Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Florida Pinellas Court System on 02/14/2021 at 03:11:43 (UTC).

MARY ELLEN TRIPPANY Vs. TJX COMPANIES INC, et al

Case Summary

On 12/23/2019 MARY ELLEN TRIPPANY filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against TJX COMPANIES INC. This case was filed in Florida Pinellas Court System, Clearwater Branch Office - Circuit located in Pinellas, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is MUSCARELLA, PATRICIA ANN. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********9-CI

  • Filing Date:

    12/23/2019

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Court:

    Florida Pinellas Court System

  • Courthouse:

    Clearwater Branch Office - Circuit

  • County, State:

    Pinellas, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

MUSCARELLA, PATRICIA ANN

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

TRIPPANY, MARY EELLEN

Tampa, FL 33602

TRIPPANY, MARY ELLEN

Tampa, FL 33602

Defendants

INVESTRUST PROPERTIES CORP

C/O Ct Corporation System R.A. 1200 South Pine Island Road

Plantation, FL 33602

TJX COMPANIES INC

C/O Ct Corporation Systems 1200 South Pine Island Road

Plantation, FL 33324

BONEL BUILDING CORPORATION INC

C/O Richard A Noble, Ra 3802 Gunn Highway

Carrollwood, FL 33618

SHANKUR, MANUPATO

Tampa, FL 33619

MILLSAP WATERPROOFING

Houston, TX 77092

IA ST PETERSBURG GATEWAY L.L.C

C/O Ct Corporation System 1200 South Pine Island Road

Plantation, FL 33324

NOBLE FAMILY LIMITED PARTNERSHIP

C/O Richard Noble, President And Registered Agent 4611 Landscape Drive

Tampa, FL 33624

SHANKUR, MANUPATO DOING BUSINESS AS QUALITY SEAL STRIPE AND PAVING COMPANY

Tampa, FL 33619

TJX COMPANIES INC DOING BUSINESS AS T J MAXX #0582

C/O Ct Corporation Systems 1200 South Pine Island Road

Plantation, FL 33324

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

KRISTIN KARBOWSKI

Attorney at MORGAN & MORGAN TAMPA PA

201 North Franklin St Seventh Floor

Tampa, FL 33602

Defendant Attorneys

JENNIFER J SEITZ, ESQ

Attorney at LUKS SANTANIELLO PETRILLO

100 N Tampa St Ste 2120

Tampa, FL 33602

ANTHONY J PETRILLO, ESQ

Attorney at LUKS SANTANIELLO PETRILLO

100 N Tampa St Ste 2120

Tampa, FL 33602

PAUL M WEEKLEY, ESQ

Attorney at WEEKLEY SCHULTE VALDES LLC

1635 N Tampa St Ste 100

Tampa, FL 33602-2629

BRIAN P HASKELL, ESQ

Attorney at CONROY SIMBERG

201 E Kennedy Blvd #900

Tampa, FL 33602

MEGAN B COLLINS, ESQ

Attorney at WEKLEY SCHULTE VALDES

1635 N Tampa St Ste 100

Tampa, FL 33602

 

Court Documents

DEF-RESP'S MOTION TO COMPEL DISCOVERY

01/15/2021: DEF-RESP'S MOTION TO COMPEL DISCOVERY

NOTICE OF HEARING

01/14/2021: NOTICE OF HEARING

EXHIBIT

12/18/2020: EXHIBIT

RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

10/08/2020: RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

REQUEST FOR COPIES

09/25/2020: REQUEST FOR COPIES

NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION

08/28/2020: NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION

REQUEST FOR COPIES

08/13/2020: REQUEST FOR COPIES

PRIVILEGE LOG

07/20/2020: PRIVILEGE LOG

NOTICE OF HEARING

07/02/2020: NOTICE OF HEARING

RESPONSE

06/26/2020: RESPONSE

REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

03/10/2020: REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

REQUEST FOR COPIES

03/04/2020: REQUEST FOR COPIES

NOTICE OF PRODUCTION FROM NON-PARTY

02/10/2020: NOTICE OF PRODUCTION FROM NON-PARTY

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

01/30/2020: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

01/27/2020: REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

ANSWER-AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES OF

01/22/2020: ANSWER-AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES OF

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

01/14/2020: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

DESIGNATION OF E-MAIL ADDRESS(ES)

01/10/2020: DESIGNATION OF E-MAIL ADDRESS(ES)

126 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/01/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION; Doc # 140; CROSS - ZOOM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION; Doc # 139; CROSS - ZOOM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION; Doc # 138

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2021
  • DocketMOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME FILED BY; Doc # 137; DEFENDANT 'S TO RESPOND TO [LAINTIFF'S REQUEST FOR ADMISSION AND DISCOVERY REQUEST; Party: SHANKUR, MANUPATO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2021
  • DocketREQUEST FOR COPIES; Doc # 134

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2021
  • DocketDEF-RESP'S MOTION TO COMPEL DISCOVERY; Doc # 135

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2021
  • DocketEXHIBIT; Doc # 136; EMAIL DATED 10262020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF HEARING; Doc # 133; 04272021 10:00 TELEPHONIC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2021
  • DocketDEF-RESP'S MOTION TO COMPEL; Doc # 132; DISCOVERY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2020
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE ANSWERS INTERROGATORIES; Doc # 131; (UPDATED)

    Read MoreRead Less
122 More Docket Entries
  • 12/23/2019
  • FinancialPLAINTIFF; TRIPPANY, MARY ELLEN; Total Financial Assessment; 475.00; Total Payments and Credits; 475.00; Balance Due 0.00; Transaction Assessment; 475.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2019
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET; Doc # 1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2019
  • DocketCOMPLAINT; Doc # 2

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2019
  • DocketSUMMONS TO BE ISSUED; Doc # 3; ISSUED; Party: BONEL BUILDING CORPORATION INC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2019
  • DocketSUMMONS TO BE ISSUED; Doc # 4; ISSUED; Party: IA ST PETERSBURG GATEWAY L.L.C

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2019
  • DocketSUMMONS TO BE ISSUED; Doc # 5; ISSUED; Party: INVESTRUST PROPERTIES CORP

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2019
  • DocketSUMMONS TO BE ISSUED; Doc # 6; ISSUED; Party: SHANKUR, MANUPATO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2019
  • DocketSUMMONS TO BE ISSUED; Doc # 7; ISSUED; Party: NOBLE FAMILY LIMITED PARTNERSHIP

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2019
  • DocketSUMMONS TO BE ISSUED; Doc # 8; ISSUED; Party: MILLSAP WATERPROOFING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2019
  • DocketSUMMONS TO BE ISSUED; Doc # 9; ISSUED; Party: TJX COMPANIES INC

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Bonel Building Corp Inc is a litigant

Latest cases where The TJX Companies, Inc. d/b/a T.J.Maxx is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer KARBOWSKI , KRISTIN ELYSE