This case was last updated from Pinellas County 6th Judicial Circuit Courts on 01/20/2023 at 03:45:55 (UTC).

MICHAEL D EYRE Vs. JEFFREY S ROXBY, et al

Case Summary

On 10/07/2022 MICHAEL D EYRE filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against JEFFREY S ROXBY,. This case was filed in Pinellas County 6th Judicial Circuit Courts, Clearwater Branch Office - Circuit located in Pinellas, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is JIROTKA, GEORGE M. The case status is Not Classified By Court.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********8-CI

  • Filing Date:

    10/07/2022

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Pinellas, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

JIROTKA, GEORGE M

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

EYRE, MICHAEL D AN INDIVDUAL

Holiday, FL 34691

Defendants

ROXBY, JEFFREY S AN INDIVDUAL

Brooksville, FL 34604-8276

SPECTRUM SUNSHINE STATE LLC A FOREIGN LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

C/O Corporation Service Company As Ra 1201 Hayes Street

Tallahassee, FL 32301

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

JOHN D ANDREOPOULOS

Attorney at ANDREOPOULOS LAW FIRM

1014 Us Hwy 19 N #110

Holiday, FL 34691

Defendant Attorneys

JOHN M BACIC

Attorney at FERRAINOLO LAW GROUP PA

4950 W Kennedy Blvd Ste 320

Tampa, FL 33609

PHILIP JAY SPENGLER II, ESQ

Attorney at FERRAINOLO LAW GROUP, P.A.

4950 West Kennedy Boulevard Suite 320

Tampa, FL 33609

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

10/10/2022: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

10/10/2022: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

SUMMONS - ISSUED

10/07/2022: SUMMONS - ISSUED

SUMMONS - ISSUED

10/07/2022: SUMMONS - ISSUED

COMPLAINT WITH DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

10/07/2022: COMPLAINT WITH DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

CIVIL COVER SHEET - E-FILED

10/07/2022: CIVIL COVER SHEET - E-FILED

NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION

01/18/2023: NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION

REQUEST

12/20/2022: REQUEST

RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

12/01/2022: RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

NOTICE OF SERVICE ANSWERS INTERROGATORIES

12/01/2022: NOTICE OF SERVICE ANSWERS INTERROGATORIES

RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

11/30/2022: RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

NOTICE OF SERVICE ANSWERS INTERROGATORIES

11/30/2022: NOTICE OF SERVICE ANSWERS INTERROGATORIES

RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

11/22/2022: RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

NOTICE OF SERVICE ANSWERS INTERROGATORIES

11/22/2022: NOTICE OF SERVICE ANSWERS INTERROGATORIES

CASE MANAGEMENT STATUS ORDER

11/11/2022: CASE MANAGEMENT STATUS ORDER

REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

11/01/2022: REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

11/01/2022: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

11/01/2022: RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

13 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/18/2023
  • DocketNOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION; Doc # 25; OF MICHAEL DAVID EYRE DUCEES TEUM VIA ZOOM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/20/2022
  • DocketREQUEST; Doc # 24; FOR DEISGNATION OF CORPORATE REPRESENTATIVE(S) TO BE DEPOSED ON BEHALF OF DEFENDANT SPECTRUM SUNSHINE STATE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/06/2022
  • DocketNOTICE OF PRODUCTION FROM NON-PARTY; Doc # 23; 12062022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/01/2022
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE ANSWERS INTERROGATORIES; Doc # 21

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/01/2022
  • DocketRESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION; Doc # 22

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/30/2022
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE ANSWERS INTERROGATORIES; Doc # 19

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/30/2022
  • DocketRESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION; Doc # 20

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/22/2022
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE ANSWERS INTERROGATORIES; Doc # 17; (FIRST SET)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/22/2022
  • DocketRESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION; Doc # 18; (FIRST REQUEST)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/11/2022
  • DocketCASE MANAGEMENT STATUS ORDER; Doc # 16

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
7 More Docket Entries
  • 10/10/2022
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES; Doc # 7

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/10/2022
  • DocketREQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS; Doc # 8

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/10/2022
  • DocketREQUEST FOR PRODUCTION; Doc # 9

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/10/2022
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES; Doc # 10

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/07/2022
  • FinancialPLAINTIFF; EYRE, MICHAEL D; Total Financial Assessment; 420.00; Total Payments and Credits; 420.00; Balance Due 0.00; E-FILE PAYMENT; Receipt # EF-2022-36414; EYRE, MICHAEL D; (420.00)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/07/2022
  • FinancialPLAINTIFF; EYRE, MICHAEL D; Total Financial Assessment; 420.00; Total Payments and Credits; 420.00; Balance Due 0.00; Transaction Assessment; 420.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/07/2022
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET - E-FILED; Doc # 1

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/07/2022
  • DocketCOMPLAINT WITH DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL; Doc # 2

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/07/2022
  • DocketSUMMONS - ISSUED; Doc # 3; Party:; ROXBY, JEFFREY S

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/07/2022
  • DocketSUMMONS - ISSUED; Doc # 4; Party:; SPECTRUM SUNSHINE STATE LLC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less