This case was last updated from Florida Pinellas Court System on 10/29/2021 at 07:19:06 (UTC).

MUSCULOSKELETAL INSTITUTE CHARTERED, DOING BUSINESS AS FLORIDA ORTHOPAEDIC INSTITUTE, AS ASSIGNEE OF- FOR DHARMA PEREZ AGUEDA Vs. MGA INSURANCE COMPANY INC

Case Summary

On 10/08/2021 MUSCULOSKELETAL INSTITUTE CHARTERED, DOING BUSINESS AS FLORIDA ORTHOPAEDIC INSTITUTE, AS ASSIGNEE OF- FOR DHARMA PEREZ AGUEDA filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against MGA INSURANCE COMPANY INC. This case was filed in Florida Pinellas Court System, Clearwater Historic Courthouse - County located in Pinellas, Florida. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********7-SC

  • Filing Date:

    10/08/2021

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Pinellas, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MUSCULOSKELETAL INSTITUTE CHARTERED AS ASSIGNEE OF- FOR AGUEDA, DHARMA PEREZ DOING BUSINESS AS FLORIDA ORTHOPAEDIC INSTITUTE

C/O Reeder And Nussbaum Pa 2201 4Th Street North Suite G

St Petersburg, FL 33704

Defendant

MGA INSURANCE COMPANY INC

C/O Florida Chief Financial Officer As Ra Po Box 6200

Tallahassee, FL 32314

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

ANDREW D REEDER, ESQ

Attorney at REEDER & NUSSBAUM PA

2201 Fourth St North Suite G

St Petersburg, FL 33704

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL

10/22/2021: NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL

NOTICE TO APPEAR - SERVED

10/20/2021: NOTICE TO APPEAR - SERVED

CIV_CLK_Notices_SCZoom330436969

10/13/2021: SMALL CLAIMS PRE-TRIAL NOTICE

STATEMENT OF CLAIM - E-FILED

10/08/2021: STATEMENT OF CLAIM - E-FILED

REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

10/08/2021: REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

10/08/2021: REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

10/08/2021: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

COMPLAINT E-FILED

10/08/2021: COMPLAINT E-FILED

CIVIL COVER SHEET - E-FILED

10/08/2021: CIVIL COVER SHEET - E-FILED

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/03/2021
  • DocketCANCELED; SMALL CLAIMS PRE-TRIAL; (3:30 PM) (Judicial Officer SMALL CLAIMS JUDGE, SOUTH); CASE DISMISSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL; Doc # 8; WITHOUT PREJUDICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2021
  • DocketSMALL CLAIMS - CASE DISMISSED - BEFORE HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2021
  • DocketNOTICE TO APPEAR - SERVED; Doc # 7; Party: MGA INSURANCE COMPANY INC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2021
  • FinancialPLAINTIFF; MUSCULOSKELETAL INSTITUTE CHARTERED; Total Financial Assessment; 90.00; Total Payments and Credits; 90.00; Balance Due 0.00; E-FILE PAYMENT; Receipt # EF-2021-39041; MUSCULOSKELETAL INSTITUTE, CHARTERED, D/B/A FLORIDA ORTHOPAEDIC INSTITUTE A/A/O DHARMA PEREZ AGUEDA; (90.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2021
  • FinancialPLAINTIFF; MUSCULOSKELETAL INSTITUTE CHARTERED; Total Financial Assessment; 90.00; Total Payments and Credits; 90.00; Balance Due 0.00; Transaction Assessment; 90.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2021
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET - E-FILED; Doc # 1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2021
  • DocketCOMPLAINT E-FILED; Doc # 2

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES; Doc # 3

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2021
  • DocketREQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS; Doc # 4

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2021
  • DocketREQUEST FOR PRODUCTION; Doc # 5

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2021
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF CLAIM - E-FILED; Doc # 6

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where MUSCULOSKELETAL INSTITUTE CHARTERED is a litigant

Latest cases where MGA Insurance Company Inc is a litigant