This case was last updated from Pinellas County 6th Judicial Circuit Courts on 02/01/2023 at 07:05:51 (UTC).

NATIONAL EXEMPTION SERVICE LLC Vs. YORKSHIRE REALTY, DOING BUSINESS AS LAFAYETTE PLAZA, DOING BUSINESS AS YORKSHIRE PLAZA

Case Summary

On 01/11/2023 NATIONAL EXEMPTION SERVICE LLC filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against YORKSHIRE REALTY, DOING BUSINESS AS LAFAYETTE PLAZA, DOING BUSINESS AS YORKSHIRE PLAZA. This case was filed in Pinellas County 6th Judicial Circuit Courts, North County Branch Office - Circuit located in Pinellas, Florida. The case status is Not Classified By Court.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********6-SC

  • Filing Date:

    01/11/2023

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Pinellas, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

NATIONAL EXEMPTION SERVICE LLC

604 Packard Court Ste A

Safety Harbor, FL 34695

Defendant

YORKSHIRE REALTY DOING BUSINESS AS LAFAYETTE PLAZA DOING BUSINESS AS YORKSHIRE PLAZA

York, PA 17402

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

THOMAS L AVRUTIS, ESQ

Attorney at HODGES AVRUTIS & FOELLER

4137

Sarasota, FL 34230

 

Court Documents

CIVIL COVER SHEET - E-FILED

01/11/2023: CIVIL COVER SHEET - E-FILED

COMPLAINT

01/11/2023: COMPLAINT

REQUEST FOR SUMMONS

01/11/2023: REQUEST FOR SUMMONS

NOTICE TO APPEAR - SERVED

01/26/2023: NOTICE TO APPEAR - SERVED

CIV_CLK_Notices_SCZoom337904303

01/13/2023: SMALL CLAIMS PRE-TRIAL NOTICE

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/07/2023
  • DocketSMALL CLAIMS PRE-TRIAL; (2:30 PM) (Judicial Officer SMALL CLAIMS JUDGE, NORTH)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/26/2023
  • DocketNOTICE TO APPEAR - SERVED; Doc # 4; 01192023; Party:; YORKSHIRE REALTY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/11/2023
  • FinancialPLAINTIFF; NATIONAL EXEMPTION SERVICE LLC; Total Financial Assessment; 310.00; Total Payments and Credits; 310.00; Balance Due 0.00; E-FILE PAYMENT; Receipt # EF-2023-01127; NATIONAL EXEMPTION SERVICE LLC; (310.00)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/11/2023
  • FinancialPLAINTIFF; NATIONAL EXEMPTION SERVICE LLC; Total Financial Assessment; 310.00; Total Payments and Credits; 310.00; Balance Due 0.00; Transaction Assessment; 310.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/11/2023
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET - E-FILED; Doc # 1

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/11/2023
  • DocketCOMPLAINT; Doc # 2; WITH ATTACHMENTS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/11/2023
  • DocketREQUEST FOR SUMMONS; Doc # 3

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less