Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Florida Pinellas Court System on 02/12/2021 at 01:04:05 (UTC).

NICOLE MICHELE LIFE Vs. CHRISTOPHER WILLIAM GALBRAITH

Case Summary

On 10/01/2019 NICOLE MICHELE LIFE filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against CHRISTOPHER WILLIAM GALBRAITH. This case was filed in Florida Pinellas Court System, 501 Building St Petersburg - Circuit located in Pinellas, Florida. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********4-FD

  • Filing Date:

    10/01/2019

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    Florida Pinellas Court System

  • Courthouse:

    501 Building St Petersburg - Circuit

  • County, State:

    Pinellas, Florida

 

Party Details

Petitioners

LIFE, NICOLE

St Petersburg, FL 33704

LIFE, NICOLE MICHELE

St Petersburg, FL 33704

Respondents

GALBRAITH, CHRISTOPHER

St Petersburg, FL 33704

GALBRAITH, CHRISTOPHER WILLIAM

St Petersburg, FL 33704

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/02/2020
  • FinancialPETITIONER; LIFE, NICOLE MICHELE; Total Financial Assessment; 422.00; Total Payments and Credits; 422.00; Balance Due 0.00; Counter Payment; Receipt # SB-2020-03882; GALBRAITH, CHRISTOPHER WILLIAM; (1.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2020
  • FinancialPETITIONER; LIFE, NICOLE MICHELE; Total Financial Assessment; 422.00; Total Payments and Credits; 422.00; Balance Due 0.00; Transaction Assessment; 1.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2019
  • DocketCERTIFIED STATEMENT COMPLETED BY CLERK; Doc # 10

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2019
  • DocketCC JUDGMENT MAILED TO ALL PARTIES; Doc # 11

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2019
  • DocketSIMPLIFIED DISSOLUTION HEARING; (9:00 AM) (Judicial Officer KELLY, LORRAINE)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2019
  • DocketFINAL JUDGMENT OF DISSOLUTION (SRS); Doc # 9; Vol./Book 20822, Page 2342, 1 pages

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2019
  • DocketCANCELED; SIMPLIFIED DISSOLUTION HEARING; (9:00 AM) (Judicial Officer KELLY, LORRAINE); OTHER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2019
  • FinancialPETITIONER; LIFE, NICOLE MICHELE; Total Financial Assessment; 422.00; Total Payments and Credits; 422.00; Balance Due 0.00; Counter Payment; Receipt # SB-2019-16192; LIFE, NICOLE; (421.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2019
  • FinancialPETITIONER; LIFE, NICOLE MICHELE; Total Financial Assessment; 422.00; Total Payments and Credits; 422.00; Balance Due 0.00; Transaction Assessment; 7.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2019
  • FinancialPETITIONER; LIFE, NICOLE MICHELE; Total Financial Assessment; 422.00; Total Payments and Credits; 422.00; Balance Due 0.00; Transaction Assessment; 414.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2019
  • DocketPETITION FOR SIMPLIFIED DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE; Doc # 1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2019
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET; Doc # 2

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2019
  • DocketNOTICE OF RELATED CASES; Doc # 3

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2019
  • DocketSUPPLEMENTAL INFORMATION REGARDING PARTIES; Doc # 4

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2019
  • DocketSEALED SOCIAL SECURITY NUMBER PLAINTIFF - PETITIONER; Doc # 5

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2019
  • DocketSEALED SOCIAL SECURITY NUMBER DEFENDANT - RESPONDENT; Doc # 6

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2019
  • DocketNOTICE OF HEARING; Doc # 7; 12/17/19 @ 9:00 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2019
  • DocketCOPY OF DRIVERS LICENSE; Doc # 8; Party: GALBRAITH, CHRISTOPHER WILLIAM; Party: LIFE, NICOLE MICHELE

    Read MoreRead Less