Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Florida Pinellas Court System on 01/15/2021 at 07:51:18 (UTC).

MICHAEL G ORLANDO Vs. BULOVA TECHNOLOGIES GROUP INC, et al

Case Summary

On 11/02/2017 MICHAEL G ORLANDO filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against BULOVA TECHNOLOGIES GROUP INC. This case was filed in Florida Pinellas Court System, Clearwater Branch Office - Circuit located in Pinellas, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is JIROTKA, GEORGE M. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********8-CI

  • Filing Date:

    11/02/2017

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    Florida Pinellas Court System

  • Courthouse:

    Clearwater Branch Office - Circuit

  • County, State:

    Pinellas, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

JIROTKA, GEORGE M

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ORLANDO, MICHAEL G

Jacksonville, FL 32207

Defendants

HAINES, ROBERT EDWARD

Largo, FL 33773

BULOVA TECHNOLOGIES GROUP INC

1501 Lake Ave. Se

Largo, FL 33771

TWISS TRANSPORT INC

1501 Lake Ave. Se

Largo, FL 33771

DISNEY WORLDWIDE SERVICES INC

1375 East Buena Vista Dr., 4Th Floor North

Lake Buena Vista, FL 32830

BT-TWISS TRANSPORT LLC

1501 Lake Ave. Se

Largo, FL 33771

WALT DISNEY PARKS AND RESORTS US INC DOING BUSINESS AS WALT DISNEY WORLD CO

1375 East Buena Vista Dr., 4Th Floor North

Lake Buena Vista, FL 32830

BIG RED EXPRESS TRUCKING LLC

DISNEY DESTINATIONS DOING BUSINESS AS DISNEY PARKS SUPPLY CHAIN MANAGEMENT

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

JOSEPH V CAMERLENGO

Attorney at TRUCK ACCIDENT LAW FIRM

1200 Riverplace Blvd Ste 902

Jacksonville, FL 32207

MICHAEL J LEIZERMAN

Attorney at LEIZERMAN AND ASSOCIATES LLC

3450 Central Ave #328

Toledo, OH 43606

Defendant Attorneys

GARY D VASQUEZ

Attorney at VASQUEZ AND TOSKO LLP

Landmark Center One 315 E Robinson St Ste 650

Orlando, FL 32801

ESTEBAN F SCORNIK

Attorney at VASQUEZ AND TOSKO LLP

Landmark Center One Ste 650 315 E Robinson St

Orlando, FL 32801

MICHAEL C MARKHAM

Attorney at JOHNSON POPE BOKOR

401 E Jackson St Ste 3100

Tampa, FL 33602

MICHAEL C MARKHAM, ESQ

Attorney at JOHNSON POPE BOKOR

401 E Jackson St Ste 3100

Tampa, FL 33602

ROBERT M FULTON

Attorney at HILL WARD HENDERSON PA

101 E Kennedy Blvd Ste 3700

Tampa, FL 33602

DENNIS P WAGGONER

Attorney at HILL WARD AND HENDERSON P A

101 E Kennedy Blvd Ste 3700

Tampa, FL 33602

NICOLE DUGA

Attorney at HILL WARD & HENDERSON P A

101 E Kennedy Blvd Ste 3700

Tampa, FL 33602

 

Court Documents

ORDER GRANTING

07/24/2018: ORDER GRANTING

NOTICE OF PRODUCTION FROM NON-PARTY

05/09/2018: NOTICE OF PRODUCTION FROM NON-PARTY

RESPONSE

03/08/2018: RESPONSE

DEF RESP'S MOTION TO DISMISS

03/02/2018: DEF-RESP'S MOTION TO DISMISS

DESIGNATION OF E-MAIL ADDRESS(ES)

02/28/2018: DESIGNATION OF E-MAIL ADDRESS(ES)

SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

11/02/2017: SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

11/02/2017: SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

11/02/2017: SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

CIVIL COVER SHEET

11/02/2017: CIVIL COVER SHEET

CIV_CLK_DismissalNotice317707728-293

08/09/2019: DISMISSAL NOTICE

CIV_CLK_DismissalNotice317707728-292

08/09/2019: DISMISSAL NOTICE

CIV_CLK_DismissalNotice317707728-290

08/09/2019: DISMISSAL NOTICE

CIV_CLK_DismissalNotice317707728-288

08/09/2019: DISMISSAL NOTICE

NOTICE OF FILING

09/20/2019: NOTICE OF FILING

AGREED ORDER

01/11/2021: AGREED ORDER

ORDER

06/17/2020: ORDER

CORRESPONDENCE TO COURT RE

06/01/2018: CORRESPONDENCE TO COURT RE

CORRESPONDENCE TO COURT RE

08/21/2018: CORRESPONDENCE TO COURT RE

30 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/11/2021
  • DocketAGREED ORDER; Doc # 38; ON DEFTS MTN TO DISMISS SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT IS MOOT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2021
  • DocketAGREED ORDER; Doc # 39; ON DEFT MTN TO DISMISS SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT IS MOOT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2020
  • DocketDEF-RESP'S MOTION TO DISMISS; Doc # 37; SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT OR FOR MORE DEFINITE STATEMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2020
  • DocketDEF-RESP'S MOTION TO DISMISS; Doc # 36; SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT OR FOR MORE DEFINITE STATEMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2020
  • DocketCORRESPONDENCE TO COURT RE; Doc # 33; PROPOSED ORDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2020
  • DocketCORRESPONDENCE TO COURT RE; Doc # 34; PROPOSED ORDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2020
  • DocketORDER; Doc # 35; SETTING CASE MGMT CONF 12172020 10:00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2019
  • DocketCANCELED; DISMISSAL DATE FOR LACK OF PROSECUTION; (12:00 AM) (Judicial Officer SCHAFER, WALTER L, JR); CURRENT ACTIVITY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2019
  • DocketNOTICE OF FILING; Doc # 32; ATTACHED COPY ORDER GRANTING JOINT MOTION TO CONSOLIDATE CASES FOR DISCOVERY AND PRE-TRIAL PURPOSES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2019
  • DocketNOTICE-LACK OF PROSECUTION MAILED TO ALL PARTIES; Doc # 31

    Read MoreRead Less
22 More Docket Entries
  • 11/03/2017
  • FinancialPLAINTIFF; ORLANDO, MICHAEL G; Total Financial Assessment; 462.50; Total Payments and Credits; 462.50; Balance Due 0.00; E-FILE PAYMENT; Receipt # EF-2017-37490; ORLANDO, MICHAEL G; (462.50)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2017
  • FinancialPLAINTIFF; ORLANDO, MICHAEL G; Total Financial Assessment; 462.50; Total Payments and Credits; 462.50; Balance Due 0.00; Transaction Assessment; 462.50

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2017
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET; Doc # 1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2017
  • DocketCOMPLAINT; Doc # 2

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2017
  • DocketSUMMONS TO BE ISSUED; Doc # 3; ISSUED; Party: BULOVA TECHNOLOGIES GROUP INC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2017
  • DocketSUMMONS TO BE ISSUED; Doc # 4; ISSUED; Party: TWISS TRANSPORT INC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2017
  • DocketSUMMONS TO BE ISSUED; Doc # 5; ISSUED; Party: BT-TWISS TRANSPORT LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2017
  • DocketSUMMONS TO BE ISSUED; Doc # 6; ISSUED; Party: DISNEY WORLDWIDE SERVICES INC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2017
  • DocketSUMMONS TO BE ISSUED; Doc # 7; ISSUED; Party: WALT DISNEY PARKS AND RESORTS US INC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2017
  • DocketSUMMONS TO BE ISSUED; Doc # 8; ISSUED; Party: HAINES, ROBERT EDWARD

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where BT-TWISS TRANSPORT LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where BIG RED EXPRESS TRUCKING LLC is a litigant