Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Florida Pinellas Court System on 02/11/2021 at 07:06:59 (UTC).

MSW CAPITAL LLC Vs. GEORGE J PETERSEN

Case Summary

On 09/11/2019 MSW CAPITAL LLC filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against GEORGE J PETERSEN. This case was filed in Florida Pinellas Court System, Clearwater Historic Courthouse - County located in Pinellas, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is McNARY, MYRA SCOTT. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********2-SC

  • Filing Date:

    09/11/2019

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Florida Pinellas Court System

  • Courthouse:

    Clearwater Historic Courthouse - County

  • County, State:

    Pinellas, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

McNARY, MYRA SCOTT

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MSW CAPITAL LLC

801 International Parkway Suite 500

Lake Mary, FL 32746

Defendant

PETERSEN, GEORGE J

Clearwater, FL 33755-1472

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

HAROLD E SCHERR

Attorney at MANDARICH LAW GROUP LLP

952289

Lake Mary, FL 32795

MICHELLE K HINES

Attorney at MANDARICH LAW GROUP LLP

P O Box 952289

Lake Mary, FL 32795

MICHELLE K HINES, ESQ

 

Court Documents

CIV_CLK_DismissalNotice322233735-22

04/24/2020: DISMISSAL NOTICE

CIV_CLK_DismissalNotice322233735-21

04/24/2020: DISMISSAL NOTICE

NOTICE OF LACK OF PROSECUTION RETD BY P.O.

05/11/2020: NOTICE OF LACK OF PROSECUTION RETD BY P.O.

MASTER ORDER OF DISMISSAL

06/24/2020: MASTER ORDER OF DISMISSAL

NOTICE RETURNED SERVED

09/18/2019: NOTICE RETURNED SERVED

SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

09/11/2019: SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

EXHIBIT

09/11/2019: EXHIBIT

CIVIL COVER SHEET - E-FILED

09/11/2019: CIVIL COVER SHEET - E-FILED

STATEMENT OF CLAIM

09/11/2019: STATEMENT OF CLAIM

SMALL CLAIMS PRE-TRIAL NOTICE

SMALL CLAIMS PRE-TRIAL NOTICE

SMALL CLAIMS DEFT PRE-TRIAL NOTICE

10/08/2019: SMALL CLAIMS PRE-TRIAL

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/24/2020
  • DocketMASTER ORDER OF DISMISSAL; Doc # 12; PETERSEN, GEORGE J; Vol./Book 21055, Page 1215, 2 pages

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2020
  • DocketCASE DISMISSED - AFTER HEARING (SRS DISPOSITION); Doc # 13

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2020
  • DocketDISMISSAL-FAILURE TO PROSECUTE-SC; (12:00 AM) (Judicial Officer McNARY, MYRA SCOTT)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2020
  • DocketNOTICE OF LACK OF PROSECUTION RETD BY P.O. Doc # 11; NO FORWARDING ADDRESS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2020
  • DocketNOTICE-LACK OF PROSECUTION MAILED TO ALL PARTIES; Doc # 10

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2019
  • DocketSMALL CLAIMS PRE TRIAL ICD; (1:00 PM) (Judicial Officer McNARY, MYRA SCOTT); Result: SC HEARING HELD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2019
  • DocketDEFAULT-JUDGMENT UPON RECEIPT OF; Doc # 9; AFFDS IN PROOF OF CLAIM, COST

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2019
  • DocketNOTICE TO APPEAR - SERVED; Doc # 8

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/12/2019
  • FinancialPLAINTIFF; MSW CAPITAL LLC; Total Financial Assessment; 310.00; Total Payments and Credits; 310.00; Balance Due 0.00; E-FILE PAYMENT; Receipt # EF-2019-34400; MSW CAPITAL LLC; (310.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/12/2019
  • FinancialPLAINTIFF; MSW CAPITAL LLC; Total Financial Assessment; 310.00; Total Payments and Credits; 310.00; Balance Due 0.00; Transaction Assessment; 310.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/12/2019
  • DocketNOTICE-STMT OF CLAIM-DEFT; Doc # 5; Party: PETERSEN, GEORGE J

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/12/2019
  • DocketNOTICE TO PLTF-PLTF ATTY; Doc # 6

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/12/2019
  • DocketSUMMONS-NOTICE EMAILED TO ATTY-PLTF FOR SERVICE; Doc # 7; Party: MSW CAPITAL LLC; Party: PETERSEN, GEORGE J

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2019
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF CLAIM; Doc # 1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2019
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET - E-FILED; Doc # 2

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2019
  • DocketEXHIBIT; Doc # 3; AGREEMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2019
  • DocketSUMMONS TO BE ISSUED; Doc # 4; NOT USED BY CLERK

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where MSW CAPITAL LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer HINES, MICHELLE KIM

Latest cases represented by Lawyer SCHERR, HAROLD EARL