This case was last updated from Florida Pinellas Court System on 12/14/2021 at 07:10:50 (UTC).

MUSCULOSKELETAL INSTITUTE CHARTERED, DOING BUSINESS AS FLORIDA ORTHOPAEDIC INSTITUTE, AS ASSIGNEE OF- FOR KEVIN MCHORNEY Vs. PROGRESSIVE SELECT INSURANCE COMPANY

Case Summary

On 11/23/2021 MUSCULOSKELETAL INSTITUTE CHARTERED, DOING BUSINESS AS FLORIDA ORTHOPAEDIC INSTITUTE, AS ASSIGNEE OF- FOR KEVIN MCHORNEY filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against PROGRESSIVE SELECT INSURANCE COMPANY. This case was filed in Florida Pinellas Court System, Clearwater Historic Courthouse - County located in Pinellas, Florida. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********6-SC

  • Filing Date:

    11/23/2021

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Pinellas, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MUSCULOSKELETAL INSTITUTE CHARTERED DOING BUSINESS AS FLORIDA ORTHOPAEDIC INSTITUTE AS ASSIGNEE OF- FOR MCHORNEY, KEVIN

C/O Reeder And Nussbaum Pa 2201 4Th Street North Suite G

St Petersburg, FL 33704

Defendant

PROGRESSIVE SELECT INSURANCE COMPANY

C/O Florida Chief Financial Officer As Ra Po Box 6200

Tallahassee, FL 32314

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

ANDREW D REEDER, ESQ

Attorney at REEDER & NUSSBAUM PA

2201 - 4Th St N Ste G

St Petersburg, FL 33704

 

Court Documents

CIVIL COVER SHEET - E-FILED

11/23/2021: CIVIL COVER SHEET - E-FILED

COMPLAINT WITH DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

11/23/2021: COMPLAINT WITH DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

11/23/2021: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

11/23/2021: REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

11/23/2021: REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

STATEMENT OF CLAIM

11/23/2021: STATEMENT OF CLAIM

CIV_CLK_Notices_SCZoom331147208

11/25/2021: SMALL CLAIMS PRE-TRIAL NOTICE

COVID ZOOM 1ST HEARING - THURSDAY - SC PRETRIAL - DEFT

12/08/2021: SMALL CLAIMS PRE-TRIAL NOTICE

COVID ZOOM 1ST HEARING - THURSDAY - SC PRETRIAL - PLTF

12/08/2021: SMALL CLAIMS PRE-TRIAL NOTICE

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/15/2021
  • DocketSMALL CLAIMS PRE-TRIAL; (3:30 PM) (Judicial Officer KELLY, LORRAINE)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2021
  • FinancialPLAINTIFF; MUSCULOSKELETAL INSTITUTE CHARTERED; Total Financial Assessment; 185.00; Total Payments and Credits; 185.00; Balance Due 0.00; E-FILE PAYMENT; Receipt # EF-2021-45208; MUSCULOSKELETAL INSTITUTE CHARTERED; (185.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2021
  • FinancialPLAINTIFF; MUSCULOSKELETAL INSTITUTE CHARTERED; Total Financial Assessment; 185.00; Total Payments and Credits; 185.00; Balance Due 0.00; Transaction Assessment; 185.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2021
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET - E-FILED; Doc # 1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2021
  • DocketCOMPLAINT WITH DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL; Doc # 2

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES; Doc # 3

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2021
  • DocketREQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS; Doc # 4

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2021
  • DocketREQUEST FOR PRODUCTION; Doc # 5

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2021
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF CLAIM; Doc # 6

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where MUSCULOSKELETAL INSTITUTE CHARTERED is a litigant

Latest cases where PROGRESSIVE SELECT INSURANCE COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer ANDREW D REEDER, ESQ