This case was last updated from Pinellas County 6th Judicial Circuit Courts on 01/21/2023 at 06:29:51 (UTC).

MELISSA PERRY Vs. PROGRESSIVE SELECT INSURANCE COMPANY

Case Summary

On 11/14/2022 MELISSA PERRY filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against PROGRESSIVE SELECT INSURANCE COMPANY. This case was filed in Pinellas County 6th Judicial Circuit Courts, St. Petersburg Branch Office - Circuit located in Pinellas, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is NEWTON, CYNTHIA J. The case status is Not Classified By Court.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********4-CI

  • Filing Date:

    11/14/2022

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Pinellas, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

NEWTON, CYNTHIA J

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

PERRY, MELISSA

Seminole, FL 33772

Defendant

PROGRESSIVE SELECT INSURANCE COMPANY

200 E Gaines Street

Tallahassee, FL 32399

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

AMY MARIE FERRERA

Attorney at MORGAN & MORGAN TAMPA PA

201 North Franklin St Seventh Floor

Tampa, FL 33602

 

Court Documents

CIVIL COVER SHEET - E-FILED

11/14/2022: CIVIL COVER SHEET - E-FILED

COMPLAINT WITH DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

11/14/2022: COMPLAINT WITH DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

SUMMONS - ISSUED

11/14/2022: SUMMONS - ISSUED

REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

11/14/2022: REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

11/14/2022: REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

11/14/2022: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

SUMMONS - SERVED

11/21/2022: SUMMONS - SERVED

NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE

01/04/2023: NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE

CASE MANAGEMENT STATUS ORDER

12/21/2022: CASE MANAGEMENT STATUS ORDER

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/04/2023
  • DocketNOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE; Doc # 9; Party:; PROGRESSIVE SELECT INSURANCE COMPANY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/04/2023
  • DocketCIVIL - CASE DISMISSED - BEFORE HEARING

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/21/2022
  • DocketCASE MANAGEMENT STATUS ORDER; Doc # 8

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/21/2022
  • DocketSUMMONS - SERVED; Doc # 7; 11152022; Party:; PROGRESSIVE SELECT INSURANCE COMPANY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/14/2022
  • FinancialPLAINTIFF; PERRY, MELISSA; Total Financial Assessment; 410.00; Total Payments and Credits; 410.00; Balance Due 0.00; E-FILE PAYMENT; Receipt # EF-2022-41120; PERRY, MELISSA; (410.00)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/14/2022
  • FinancialPLAINTIFF; PERRY, MELISSA; Total Financial Assessment; 410.00; Total Payments and Credits; 410.00; Balance Due 0.00; Transaction Assessment; 410.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/14/2022
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET - E-FILED; Doc # 1

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/14/2022
  • DocketCOMPLAINT WITH DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL; Doc # 2

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/14/2022
  • DocketSUMMONS - ISSUED; Doc # 3; Party:; PROGRESSIVE SELECT INSURANCE COMPANY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/14/2022
  • DocketREQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS; Doc # 4

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/14/2022
  • DocketREQUEST FOR PRODUCTION; Doc # 5

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/14/2022
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES; Doc # 6

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where PROGRESSIVE SELECT INSURANCE COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer FERRERA , AMY MARIE