This case was last updated from Florida Pinellas Court System on 12/19/2020 at 17:45:16 (UTC).

ODH INTERNATIONAL INC Vs. SCOTTSDALE INSURANCE COMPANY

Case Summary

On 06/19/2020 ODH INTERNATIONAL INC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against SCOTTSDALE INSURANCE COMPANY. This case was filed in Florida Pinellas Court System, St. Petersburg Branch Office - Circuit located in Pinellas, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is ALLAN, LINDA R. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0-CI

  • Filing Date:

    06/19/2020

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Pinellas, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

ALLAN, LINDA R

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ODH INTERNATIONAL INC A FLORIDA CORPORATION DOING BUSINESS AS MADFISH

7905 Seminole Blvd.

Seminole, FL 33772

Defendant

SCOTTSDALE INSURANCE COMPANY A ARIZONA CORPORATION

8877 North Gainey Drive

Scottsdale, AZ 85258

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

JAVIER A LOPEZ, ESQ

Attorney at KOZYAK TROPIN & THROCKMORTON LLP

2525 Ponce De Leon Blvd 9Th Floor

Coral Gables, FL 33134

HARLEY S TROPIN, ESQ

Attorney at KOZYAK TROPIN & THROCKMORTON LLP

2525 Ponce De Leon Blvd 9Th Flr

Coral Gables, FL 33134

GAIL A MCQUILKIN, ESQ

Attorney at KOZYAK TROPIN & THROCKMORTON LLP

2525 Ponce De Leon Blvd 9Th Flr

Coral Gables, FL 33134

FRANK A FLORIO, ESQ

Attorney at KOZYAK TROPIN & THROCKMORTON LLP

2525 Ponce De Leon Blvd 9Th Flr

Coral Gables, FL 33134

BENJAMIN J WIDLANSKI, ESQ

Attorney at KOZYAK TROPIN & THROCKMORTON LLP

2525 Ponce De Leon Blvd 9Th Flr

Coral Gables, FL 33134

Defendant Attorney

THOMAS A KELLER, ESQ

Attorney at BUTLER WEIHMULLER KATZ

400 N Ashley Dr Ste 2300

Tampa, FL 33602

 

Court Documents

CERTIFICATE

07/28/2020: CERTIFICATE

NOTICE

07/28/2020: NOTICE

NOTICE-SERVICE-PROCESS INS COMM

07/17/2020: NOTICE-SERVICE-PROCESS INS COMM

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

07/13/2020: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

07/28/2020: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

06/22/2020: SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

06/19/2020: SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

COMPLAINT

06/19/2020: COMPLAINT

CIVIL COVER SHEET - E-FILED

06/19/2020: CIVIL COVER SHEET - E-FILED

SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

06/22/2020: SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/28/2020
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE; Doc # 7; Party: SCOTTSDALE INSURANCE COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2020
  • DocketCASE CLOSED (SRS); Doc # 8

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2020
  • DocketNOTICE; Doc # 9; OF REMOVAL TO OPPOSING COUNSEL, TO MIDDLE DISTRICT COURT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2020
  • DocketCERTIFICATE; Doc # 10; AND NOTICE OF FILING NOTICE OF REMOVAL TO MIDDLE DISTRICT COURT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2020
  • DocketNOTICE-SERVICE-PROCESS INS COMM; Doc # 6; 07082020 SCOTTSDALE INSURANCE COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2020
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE; Doc # 5; AND DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESSES; Party: ODH INTERNATIONAL INC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2020
  • FinancialPLAINTIFF; ODH INTERNATIONAL INC; Total Financial Assessment; 410.00; Total Payments and Credits; 410.00; Balance Due 0.00; E-FILE PAYMENT; Receipt # EF-2020-20564; ODH INTERNATIONAL INC; (410.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2020
  • FinancialPLAINTIFF; ODH INTERNATIONAL INC; Total Financial Assessment; 410.00; Total Payments and Credits; 410.00; Balance Due 0.00; Transaction Assessment; 410.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2020
  • DocketSUMMONS TO BE ISSUED; Doc # 4; ISSUED; Party: SCOTTSDALE INSURANCE COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2020
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET - E-FILED; Doc # 1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2020
  • DocketCOMPLAINT; Doc # 2; WITH ATTACHMENTS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2020
  • DocketSUMMONS TO BE ISSUED; Doc # 3; UNABLE TO ISSUE WRONG CLERK OF COURT AND ADA INFO ON SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Scottsdale Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Tropin, Harley Shepard

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Gail A Mcquilkin