILLIS, ESQ

Attorney at LAW OFFICE OF THEO J KARAPHILLIS PLLC

P O Box 578

Tarpon Springs, FL 34688

 

Court Documents

SUMMONS - SERVED

05/14/2021: SUMMONS - SERVED

COMPLAINT

05/08/2021: COMPLAINT

SUMMONS - ISSUED

05/12/2021: SUMMONS - ISSUED

SUMMONS NOT ISSUED

05/07/2021: SUMMONS NOT ISSUED

DESIGNATION OF E-MAIL ADDRESS(ES)

05/07/2021: DESIGNATION OF E-MAIL ADDRESS(ES)

COMPLAINT

05/07/2021: COMPLAINT

CIVIL COVER SHEET - E-FILED

05/07/2021: CIVIL COVER SHEET - E-FILED

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/14/2021
  • FinancialPLAINTIFF; TALLON, PAM; Total Financial Assessment; 420.00; Total Payments and Credits; 420.00; Balance Due 0.00; Counter Payment; Receipt # CV-2021-11910; TALLON, PAM; (10.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2021
  • DocketSUMMONS - SERVED; Doc # 7; 05142021; Party: BARBER, MAGGE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2021
  • FinancialPLAINTIFF; TALLON, PAM; Total Financial Assessment; 420.00; Total Payments and Credits; 420.00; Balance Due 0.00; Transaction Assessment; 10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2021
  • DocketSUMMONS - ISSUED; Doc # 6; Party: BARBER, MAGGE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/08/2021
  • DocketCOMPLAINT; Doc # 5; (DUPLICATE)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2021
  • FinancialPLAINTIFF; TALLON, PAM; Total Financial Assessment; 420.00; Total Payments and Credits; 420.00; Balance Due 0.00; E-FILE PAYMENT; Receipt # EF-2021-18183; TALLON, PAM; (410.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2021
  • FinancialPLAINTIFF; TALLON, PAM; Total Financial Assessment; 420.00; Total Payments and Credits; 420.00; Balance Due 0.00; Transaction Assessment; 410.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2021
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET - E-FILED; Doc # 1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2021
  • DocketCOMPLAINT; Doc # 2

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2021
  • DocketDESIGNATION OF E-MAIL ADDRESS(ES); Doc # 3

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2021
  • DocketSUMMONS NOT ISSUED; Doc # 4; NAME WITH SUMMONS MUST MATCH COMPLAINT -MISSING D/B/A NAME; Party: BARBER, MAGGE

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer THEO J KARAPHILLIS, ESQ