This case was last updated from Pinellas County Courts on 03/22/2022 at 20:12:48 (UTC).

MUSCULOSKELETAL INSTITUTE CHARTERED, DOING BUSINESS AS FLORIDA ORTHOPAEDIC INSTITUTE, AS ASSIGNEE OF- FOR ERNEST ODUM Vs. GOVERNMENT EMPLOYEES INSURANCE COMPANY

Case Summary

On 12/22/2021 MUSCULOSKELETAL INSTITUTE CHARTERED, DOING BUSINESS AS FLORIDA ORTHOPAEDIC INSTITUTE, AS ASSIGNEE OF- FOR ERNEST ODUM filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against GOVERNMENT EMPLOYEES INSURANCE COMPANY. This case was filed in Pinellas County Courts, Clearwater Historic Courthouse - County located in Pinellas, Florida. The case status is Not Classified By Court.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********6-SC

  • Filing Date:

    12/22/2021

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Pinellas, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

MUSCULOSKELETAL INSTITUTE CHARTERED

C/O Reeder And Nussbaum Pa 2201 4Th Street North Suite G

St Petersburg, FL 33704

MUSCULOSKELETAL INSTITUTE CHARTERED DOING BUSINESS AS FLORIDA ORTHOPAEDIC INSTITUTE AS ASSIGNEE OF- FOR ODUM, ERNEST

C/O Reeder And Nussbaum Pa 2201 4Th Street North Suite G

St Petersburg, FL 33704

Defendant

GOVERNMENT EMPLOYEES INSURANCE COMPANY

C/O Florida Chief Financial Officer As Ra Po Box 6200

Tallahassee, FL 32314

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

ANDREW D REEDER, ESQ

Attorney at REEDER & NUSSBAUM P A

2201 Fourth St North Suite G

St Petersburg, FL 33704

Defendant Attorney

NIGEL NORTHE, ESQ

Attorney at LAW OFFICE OF DAVID S DOUGHERTY

4300 W Cypress St Ste 900

Tampa, FL 33607

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

12/22/2021: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

COMPLAINT E-FILED

12/22/2021: COMPLAINT E-FILED

REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

12/22/2021: REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

12/22/2021: REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

STATEMENT OF CLAIM

12/22/2021: STATEMENT OF CLAIM

CIVIL COVER SHEET - E-FILED

12/22/2021: CIVIL COVER SHEET - E-FILED

CIV_CLK_Notices_SCZoom331623302

12/24/2021: SMALL CLAIMS PRE-TRIAL NOTICE

PLTF-PET'S MOTION TO STRIKE

03/04/2022: PLTF-PET'S MOTION TO STRIKE

NOTICE OF SERVICE ANSWERS INTERROGATORIES

03/03/2022: NOTICE OF SERVICE ANSWERS INTERROGATORIES

RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

03/01/2022: RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

OBJECTION

03/01/2022: OBJECTION

RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

03/01/2022: RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

02/24/2022: RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

PRIVILEGE LOG

02/24/2022: PRIVILEGE LOG

RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

02/24/2022: RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

NOTICE OF SERVICE ANSWERS INTERROGATORIES

02/24/2022: NOTICE OF SERVICE ANSWERS INTERROGATORIES

MOTION SUMMARY JUDGMENT

03/15/2022: MOTION SUMMARY JUDGMENT

REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

01/31/2022: REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

12 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/15/2022
  • DocketMOTION SUMMARY JUDGMENT; Doc # 24; Party: MUSCULOSKELETAL INSTITUTE CHARTERED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2022
  • DocketPLTF-PET'S MOTION TO STRIKE; Doc # 23; DEFTS AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES AND/OR MOTION FOR MORE DEFINITE STATEMENT/REPLY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2022
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE ANSWERS INTERROGATORIES; Doc # 22

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2022
  • DocketRESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS; Doc # 19

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2022
  • DocketOBJECTION; Doc # 20; TO DEFT INTERROGATORIES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2022
  • DocketRESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION; Doc # 21

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2022
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE ANSWERS INTERROGATORIES; Doc # 15

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2022
  • DocketRESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION; Doc # 16

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2022
  • DocketPRIVILEGE LOG; Doc # 17

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2022
  • DocketRESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS; Doc # 18

    Read MoreRead Less
7 More Docket Entries
  • 01/11/2022
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE; Doc # 9

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2022
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE OF; Doc # 7; PROCESS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2021
  • FinancialPLAINTIFF; MUSCULOSKELETAL INSTITUTE CHARTERED; Total Financial Assessment; 185.00; Total Payments and Credits; 185.00; Balance Due 0.00; E-FILE PAYMENT; Receipt # EF-2021-48657; MUSCULOSKELETAL INSTITUTE CHARTERED; (185.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2021
  • FinancialPLAINTIFF; MUSCULOSKELETAL INSTITUTE CHARTERED; Total Financial Assessment; 185.00; Total Payments and Credits; 185.00; Balance Due 0.00; Transaction Assessment; 185.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2021
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET - E-FILED; Doc # 1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2021
  • DocketCOMPLAINT E-FILED; Doc # 2

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES; Doc # 3; TO GOVERNMENT EMPLOYEES INSURANCE COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2021
  • DocketREQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS; Doc # 4; TO GOVERNMENT EMPLOYEES INSURANCE COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2021
  • DocketREQUEST FOR PRODUCTION; Doc # 5; TO GOVERNMENT EMPLOYEES INSURANCE COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2021
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF CLAIM; Doc # 6

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where MUSCULOSKELETAL INSTITUTE CHARTERED is a litigant

Latest cases where Government Employees Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer ANDREW D REEDER, ESQ