This case was last updated from Florida Pinellas Court System on 08/06/2021 at 07:22:47 (UTC).

PAIN AND SUPPORTIVE CARE PA, DOING BUSINESS AS ASPIRE PAIN RELIEF INSTITUTE, AS ASSIGNEE OF- FOR AKM MIJAN Vs. GEICO GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY

Case Summary

On 07/16/2021 PAIN AND SUPPORTIVE CARE PA, DOING BUSINESS AS ASPIRE PAIN RELIEF INSTITUTE, AS ASSIGNEE OF- FOR AKM MIJAN filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against GEICO GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY. This case was filed in Florida Pinellas Court System, Clearwater Historic Courthouse - County located in Pinellas, Florida. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********3-SC

  • Filing Date:

    07/16/2021

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Courthouse:

    Clearwater Historic Courthouse - County

  • County, State:

    Pinellas, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

PAIN AND SUPPORTIVE CARE PA

3900 Military Trail Suite 600

Jupiter, FL 33458

PAIN AND SUPPORTIVE CARE PA DOING BUSINESS AS ASPIRE PAIN RELIEF INSTITUTE AS ASSIGNEE OF- FOR MIJAN, AKM

3900 Military Trail Suite 600

Jupiter, FL 33458

Defendant

GEICO GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY

C/O Fl Chief Financial Officer As Ra P O Box 6200

Tallahassee, FL 32314

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

LINDSAY KARTEN, ESQ

Attorney at KELLER MELCHIORRE & WALSH PLLC

3900 Military Trail Ste 600

Jupiter, FL 33458

 

Court Documents

NOTICE TO APPEAR - SERVED

07/26/2021: NOTICE TO APPEAR - SERVED

CIV_CLK_Notices_SCZoom329067059

07/20/2021: SMALL CLAIMS PRE-TRIAL NOTICE

STATEMENT OF CLAIM

07/16/2021: STATEMENT OF CLAIM

CIVIL COVER SHEET - E-FILED

07/16/2021: CIVIL COVER SHEET - E-FILED

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/11/2021
  • DocketSMALL CLAIMS PRE-TRIAL; (3:30 PM) (Judicial Officer SMALL CLAIMS JUDGE, SOUTH)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2021
  • DocketNOTICE TO APPEAR - SERVED; Doc # 3; W/ATTACHED NOTICE OF FILING; Party: GEICO GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2021
  • FinancialPLAINTIFF; PAIN AND SUPPORTIVE CARE PA; Total Financial Assessment; 185.00; Total Payments and Credits; 185.00; Balance Due 0.00; E-FILE PAYMENT; Receipt # EF-2021-28026; PAIN AND SUPPORTIVE CARE PA; (185.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2021
  • FinancialPLAINTIFF; PAIN AND SUPPORTIVE CARE PA; Total Financial Assessment; 185.00; Total Payments and Credits; 185.00; Balance Due 0.00; Transaction Assessment; 185.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2021
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET - E-FILED; Doc # 1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2021
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF CLAIM; Doc # 2; WITH ATTACHMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where PAIN AND SUPPORTIVE CARE PA DOING BUSINESS AS ASPIRE PAIN RELIEF INSTITUTE AS ASSIGNEE OF- FOR HUGGINS, DUANTAE is a litigant

Latest cases where GEICO GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer KARTEN , LINDSAY