This case was last updated from Florida Pinellas Court System on 01/19/2022 at 08:10:10 (UTC).

MIDLAND CREDIT MANAGEMENT INC Vs. LELA MOCEVIC

Case Summary

On 11/19/2021 MIDLAND CREDIT MANAGEMENT INC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against LELA MOCEVIC. This case was filed in Florida Pinellas Court System, Clearwater Historic Courthouse - County located in Pinellas, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are McNARY, MYRA SCOTT and BEDINGHAUS, SUSAN. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********3-CO

  • Filing Date:

    11/19/2021

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Pinellas, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

McNARY, MYRA SCOTT

BEDINGHAUS, SUSAN

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MIDLAND CREDIT MANAGEMENT INC

Po Box 290335

Tampa, FL 33687

Defendant

MOCEVIC, LELA

Clearwater, FL 33764-2527

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MOLLY FITZPATRICK

2121

Warren, MI 48090-2121

Defendant Attorney

RYAN N SINGLETON, ESQ

Attorney at HOLLAND LAW GROUP P A

3639 Cortez Rd W Ste 130

Bradenton, FL 34210

 

Court Documents

CIVIL COVER SHEET - E-FILED

11/19/2021: CIVIL COVER SHEET - E-FILED

COMPLAINT

11/19/2021: COMPLAINT

SUMMONS ISSUED

11/19/2021: SUMMONS - ISSUED

EXHIBIT

11/19/2021: EXHIBIT

PLAINTIFFS NOTICE OF SERVICE

12/08/2021: PLAINTIFFS NOTICE OF SERVICE

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

12/02/2021: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

SUMMONS - SERVED

12/06/2021: SUMMONS - SERVED

MOTION

12/21/2021: MOTION

NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE

12/17/2021: NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/21/2021
  • DocketMOTION; Doc # 9; FOR ENLARGEMENT OF TIME TO FILE RESPONSE TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT; Filed by: MOCEVIC, LELA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE; Doc # 8

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2021
  • DocketPLAINTIFFS NOTICE OF SERVICE; Doc # 7

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2021
  • DocketSUMMONS - SERVED; Doc # 6; 12022021; Party: MOCEVIC, LELA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE; Doc # 5; AND DESIGNATION OF E-MAIL ADDRESSES; Party: MOCEVIC, LELA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2021
  • FinancialPLAINTIFF; MIDLAND CREDIT MANAGEMENT INC; Total Financial Assessment; 310.00; Total Payments and Credits; 310.00; Balance Due 0.00; E-FILE PAYMENT; Receipt # EF-2021-44884; MIDLAND CREDIT MANAGEMENT INC; (310.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2021
  • FinancialPLAINTIFF; MIDLAND CREDIT MANAGEMENT INC; Total Financial Assessment; 310.00; Total Payments and Credits; 310.00; Balance Due 0.00; Transaction Assessment; 310.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2021
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET - E-FILED; Doc # 1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2021
  • DocketCOMPLAINT; Doc # 2

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2021
  • DocketSUMMONS - ISSUED; Doc # 3; Party: MOCEVIC, LELA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2021
  • DocketEXHIBIT; Doc # 4; ACCOUNT SUMMARY

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Midland Credit Management, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer FITZPATRICK, MOLLY KATHLEEN