Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Florida Pinellas Court System on 05/23/2021 at 20:10:55 (UTC).

MIDLAND CREDIT MANAGEMENT INC Vs. ANDREW SPRENTALL

Case Summary

On 02/22/2021 MIDLAND CREDIT MANAGEMENT INC filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against ANDREW SPRENTALL. This case was filed in Florida Pinellas Court System, North County Branch Office - Circuit located in Pinellas, Florida. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********4-SC

  • Filing Date:

    02/22/2021

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Florida Pinellas Court System

  • Courthouse:

    North County Branch Office - Circuit

  • County, State:

    Pinellas, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MIDLAND CREDIT MANAGEMENT INC

Po Box 290335

Tampa, FL 33687

Defendant

SPRENTALL, ANDREW

Dunedin, FL 34698-8215

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MOLLY FITZPATRICK

Attorney at MIDLAND CREDIT GROUP

2121

Warren, MI 48090

 

Court Documents

COVID ZOOM RESET - TUESDAY - SC PRETRIAL - PLTF

COVID ZOOM RESET - TUESDAY - SC PRETRIAL - PLTF

COVID ZOOM RESET - TUESDAY - SC PRETRIAL - DEFT

06/08/2021: SMALL CLAIMS PRE TRIAL ICD

NOTICE TO APPEAR - SERVED

03/23/2021: NOTICE TO APPEAR - SERVED

CIV_CLK_Notices_SCZoom326755028

02/26/2021: SMALL CLAIMS PRE-TRIAL NOTICE

EXHIBIT

02/22/2021: EXHIBIT

SUMMONS NOT ISSUED

02/22/2021: SUMMONS NOT ISSUED

STATEMENT OF CLAIM

02/22/2021: STATEMENT OF CLAIM

CIVIL COVER SHEET - E-FILED

02/22/2021: CIVIL COVER SHEET - E-FILED

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/08/2021
  • DocketSMALL CLAIMS PRE TRIAL ICD; (10:00 AM) (Judicial Officer SMALL CLAIMS JUDGE, NORTH)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2021
  • DocketRESET NOTICE MAILED-EMAILED; Doc # 7; PLTF - EMAILED; Party: FITZPATRICK, MOLLY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2021
  • DocketRESET NOTICE MAILED-EMAILED; Doc # 8; DEFT - MAILED; Party: SPRENTALL, ANDREW

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2021
  • DocketSMALL CLAIMS PRE TRIAL ICD; (11:30 AM) (Judicial Officer McNARY, MYRA SCOTT); Result: SC HEARING HELD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF CONTINUED PRETRIAL RE; Doc # 6; 6/8/2021 10:00 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2021
  • DocketNOTICE TO APPEAR - SERVED; Doc # 5; Party: SPRENTALL, ANDREW

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2021
  • FinancialPLAINTIFF; MIDLAND CREDIT MANAGEMENT INC; Total Financial Assessment; 185.00; Total Payments and Credits; 185.00; Balance Due 0.00; E-FILE PAYMENT; Receipt # EF-2021-07214; MIDLAND CREDIT MANAGEMENT INC; (185.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2021
  • FinancialPLAINTIFF; MIDLAND CREDIT MANAGEMENT INC; Total Financial Assessment; 185.00; Total Payments and Credits; 185.00; Balance Due 0.00; Transaction Assessment; 185.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2021
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET - E-FILED; Doc # 1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2021
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF CLAIM; Doc # 2

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2021
  • DocketSUMMONS NOT ISSUED; Doc # 3; NOT USED BY CLERK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2021
  • DocketEXHIBIT; Doc # 4; ACCOUNT STATEMENT & BILL OF SALE

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Midland Credit Management, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer FITZPATRICK, MOLLY KATHLEEN