This case was last updated from Florida Pinellas Court System on 03/30/2019 at 08:08:48 (UTC).

PACIFICA MANDALAY LLC Vs. WILLIE DYER, et al

Case Summary

On 01/29/2019 PACIFICA MANDALAY LLC filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against WILLIE DYER. This case was filed in Florida Pinellas Court System, Clearwater Historic Courthouse - County located in Pinellas, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is McNARY, MYRA SCOTT. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0-CO

  • Filing Date:

    01/29/2019

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Court:

    Florida Pinellas Court System

  • Courthouse:

    Clearwater Historic Courthouse - County

  • County, State:

    Pinellas, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

McNARY, MYRA SCOTT

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

PACIFICA MANDALAY LLC

11901 4Th Street N.

St. Petersburg, FL 33716

PACIFICA MANDALAY LLC A LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

11901 4Th Street N.

St. Petersburg, FL 33716

Defendants

DYER, WILLIE

St. Petersburg, FL 33716

DYER, HYACINTH

St. Petersburg, FL 33716

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MICHAEL GEORGE F DAVIS

Attorney at MGFD LAW FIRM PA

2753 State Road 580 Suite 209

Clearwater, FL 33761

 

Court Documents

WRIT OF POSSESSION

03/05/2019: WRIT OF POSSESSION

DEFAULT ENTERED BY COURT

03/04/2019: DEFAULT ENTERED BY COURT

PLTF-PET'S MOTION FOR COURT DEFAULT

02/19/2019: PLTF-PET'S MOTION FOR COURT DEFAULT

FINAL DISPOSITION FORM

02/19/2019: FINAL DISPOSITION FORM

SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED-POSTED

02/19/2019: SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED-POSTED

SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED-POSTED

02/19/2019: SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED-POSTED

MOTION

02/19/2019: MOTION

VERIFICATION. OF CLAIM AND NON-MILITARY SERVICE

02/19/2019: VERIFICATION. OF CLAIM AND NON-MILITARY SERVICE

ANSWER

02/13/2019: ANSWER

WRIT OF POSSESSION

03/18/2019: WRIT OF POSSESSION

CERT OF MAILING - TENANT EVICTION

02/06/2019: CERTIFICATE OF MAILING

CERT OF MAILING - TENANT EVICTION

02/06/2019: CERTIFICATE OF MAILING

SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

02/04/2019: SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

CERTIFICATE

01/29/2019: CERTIFICATE

CIVIL COVER SHEET - E-FILED

01/29/2019: CIVIL COVER SHEET - E-FILED

THREE DAY NOTICE

01/29/2019: THREE DAY NOTICE

LEASE

01/29/2019: LEASE

COMPLAINT

01/29/2019: COMPLAINT

12 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/18/2019
  • WRIT OF POSSESSION; Doc # 28; RETD EXECUTED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2019
  • WRIT OF POSSESSION; Doc # 27; ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2019
  • DEFAULT ENTERED BY COURT; Doc # 21; Party: DYER, HYACINTH; Party: DYER, WILLIE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2019
  • ORDER; Doc # 22; TO RELEASE FUNDS ON DEPOSIT IN COURT REGISTRY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2019
  • ATTORNEY COVER LETTER; Doc # 23

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2019
  • ORDER DENYING; Doc # 24; DEFTS MOTION TO DETERMINE RENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2019
  • DEFAULT JUDGMENT (SRS DISPO); Doc # 25

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2019
  • FINAL JUDGMENT- COUNT 1 POSSESSION; Doc # 26; IN FAVOR OF PLTF; Vol./Book 20454, Page 248, 1 pages

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2019
  • Court Registry - Delnt. Ten. Deposit $; Doc # 20; $1050.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2019
  • VERIFICATION. OF CLAIM AND NON-MILITARY SERVICE; Doc # 14

    Read MoreRead Less
11 More Docket Entries
  • 02/04/2019
  • SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED; Doc # 7; ISSUED; Party: DYER, HYACINTH

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2019
  • COMPLAINT; Doc # 1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2019
  • LEASE; Doc # 2

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2019
  • THREE DAY NOTICE; Doc # 3

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2019
  • CIVIL COVER SHEET - E-FILED; Doc # 4

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2019
  • CERTIFICATE OF MAILING; Doc # 5; NOT SIGNED - MAIL IN OR BRING TO COUNTER; Party: DYER, HYACINTH; Party: DYER, WILLIE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2019
  • PLAINTIFF; PACIFICA MANDALAY LLC; Total Financial Assessment; 225.00; Total Payments and Credits; 225.00; Balance Due 0.00; Counter Payment; Receipt # CV-2019-03325; PACIFICA MANDALAY LLC; (20.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2019
  • PLAINTIFF; PACIFICA MANDALAY LLC; Total Financial Assessment; 225.00; Total Payments and Credits; 225.00; Balance Due 0.00; Transaction Assessment; 20.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2019
  • PLAINTIFF; PACIFICA MANDALAY LLC; Total Financial Assessment; 225.00; Total Payments and Credits; 225.00; Balance Due 0.00; E-FILE PAYMENT; Receipt # EF-2019-04039; PACIFICA MANDALAY LLC; (205.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2019
  • PLAINTIFF; PACIFICA MANDALAY LLC; Total Financial Assessment; 225.00; Total Payments and Credits; 225.00; Balance Due 0.00; Transaction Assessment; 205.00

    Read MoreRead Less