This case was last updated from Pinellas County Courts on 03/03/2022 at 20:10:37 (UTC).

MUSCULOSKELETAL INSTITUTE CHARTERED Vs. AUTO-OWNERS INSURANCE COMPANY

Case Summary

On 12/03/2021 MUSCULOSKELETAL INSTITUTE CHARTERED filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against AUTO-OWNERS INSURANCE COMPANY. This case was filed in Pinellas County Courts, St. Petersburg Branch Office - County located in Pinellas, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is JAGGER, EDWIN. The case status is Not Classified By Court.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********1-CO

  • Filing Date:

    12/03/2021

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Pinellas, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

JAGGER, EDWIN

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MUSCULOSKELETAL INSTITUTE CHARTERED DOING BUSINESS AS FLORIDA ORTHOPAEDIC INSTITUTE AS ASSIGNEE OF- FOR PATTERSON, JONATHAN

C/O Reeder And Nussbaum Pa 2201 4Th Street North Suite G

St. Petersburg, FL 33704

Defendant

AUTO-OWNERS INSURANCE COMPANY

200 East Gaines St.

Tallahassee, FL 32399

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

ANDREW D REEDER, ESQ

Attorney at REEDER & NUSSBAUM P A

2201 Fourth St North Suite G

St Petersburg, FL 33704

Defendant Attorney

STEPHEN J BELL, ESQ

Attorney at HAMILTON MILLER & BIRTHISEL LLP

100 S Ashley Dr Ste 1210

Tampa, FL 33602

 

Court Documents

CIVIL COVER SHEET - E-FILED

12/03/2021: CIVIL COVER SHEET - E-FILED

COMPLAINT

12/03/2021: COMPLAINT

SUMMONS ISSUED

12/03/2021: SUMMONS - ISSUED

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

12/03/2021: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

12/03/2021: REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

12/03/2021: REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

PLTF-PET'S MOTION TO STRIKE

01/04/2022: PLTF-PET'S MOTION TO STRIKE

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

12/27/2021: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

DESIGNATION OF E-MAIL ADDRESS(ES)

12/27/2021: DESIGNATION OF E-MAIL ADDRESS(ES)

ANSWER, AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES, DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

01/03/2022: ANSWER, AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES, DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

01/03/2022: RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE

03/01/2022: NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/01/2022
  • DocketNOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE; Doc # 13

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2022
  • DocketCOUNTY - CASE DISMISSED - BEFORE HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2022
  • DocketPLTF-PET'S MOTION TO STRIKE; Doc # 12; AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES AND/OR MOTION FOR MORE DEFINITE STATEMENT/REPLY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2022
  • DocketANSWER, AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES, DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL; Doc # 10; Party: REEDER, ANDREW D, ESQ

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2022
  • DocketRESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS; Doc # 11

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2021
  • DocketDEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL; Doc # 7

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE; Doc # 8; Party: AUTO-OWNERS INSURANCE COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2021
  • DocketDESIGNATION OF E-MAIL ADDRESS(ES); Doc # 9; FOR SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2021
  • FinancialPLAINTIFF; MUSCULOSKELETAL INSTITUTE CHARTERED; Total Financial Assessment; 310.00; Total Payments and Credits; 310.00; Balance Due 0.00; E-FILE PAYMENT; Receipt # EF-2021-46416; MUSCULOSKELETAL INSTITUTE CHARTERED; (310.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2021
  • FinancialPLAINTIFF; MUSCULOSKELETAL INSTITUTE CHARTERED; Total Financial Assessment; 310.00; Total Payments and Credits; 310.00; Balance Due 0.00; Transaction Assessment; 310.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2021
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET - E-FILED; Doc # 1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2021
  • DocketCOMPLAINT; Doc # 2

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2021
  • DocketSUMMONS - ISSUED; Doc # 3; Party: AUTO-OWNERS INSURANCE COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES; Doc # 4

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2021
  • DocketREQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS; Doc # 5

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2021
  • DocketREQUEST FOR PRODUCTION; Doc # 6

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where MUSCULOSKELETAL INSTITUTE CHARTERED is a litigant

Latest cases where Auto-Owners Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer ANDREW D REEDER, ESQ