Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Florida Pinellas Court System on 01/14/2021 at 21:18:53 (UTC).

MICHAEL DORITY Vs. IHOP RESTAURANTS LLC,et al

Case Summary

On 10/13/2017 MICHAEL DORITY filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against IHOP RESTAURANTS LLC. This case was filed in Florida Pinellas Court System, St. Petersburg Branch Office - Circuit located in Pinellas, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are DAY, JACK and RAMSBERGER, THOMAS M. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0-CI

  • Filing Date:

    10/13/2017

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Court:

    Florida Pinellas Court System

  • Courthouse:

    St. Petersburg Branch Office - Circuit

  • County, State:

    Pinellas, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

DAY, JACK

RAMSBERGER, THOMAS M

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

DORITY, MICHAEL

St. Petersburg, FL 33712

Defendants

SUNSHINE RESTAURANT HOLDINGS LLC

C/O Karl Jaeger As Registered Agent 3060 Peachtree Road Nw S1560

Atlanta, GA 30305

SUNSHINE RESTAURANT MERGER SUB LLC

C/O C T Corporation System As Registered Agent 1200 S Pine Island Road

Plantation, FL 33324

CLEARWATER GRANDE HOLDINGS LLC

SUNSHINE RESTAURANT PARTNERS GP LLC

C/O Karl Jaeger

3060 Peachtree Rd. Nw, SUIT 1560

GK GABRIEL HOSTS INC

C/O Registered Agent Accounting & Tax Consulting 253 Corey Avenue

St Pete Beach, FL 33706

ALMERIA INC

C/O Registered Agent Jack R West 34701 Tranquiview Lane

Dade City, FL 33523

IHOP RESTAURANTS LLC

C/O Corporation Service Company 1201 Hays Street

Tallahassee, FL 32301

GUIRGUIS, GEORGE

St Petersburg, FL 33711

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

CHRISTOPHER R TURNER

801 N Magnolia Ave Suite 204

Orlando, FL 32803

Defendant Attorneys

TREVOR RHODES, ESQ

Attorney at BANKER LOPEZ GASSLER P A

501 E Kennedy Blvd Ste 1700

Tampa, FL 33602

BENJAMIN G LOPEZ, ESQ

Attorney at BANKER LOPEZ GASSLER P A

501 E Kennedy Blvd Ste 1700

Tampa, FL 33602

DAVID A TOWNSEND, ESQ

Attorney at TOWNSEND AND BRANNON

608 W Horatio St

Tampa, FL 33606-4104

 

Court Documents

RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

11/08/2018: RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

PRIVILEGE LOG

11/08/2018: PRIVILEGE LOG

PRIVILEGE LOG

11/08/2018: PRIVILEGE LOG

NOTICE OF SERVICE ANSWERS INTERROGATORIES

11/08/2018: NOTICE OF SERVICE ANSWERS INTERROGATORIES

MOTION

11/01/2018: MOTION

REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

02/14/2018: REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

ANSWER AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES OF

12/15/2017: ANSWER-AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES OF

DESIGNATION OF E-MAIL ADDRESS(ES)

12/15/2017: DESIGNATION OF E-MAIL ADDRESS(ES)

SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

10/13/2017: SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

ORDER OF REFERRAL

08/20/2020: ORDER OF REFERRAL

RESPONSE

08/10/2020: RESPONSE

NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION

07/28/2020: NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION

RESPONSE

07/21/2020: RESPONSE

DEF-RESP'S AMENDED MOTION

05/27/2020: DEF-RESP'S AMENDED MOTION

ATTORNEY COVER LETTER

09/19/2019: ATTORNEY COVER LETTER

NOTICE OF HEARING

09/18/2019: NOTICE OF HEARING

NOTICE OF SERVICE ANSWERS INTERROGATORIES

06/21/2019: NOTICE OF SERVICE ANSWERS INTERROGATORIES

MOTION

06/17/2019: MOTION

234 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/04/2020
  • DocketFINAL DISPOSITION FORM; Doc # 249

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2020
  • DocketCORRESPONDENCE TO COURT RE; Doc # 247; PROPOSED ORDER W/ATTACHMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2020
  • DocketORDER OF DISMISSAL; Doc # 248; WITH PREJUDICE; Vol./Book 21236, Page 1659, 2 pages

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2020
  • DocketDISMISSED-SETTLEMENT AFTER HRG (SRS DISPO); Doc # 245

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2020
  • DocketJOINT STIPULATION; Doc # 246; FOR DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2020
  • DocketNOTICE FINAL DISPOSITION OF REFERRAL; Doc # 244; SETTLED PRIOR TO ARBITRATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2020
  • DocketNOTICE OF CANCELLATION; Doc # 243; ON AMENDED NOTICE OF TELEPHONIC HEARING 10292020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2020
  • DocketNOTICE OF HEARING; Doc # 242; 11242020 9:00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2020
  • DocketAMENDED NOTICE OF HEARING; Doc # 241; 10292020 3:00 (TELEPHONIC)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2020
  • DocketNOTICE; Doc # 240; OF ARBITRATOR

    Read MoreRead Less
237 More Docket Entries
  • 10/17/2017
  • DocketREQUEST FOR PRODUCTION; Doc # 13

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/17/2017
  • DocketREQUEST FOR PRODUCTION; Doc # 14

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/17/2017
  • DocketREQUEST FOR PRODUCTION; Doc # 15

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2017
  • FinancialPLAINTIFF; DORITY, MICHAEL; Total Financial Assessment; 487.50; Total Payments and Credits; 487.50; Balance Due 0.00; E-FILE PAYMENT; Receipt # EF-2017-35084; DORITY, MICHAEL; (430.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2017
  • FinancialPLAINTIFF; DORITY, MICHAEL; Total Financial Assessment; 487.50; Total Payments and Credits; 487.50; Balance Due 0.00; Transaction Assessment; 430.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2017
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET; Doc # 1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2017
  • DocketCOMPLAINT; Doc # 2

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2017
  • DocketSUMMONS TO BE ISSUED; Doc # 3; ISSUED; Party: CLEARWATER GRANDE HOLDINGS LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2017
  • DocketSUMMONS TO BE ISSUED; Doc # 4; ISSUED; Party: IHOP RESTAURANTS LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2017
  • DocketSUMMONS TO BE ISSUED; Doc # 5; ISSUED; Party: SUNSHINE RESTAURANT PARTNERS GP LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Sunshine Restaurant Partners, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where SUNSHINE RESTAURANT MERGER SUB LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where IHOP Restaurants, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where SUNSHINE RESTAURANT HOLDINGS LLC is a litigant