Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Florida Pinellas Court System on 01/13/2021 at 10:41:38 (UTC).

MELISSA SHEPHARD, et al Vs. TRUSTEES OF MEASE HOSPITAL INC, et al

Case Summary

On 07/28/2017 MELISSA SHEPHARD filed a Personal Injury - Medical Malpractice lawsuit against TRUSTEES OF MEASE HOSPITAL INC. This case was filed in Florida Pinellas Court System, Clearwater Branch Office - Circuit located in Pinellas, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is MEYER, KEITH. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0-CI

  • Filing Date:

    07/28/2017

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Medical Malpractice

  • Court:

    Florida Pinellas Court System

  • Courthouse:

    Clearwater Branch Office - Circuit

  • County, State:

    Pinellas, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

MEYER, KEITH

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

SHEPHARD, NICHOLAS

Tampa, FL 33609

SHEPHARD, BRAD

Tampa, FL 33609

SHEPHARD, MELISSA

Tampa, FL 33609

Defendants

ENVISION HEALTHCARE CORPORATION A FOREIGN PROFIT CORPORATION FORMERLY KNOWN AS EMERGENCY MEDICAL SERVICES CORPRATION

1201 Hays Street

Tallahassee, FL 32301-2525

EMCARE INC A FOREIGN PROFIT CORPORATION FORMERLY KNOWN AS EMCARE OF FLORIDA INC

Corporation Service Company 1201 Hays Street

Tallahassee, FL 32301

BAYCARE HEALTH SYSTEM INC DOING BUSINESS AS BAYCARE HEALTH SYSTEMS INC

Scott A Kizer Baycare Health Systems Inc Attn Legal Services Department 2985 Drew Street

Clearwater, FL 33759

UNKNOWN EKG TECHNICIAN

Clearwater, FL 33764

WINTER, FRANCIS, PA

Clearwater, FL 33764

COASTLINE EMERGENCY PHYSICIANS LLC

C/O Ra Corpoation Service Company 1201 Hays St

Tallahassee, FL 32301

CARBONERO-CAMUZZI, DIANA, DO

Clearwater, FL 33764

FLORIDA EM- I MEDICAL SERVICES PA ALSO KNOWN AS FLORIDA EM-1 MEDICAL SERVICES PA

C/O Ra Corporation Service Company 1201 Hays St

Tallahassee, FL 32301

TRUSTEES OF MEASE HOSPITAL INC DOING BUSINESS AS MEASE COUNTRYSIDE HOSPITAL

Scott A Kizer Baycare Health Systems Inc Attn Legal Services Department 2985 Drew Street

Clearwater, FL 33759

PEREZ-MACNEIL, THERESA, DO

Clearwater, FL 33764

BAYCARE PHYSICIAN PARTNERS LLC

C/O Ra Baycare Health Systems Inc Legal Services Department 2985 Drew St

Clearwater, FL 33759

ENVISION HEALTHCARE LOL BRANDED AS EMERGENCY MEDICAL SERVICES LP DOING BUSINESS AS EMCARE OF FLORIDA INC

Greenwood Village, CO 80111

PAYNE, DAVID, PA

Clearwater, FL 33764

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

JOHN W ANDREWS

Attorney at ANDREWS LAW GROUP

3220 Henderson Blvd

Tampa, FL 33609

Defendant Attorneys

HOWARD L CITRON, ESQ

Attorney at RISSMAN BARRETT HURT

6451 N Federal Hwy Ste 400

Ft Lauderdale, FL 33308

TODD A JENNINGS

Attorney at MACFARLANE FERGUSON & McMULLEN

625 Court St Ste 200

Clearwater, FL 33757

BRIAN J AUNGST, JR

Attorney at MACFARLANE FERGUSON MCMULLEN

1669

Clearwater, FL 33757

BRIAN J AUNGST JR, ESQ

Attorney at MACFARLANE FERGUSON MCMULLEN

1669

Clearwater, FL 33757

TODD A JENNINGS, ESQ

Attorney at MACFARLANE FERGUSON & MCMULLEN

1669

Clearwater, FL 33757

 

