This case was last updated from Florida Pinellas Court System on 02/04/2020 at 08:01:53 (UTC).

MHC DOWN YONDER LLC Vs. JOHN PATRICK TANGUAY, et al

Case Summary

On 12/06/2019 MHC DOWN YONDER LLC filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against JOHN PATRICK TANGUAY. This case was filed in Florida Pinellas Court System, St. Petersburg Branch Office - County located in Pinellas, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is JAGGER, EDWIN. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********4-CO

  • Filing Date:

    12/06/2019

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Court:

    Florida Pinellas Court System

  • Courthouse:

    St. Petersburg Branch Office - County

  • County, State:

    Pinellas, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

JAGGER, EDWIN

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MHC DOWN YONDER LLC

5100 West Lemon Street Suite 109

Tampa, FL 33609

Defendants

TANGUAY, SHANNON LYNN

Largo, FL 33771

TANGUAY, JOHN PATRICK

Largo, FL 33771

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

STANLEY L MARTIN, ESQ

5100 West Lemon Street Suite 109

Tampa, FL 33609

 

Court Documents

SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

12/06/2019: SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED-POSTED

12/12/2019: SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED-POSTED

FINAL JUDGMENT- COUNT 1 POSSESSION

01/02/2020: FINAL JUDGMENT- COUNT 1 POSSESSION

SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

12/06/2019: SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED-POSTED

12/12/2019: SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED-POSTED

MOTION FOR FINAL JUDGMENT

12/27/2019: MOTION FOR FINAL JUDGMENT

ATTORNEY COVER LETTER

01/02/2020: ATTORNEY COVER LETTER

CERT OF MAILING - CO

CERT OF MAILING - CO

CERT OF MAILING - CO

12/13/2019: CERTIFICATE OF MAILING

MOTION FOR DEFAULT

12/27/2019: MOTION FOR DEFAULT

SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED-POSTED

12/12/2019: SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED-POSTED

AFFIDAVIT AS TO MILITARY SERVICE

12/27/2019: AFFIDAVIT AS TO MILITARY SERVICE

COMPLAINT - II COUNTS

12/06/2019: COMPLAINT - II COUNTS

CIVIL COVER SHEET - E-FILED

12/06/2019: CIVIL COVER SHEET - E-FILED

SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED-POSTED

12/12/2019: SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED-POSTED

WRIT OF POSSESSION

01/16/2020: WRIT OF POSSESSION

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/31/2020
  • DocketWRIT OF POSSESSION; Doc # 16; RETD EXECUTED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2020
  • DocketWRIT OF POSSESSION; Doc # 15; ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2020
  • DocketDEFAULT JUDGMENT (SRS DISPO); Doc # 12

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2020
  • DocketFINAL JUDGMENT- COUNT 1 POSSESSION; Doc # 13; IN FAVOR OF PLTF; Vol./Book 20835, Page 823, 1 pages

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2020
  • DocketATTORNEY COVER LETTER; Doc # 14

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2019
  • DocketDEFAULT ENTERED; Doc # 11; Party: TANGUAY, JOHN PATRICK; Party: TANGUAY, SHANNON LYNN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2019
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT AS TO MILITARY SERVICE; Doc # 8

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2019
  • DocketMOTION FOR FINAL JUDGMENT; Doc # 9; COUNT I; Party: MHC DOWN YONDER LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2019
  • DocketMOTION FOR DEFAULT; Doc # 10; ENTERED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2019
  • DocketCERTIFICATE OF MAILING; Doc # 7; Party: TANGUAY, JOHN PATRICK; Party: TANGUAY, SHANNON LYNN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2019
  • DocketSUMMONS RETURNED SERVED-POSTED; Doc # 5; 121119; Party: TANGUAY, JOHN PATRICK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2019
  • DocketSUMMONS RETURNED SERVED-POSTED; Doc # 6; 121119; Party: TANGUAY, SHANNON LYNN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • FinancialPLAINTIFF; MHC DOWN YONDER LLC; Total Financial Assessment; 205.00; Total Payments and Credits; 205.00; Balance Due 0.00; E-FILE PAYMENT; Receipt # EF-2019-46068; MHC DOWN YONDER LLC; (205.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • FinancialPLAINTIFF; MHC DOWN YONDER LLC; Total Financial Assessment; 205.00; Total Payments and Credits; 205.00; Balance Due 0.00; Transaction Assessment; 205.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • DocketCOMPLAINT - II COUNTS; Doc # 1; WITH ATTACHMENTS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET - E-FILED; Doc # 2

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • DocketSUMMONS TO BE ISSUED; Doc # 3; ISSUED; Party: TANGUAY, JOHN PATRICK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • DocketSUMMONS TO BE ISSUED; Doc # 4; ISSUED; Party: TANGUAY, SHANNON LYNN

    Read MoreRead Less