This case was last updated from Pinellas County Courts on 05/15/2022 at 20:02:42 (UTC).

MW CAPITAL INVESTMENT LLC Vs. ALICIA RAMIREZ.et al

Case Summary

On 02/14/2022 MW CAPITAL INVESTMENT LLC filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against ALICIA RAMIREZ. This case was filed in Pinellas County Courts, St. Petersburg Branch Office - County located in Pinellas, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is JAGGER, EDWIN. The case status is Not Classified By Court.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********2-CO

  • Filing Date:

    02/14/2022

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • County, State:

    Pinellas, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

JAGGER, EDWIN

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

MW CAPITAL INVESTMENT LLC

589 52Nd Terrace N

St. Petersburg, FL 33703

MW CAPITAL INVESTMENT LLC FLORIDA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

589 52Nd Terrace N

St. Petersburg, FL 33703

Defendants

RAMIREZ, ALICIA

St. Petersburg, FL 33702

SEBASTIAN, ARMANDO

St. Petersburg, FL 33702

UNKNOWN TENANTS IN POSSESSION

St. Petersburg, FL 33702

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

STARLETT M MASSEY

Post Office Box 262

St Petersburg, FL 33731

STARLETT M MASSEY, ESQ

Attorney at MASSEY LAW GROUP P A

P O Box 262

St Petersburg, FL 33731-0262

 

Court Documents

CORRESPONDENCE TO COURT RE

04/08/2022: CORRESPONDENCE TO COURT RE

EXHIBIT

04/05/2022: EXHIBIT

MOTION

04/05/2022: MOTION

NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL

04/05/2022: NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL

COPY

03/16/2022: COPY

NOTICE OF HEARING

03/16/2022: NOTICE OF HEARING

ORDER GRANTING

03/14/2022: ORDER GRANTING

CORRESPONDENCE TO COURT RE

03/14/2022: CORRESPONDENCE TO COURT RE

PLTF-PET'S MOTION TO SET TRIAL

03/08/2022: PLTF-PET'S MOTION TO SET TRIAL

16 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/08/2022
  • DocketORDER DIR CLERK DISTRIB COURT REGIS FUNDS; Doc # 26

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2022
  • DocketREOPEN - CLOSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2022
  • DocketCORRESPONDENCE TO COURT RE; Doc # 27; PROPOSED ORDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2022
  • DocketNOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL; Doc # 23; WITHOUT PREJUDICE; Party: RAMIREZ, ALICIA; Party: SEBASTIAN, ARMANDO; Party: UNKNOWN TENANTS IN POSSESSION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2022
  • DocketCOUNTY - CASE DISMISSED - AFTER HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2022
  • DocketMOTION; Doc # 24; FOR COURT ORDER DIRECTING THE CLERK OF COURT TO DISBURSE FUNDS HELD IN THE REGISTRY OF THE COURT TO PLAINTIFF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2022
  • DocketEXHIBIT; Doc # 25; A

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2022
  • DocketCASE REOPENED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2022
  • DocketNOTICE OF HEARING; Doc # 21; 04112022 1:30 VIA ZOOM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2022
  • DocketCOPY; Doc # 22; EMAIL FROM COURT RE: ZOOM INVITE

    Read MoreRead Less
12 More Docket Entries
  • 02/14/2022
  • FinancialPLAINTIFF; MW CAPITAL INVESTMENT LLC; Total Financial Assessment; 215.00; Total Payments and Credits; 215.00; Balance Due 0.00; E-FILE PAYMENT; Receipt # EF-2022-05712; MW CAPITAL INVESTMENT LLC; (215.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2022
  • FinancialPLAINTIFF; MW CAPITAL INVESTMENT LLC; Total Financial Assessment; 215.00; Total Payments and Credits; 215.00; Balance Due 0.00; Transaction Assessment; 215.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2022
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET - E-FILED; Doc # 1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2022
  • DocketCOMPLAINT; Doc # 2

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2022
  • DocketLEASE; Doc # 3

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2022
  • DocketTHREE DAY NOTICE; Doc # 4

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2022
  • DocketSUMMONS - ISSUED; Doc # 5; Party: RAMIREZ, ALICIA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2022
  • DocketSUMMONS - ISSUED; Doc # 6; Party: SEBASTIAN, ARMANDO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2022
  • DocketSUMMONS - ISSUED; Doc # 7; Party: UNKNOWN TENANTS IN POSSESSION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2022
  • DocketDESIGNATION OF E-MAIL ADDRESS(ES); Doc # 8; AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Massey, Starlett M