This case was last updated from Florida Pinellas Court System on 02/09/2021 at 03:55:47 (UTC).

MIDLAND FUNDING LLC Vs. ISMAEL RODRIGUEZ

Case Summary

On 07/02/2019 MIDLAND FUNDING LLC filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against ISMAEL RODRIGUEZ. This case was filed in Florida Pinellas Court System, Clearwater Historic Courthouse - County located in Pinellas, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is CARASSAS, JOHN. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********8-SC

  • Filing Date:

    07/02/2019

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Pinellas, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

CARASSAS, JOHN

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MIDLAND FUNDING LLC

P.O. Box 290335

Tampa, FL 33687

Defendant

RODRIGUEZ, ISMAEL

Largo, FL 33770

Garnishee

OUTSOURCE INC

C/O Leesa K Salazar 397 Wekiva Springs Rd Ste 117

Longwood, FL 32779

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

VALERIA OBI

Attorney at MIDLAND CREDIT MGMT INC

290335

Tampa, FL 33687

 

Court Documents

WRIT - SERVED

10/19/2020: WRIT - SERVED

CONTINUING WRIT OF GARNISHMENT SALARY-WAGES

10/02/2020: CONTINUING WRIT OF GARNISHMENT SALARY-WAGES

ATTACHMENT

09/13/2019: ATTACHMENT

FINAL DISPOSITION FORM

09/13/2019: FINAL DISPOSITION FORM

NOTICE

11/04/2020: NOTICE

NOTICE RETURNED SERVED

07/17/2019: NOTICE RETURNED SERVED

SMALL CLAIMS PRE-TRIAL NOTICE

SMALL CLAIMS PRE-TRIAL NOTICE

SMALL CLAIMS DEFT PRE-TRIAL NOTICE

08/06/2019: SMALL CLAIMS PRE-TRIAL

CIVIL COVER SHEET - E-FILED

07/02/2019: CIVIL COVER SHEET - E-FILED

NOTICE TO DEF & INTERESTED PARTIES

10/07/2020: NOTICE TO DEF & INTERESTED PARTIES

W-Transmittal to Judge - Garnishment or Hearing

W-Transmittal to Judge - Garnishment or Hearing

MOTION FOR CONTINUING WRIT OF GARNISHMENT

09/14/2020: MOTION FOR CONTINUING WRIT OF GARNISHMENT

DEFAULT JUDGMENT

09/24/2019: DEFAULT JUDGMENT

NOTICE OF FILING

09/13/2019: NOTICE OF FILING

AFFIDAVIT AS TO MILITARY SERVICE

09/13/2019: AFFIDAVIT AS TO MILITARY SERVICE

SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

07/02/2019: SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

ATTACHMENT TO COMPLAINT

07/02/2019: ATTACHMENT TO COMPLAINT

STATEMENT OF CLAIM

07/02/2019: STATEMENT OF CLAIM

7 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/04/2020
  • DocketNOTICE; Doc # 24; OF DISSOLUTION OF CONTINUING WRIT OF GARNISHMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2020
  • DocketWRIT - SERVED; Doc # 23; C/C CONTINUING GARNISHMENT 10092020; Party: OUTSOURCE INC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2020
  • DocketNOTICE TO DEF & INTERESTED PARTIES; Doc # 22

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2020
  • DocketCONTINUING WRIT OF GARNISHMENT SALARY-WAGES; Doc # 19; OUTSOURCE INC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2020
  • DocketCC CONTINUING WRIT OF GARNISHMENT; Doc # 20

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2020
  • DocketREOPEN - CLOSED; Doc # 21; CWGW

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2020
  • FinancialPLAINTIFF; MIDLAND FUNDING LLC; Total Financial Assessment; 270.00; Total Payments and Credits; 270.00; Balance Due 0.00; Counter Payment; Receipt # CV-2020-19002; MIDLAND FUNDING LLC; (85.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2020
  • FinancialPLAINTIFF; MIDLAND FUNDING LLC; Total Financial Assessment; 270.00; Total Payments and Credits; 270.00; Balance Due 0.00; Transaction Assessment; 85.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2020
  • DocketCASE REOPENED; Doc # 17; MCWG

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2020
  • DocketMOTION FOR CONTINUING WRIT OF GARNISHMENT; Doc # 18; OUTSOURCE INC - SENT TO JUDGE 9/25/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
9 More Docket Entries
  • 07/17/2019
  • DocketNOTICE TO APPEAR - SERVED; Doc # 8; Party: RODRIGUEZ, ISMAEL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2019
  • DocketNOTICE-STMT OF CLAIM-DEFT; Doc # 5; Party: RODRIGUEZ, ISMAEL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2019
  • DocketNOTICE TO PLTF-PLTF ATTY; Doc # 6

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2019
  • DocketSUMMONS-NOTICE EMAILED TO ATTY-PLTF FOR SERVICE; Doc # 7; Party: MIDLAND FUNDING LLC; Party: RODRIGUEZ, ISMAEL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/03/2019
  • FinancialPLAINTIFF; MIDLAND FUNDING LLC; Total Financial Assessment; 270.00; Total Payments and Credits; 270.00; Balance Due 0.00; E-FILE PAYMENT; Receipt # EF-2019-25106; MIDLAND FUNDING LLC; (185.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/03/2019
  • FinancialPLAINTIFF; MIDLAND FUNDING LLC; Total Financial Assessment; 270.00; Total Payments and Credits; 270.00; Balance Due 0.00; Transaction Assessment; 185.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2019
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF CLAIM; Doc # 1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2019
  • DocketATTACHMENT TO COMPLAINT; Doc # 2; ACCOUNT SUMMARY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2019
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET - E-FILED; Doc # 3

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2019
  • DocketSUMMONS TO BE ISSUED; Doc # 4; NOT USED BY CLERK

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where OUTSOURCE LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where Midland Funding, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer OBI , VALERIA