Court Documents

REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

11/02/2018: REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

NOTICE OF SERVICE EXPERT INTERROGATORIES

11/02/2018: NOTICE OF SERVICE EXPERT INTERROGATORIES

NOTICE OF SERVICE EXPERT INTERROGATORIES

11/02/2018: NOTICE OF SERVICE EXPERT INTERROGATORIES

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF

10/19/2018: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF

EXHIBIT

09/17/2018: EXHIBIT

AMENDED COMPLAINT

07/12/2018: AMENDED COMPLAINT

SUBPOENA DUCES TECUM W O DEPO

03/09/2018: SUBPOENA DUCES TECUM WITHOUT DEPO

NOTICE OF PRODUCTION FROM NON-PARTY

03/09/2018: NOTICE OF PRODUCTION FROM NON-PARTY

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF

01/19/2018: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF

NOTICE OF UNAVAILABILITY

12/17/2020: NOTICE OF UNAVAILABILITY

RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

06/15/2020: RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

REPLY

06/02/2020: REPLY

REQUEST FOR COPIES

06/01/2020: REQUEST FOR COPIES

NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION

05/12/2020: NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION

REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

04/24/2020: REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

01/21/2020: RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

AMENDED NOTICE OF TAKING DEPO

06/07/2019: AMENDED NOTICE OF TAKING DEPO

NOTICE OF MEDIATION CONFERENCE

04/11/2019: NOTICE OF MEDIATION CONFERENCE

365 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/12/2021
  • DocketSUPPLEMENTAL; Doc # 370; RESPONSES TO EXPERT BOECHER/SPRINGER REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION W/ATTACHMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF MEDIATION CONFERENCE; Doc # 369; 07212021 10:00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2020
  • DocketREQUEST FOR COPIES; Doc # 368

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2020
  • DocketDISCLOSURE; Doc # 365; (PRELIMINARY EXPERT WITNESS)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2020
  • DocketDISCLOSURE; Doc # 366; (PRELIMINARY FACT WITNESS)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2020
  • DocketNOTICE OF FILING; Doc # 367; AMENDED WITNESS LIST N COMPLIANCE W/CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE ORDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2020
  • DocketNOTICE OF UNAVAILABILITY; Doc # 364; AND ABSENCE FROM JURISDICTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2020
  • DocketWITNESS LIST; Doc # 363; PRELIMINARY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2020
  • DocketCOMPLIANCE WITH; Doc # 361; (AMENDED) WITH REQUEST FOR COPIES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2020
  • DocketCOMPLIANCE WITH; Doc # 362; REQUEST FOR COPIES

    Read MoreRead Less
364 More Docket Entries
  • 08/17/2017
  • DocketSUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (SUBSEQUENT PLEADINGS); ISSUED; Party: TRUSTEES OF MEASE HOSPITAL INC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2017
  • DocketSUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (SUBSEQUENT PLEADINGS); ISSUED; Party: BAYCARE HEALTH SYSTEM INC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2017
  • DocketSUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (SUBSEQUENT PLEADINGS); ISSUED; Party: BAYCARE PHYSICIAN PARTNERS LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2017
  • DocketSUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (SUBSEQUENT PLEADINGS); ISSUED; Party: COASTLINE EMERGENCY PHYSICIANS LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2017
  • DocketSUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (SUBSEQUENT PLEADINGS); ISSUED; Party: FLORIDA EM- I MEDICAL SERVICES PA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2017
  • DocketSUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (SUBSEQUENT PLEADINGS); NOT ISSUED / ENVISION HEALTH CORPORATION NOT A PARTY TO CASE; Party: ENVISION HEALTHCARE LOL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2017
  • FinancialPLAINTIFF; SHEPHARD, MELISSA; Total Financial Assessment; 540.00; Total Payments and Credits; 540.00; Balance Due 0.00; E-FILE PAYMENT; Receipt # EF-2017-26197; SHEPHARD, MELISSA; (415.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2017
  • FinancialPLAINTIFF; SHEPHARD, MELISSA; Total Financial Assessment; 540.00; Total Payments and Credits; 540.00; Balance Due 0.00; Transaction Assessment; 415.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2017
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2017
  • DocketCOMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where FLORIDA EM 1 MEDICAL SERVICES P A is a litigant

Latest cases where COASTLINE EMERGENCY PHYSICIANS LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where TRUSTEES OF MEASE HOSPITAL INC DOING BUSINESS AS MEASE COUNTRYSIDE HOSPITAL is a litigant

Latest cases where ENVISION HEALHCARE is a litigant