This case was last updated from Pinellas County Courts on 05/20/2022 at 08:10:58 (UTC).

MIDLAND CREDIT MANAGEMENT INC Vs. JAMES STUTLER

Case Summary

On 03/21/2022 MIDLAND CREDIT MANAGEMENT INC filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against JAMES STUTLER. This case was filed in Pinellas County Courts, St. Petersburg Branch Office - County located in Pinellas, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is KELLY, LORRAINE. The case status is Not Classified By Court.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********3-SC

  • Filing Date:

    03/21/2022

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Pinellas, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

KELLY, LORRAINE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MIDLAND CREDIT MANAGEMENT INC

887 Donald Ross Road

Juno Beach, FL 33408

Defendant

STUTLER, JAMES

Clearwater, FL 33763

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

BREANNA MAYERS, ESQ

Attorney at ANDREU, PALMA, LAVIN & SOLIS, PLLC

815 Nw 57Th Avenue, Suite 401

Miami, FL 33126

 

Court Documents

CIVIL COVER SHEET - E-FILED

03/21/2022: CIVIL COVER SHEET - E-FILED

COMPLAINT

03/21/2022: COMPLAINT

SUMMONS - NOT ISSUED

03/21/2022: SUMMONS - NOT ISSUED

NOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILE

03/21/2022: NOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILE

EXHIBIT

03/21/2022: EXHIBIT

EXHIBIT

03/21/2022: EXHIBIT

CIV_CLK_Notices_SCZoom333020471

03/23/2022: SMALL CLAIMS PRE-TRIAL NOTICE

SUMMONS - SERVED

03/30/2022: SUMMONS - SERVED

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/27/2022
  • DocketSMALL CLAIMS PRE TRIAL ICD; (11:00 AM) (Judicial Officer KELLY, LORRAINE); Result: SC HEARING HELD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2022
  • DocketDEFAULT-JUDGMENT UPON RECEIPT OF; Doc # 8; AFFDS IN PROOF OF CLAIM, COST

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2022
  • DocketSUMMONS - SERVED; Doc # 7; 03292022; Party: STUTLER, JAMES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2022
  • FinancialPLAINTIFF; MIDLAND CREDIT MANAGEMENT INC; Total Financial Assessment; 310.00; Total Payments and Credits; 310.00; Balance Due 0.00; E-FILE PAYMENT; Receipt # EF-2022-10084; MIDLAND CREDIT MANAGEMENT INC; (310.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2022
  • FinancialPLAINTIFF; MIDLAND CREDIT MANAGEMENT INC; Total Financial Assessment; 310.00; Total Payments and Credits; 310.00; Balance Due 0.00; Transaction Assessment; 310.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2022
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET - E-FILED; Doc # 1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2022
  • DocketCOMPLAINT; Doc # 2

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2022
  • DocketSUMMONS - NOT ISSUED; Doc # 3; NOT USE BY CLERK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2022
  • DocketNOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILE; Doc # 4

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2022
  • DocketEXHIBIT; Doc # 5; A BILL OF SALE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2022
  • DocketEXHIBIT; Doc # 6; B SUMMARY OF ACCOUNT ACTIVITY

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Midland Credit Management, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer MAYERS , BREANNA