This case was last updated from Pinellas County Courts on 02/08/2022 at 07:25:38 (UTC).

MIDLAND CREDIT MANAGEMENT INC Vs. ANDREW HATZITHEODOROU

Case Summary

On 01/18/2022 MIDLAND CREDIT MANAGEMENT INC filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against ANDREW HATZITHEODOROU. This case was filed in Pinellas County Courts, North County Branch Office - Circuit located in Pinellas, Florida. The case status is Not Classified By Court.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********3-SC

  • Filing Date:

    01/18/2022

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Pinellas, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MIDLAND CREDIT MANAGEMENT INC

Po Box 290335

Tampa, FL 33687

Defendant

HATZITHEODOROU, ANDREW

Tarpon Springs, FL 34689-2146

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

COLLEEN E LEHMANN

2121

Warren, MI 48090

 

Court Documents

CIVIL COVER SHEET - E-FILED

01/18/2022: CIVIL COVER SHEET - E-FILED

STATEMENT OF CLAIM

01/18/2022: STATEMENT OF CLAIM

SUMMONS - NOT ISSUED

01/18/2022: SUMMONS - NOT ISSUED

EXHIBIT

01/18/2022: EXHIBIT

SUMMONS - SERVED

01/26/2022: SUMMONS - SERVED

CIV_CLK_Notices_SCZoom331993917

01/21/2022: SMALL CLAIMS PRE-TRIAL NOTICE

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/04/2022
  • DocketSMALL CLAIMS PRE-TRIAL; (9:30 AM) (Judicial Officer SMALL CLAIMS JUDGE, NORTH)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2022
  • DocketSUMMONS - SERVED; Doc # 5; 01252022; Party: HATZITHEODOROU, ANDREW

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2022
  • FinancialPLAINTIFF; MIDLAND CREDIT MANAGEMENT INC; Total Financial Assessment; 185.00; Total Payments and Credits; 185.00; Balance Due 0.00; E-FILE PAYMENT; Receipt # EF-2022-02213; MIDLAND CREDIT MANAGEMENT INC; (185.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2022
  • FinancialPLAINTIFF; MIDLAND CREDIT MANAGEMENT INC; Total Financial Assessment; 185.00; Total Payments and Credits; 185.00; Balance Due 0.00; Transaction Assessment; 185.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2022
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET - E-FILED; Doc # 1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2022
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF CLAIM; Doc # 2

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2022
  • DocketSUMMONS - NOT ISSUED; Doc # 3; NOT USED BY CLERK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2022
  • DocketEXHIBIT; Doc # 4; SUMMARY OF ACCOUNT

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Midland Credit Management, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer LEHMANN, COLLEEN E