This case was last updated from Florida Pinellas Court System on 10/29/2021 at 07:17:55 (UTC).

MUSCULOSKELETAL INSTITUTE CHARTERED, DOING BUSINESS AS FLORIDA ORTHOPAEDIC INSTITUTE, AS ASSIGNEE OF- FOR OLEN ESTERLINE Vs. ALLSTATE INSURANCE COMPANY

Case Summary

On 10/08/2021 MUSCULOSKELETAL INSTITUTE CHARTERED, DOING BUSINESS AS FLORIDA ORTHOPAEDIC INSTITUTE, AS ASSIGNEE OF- FOR OLEN ESTERLINE filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against ALLSTATE INSURANCE COMPANY. This case was filed in Florida Pinellas Court System, Clearwater Historic Courthouse - County located in Pinellas, Florida. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********1-SC

  • Filing Date:

    10/08/2021

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Pinellas, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

MUSCULOSKELETAL INSTITUTE CHARTERED

C/O Reeder And Nussbaum Pa 2201 4Th Street North Suite G

St Petersburg, FL 33704

MUSCULOSKELETAL INSTITUTE CHARTERED AS ASSIGNEE OF- FOR ESTERLINE, OLEN DOING BUSINESS AS FLORIDA ORTHOPAEDIC INSTITUTE

C/O Reeder And Nussbaum Pa 2201 4Th Street North Suite G

St Petersburg, FL 33704

Defendant

ALLSTATE INSURANCE COMPANY

C/O Florida Chief Financial Officer As Ra Po Box 6200

Tallahassee, FL 32314

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

ANDREW D REEDER, ESQ

Attorney at REEDER & NUSSBAUM PA

2201 Fourth St North Suite G

St Petersburg, FL 33704

 

Court Documents

NOTICE TO APPEAR - SERVED

10/20/2021: NOTICE TO APPEAR - SERVED

CIV_CLK_Notices_SCZoom330424028

10/12/2021: SMALL CLAIMS PRE-TRIAL NOTICE

STATEMENT OF CLAIM

10/08/2021: STATEMENT OF CLAIM

REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

10/08/2021: REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

10/08/2021: REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

10/08/2021: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

COMPLAINT WITH DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

10/08/2021: COMPLAINT WITH DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

CIVIL COVER SHEET - E-FILED

10/08/2021: CIVIL COVER SHEET - E-FILED

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/03/2021
  • DocketSMALL CLAIMS PRE-TRIAL; (3:30 PM) (Judicial Officer SMALL CLAIMS JUDGE, SOUTH)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2021
  • DocketNOTICE TO APPEAR - SERVED; Doc # 7; Party: ALLSTATE INSURANCE COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2021
  • FinancialPLAINTIFF; MUSCULOSKELETAL INSTITUTE CHARTERED; Total Financial Assessment; 310.00; Total Payments and Credits; 310.00; Balance Due 0.00; E-FILE PAYMENT; Receipt # EF-2021-38912; MUSCULOSKELETAL INSTITUTE CHARTERED; (310.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2021
  • FinancialPLAINTIFF; MUSCULOSKELETAL INSTITUTE CHARTERED; Total Financial Assessment; 310.00; Total Payments and Credits; 310.00; Balance Due 0.00; Transaction Assessment; 310.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2021
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET - E-FILED; Doc # 1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2021
  • DocketCOMPLAINT WITH DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL; Doc # 2

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES; Doc # 3

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2021
  • DocketREQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS; Doc # 4

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2021
  • DocketREQUEST FOR PRODUCTION; Doc # 5

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2021
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF CLAIM; Doc # 6

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where MUSCULOSKELETAL INSTITUTE CHARTERED is a litigant

Latest cases where Allstate Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer ANDREW D REEDER, ESQ