This case was last updated from Florida Pinellas Court System on 02/04/2020 at 08:05:41 (UTC).

MARI JEAN HOTEL, LLC Vs. DEREK JOHNSON, et al

Case Summary

On 12/06/2019 MARI JEAN HOTEL, LLC filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against DEREK JOHNSON. This case was filed in Florida Pinellas Court System, St. Petersburg Branch Office - County located in Pinellas, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is JAGGER, EDWIN. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********1-CO

  • Filing Date:

    12/06/2019

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Court:

    Florida Pinellas Court System

  • Courthouse:

    St. Petersburg Branch Office - County

  • County, State:

    Pinellas, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

JAGGER, EDWIN

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MARI JEAN HOTEL, LLC

465 7Th Ave N

St Petersburg, FL 33701

Defendants

ALL OCCUPANTS

St Petersburg, FL 33713

JOHNSON, DEREK

St Petersburg, FL 33713

 

Court Documents

PLTF-PET'S MOTION FOR COURT DEFAULT

12/16/2019: PLTF-PET'S MOTION FOR COURT DEFAULT

SUMMONS ISSUED AT COUNTER

12/06/2019: SUMMONS ISSUED AT COUNTER

CERT OF MAILING - CO

12/06/2019: CERTIFICATE OF MAILING

PLTF-PET'S MOTION FOR DEFAULT

12/16/2019: PLTF-PET'S MOTION FOR DEFAULT

FINAL DISPOSITION FORM - FDFM

12/16/2019: FINAL DISPOSITION FORM

AUTHORIZATION TO REPRESENT

12/06/2019: AUTHORIZATION TO REPRESENT

PLTF-PET'S MOTION FOR FINAL JUDGMENT

12/16/2019: PLTF-PET'S MOTION FOR FINAL JUDGMENT

COMPLAINT - II COUNTS

12/06/2019: COMPLAINT - II COUNTS

THREE DAY NOTICE

12/06/2019: THREE DAY NOTICE

FINAL JUDGMENT- COUNT 1 POSSESSION

12/16/2019: FINAL JUDGMENT- COUNT 1 POSSESSION

CIVIL COVER SHEET

12/06/2019: CIVIL COVER SHEET

WRIT OF POSSESSION

01/09/2020: WRIT OF POSSESSION

SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED-POSTED

12/10/2019: SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED-POSTED

CERT OF MAILING - CO

CERT OF MAILING - CO

PLTF-PET'S MOTION FOR DEFAULT

12/16/2019: PLTF-PET'S MOTION FOR DEFAULT

FINAL JUDGMENT- COUNT 1 POSSESSION

12/16/2019: FINAL JUDGMENT- COUNT 1 POSSESSION

AFFIDAVIT AS TO MILITARY SERVICE

12/16/2019: AFFIDAVIT AS TO MILITARY SERVICE

WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED TO SHERIFF

12/30/2019: WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED TO SHERIFF

12 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/09/2020
  • DocketWRIT OF POSSESSION; Doc # 21; RETD EXECUTED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2019
  • DocketWRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED TO SHERIFF; Doc # 20; FOR STPETE BRANCH

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2019
  • FinancialPLAINTIFF; MARI JEAN HOTEL, LLC; Total Financial Assessment; 209.88; Total Payments and Credits; 209.88; Balance Due 0.00; Counter Payment; Receipt # SB-2019-20706; MARI JEAN HOTEL, LLC; (3.50)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2019
  • FinancialPLAINTIFF; MARI JEAN HOTEL, LLC; Total Financial Assessment; 209.88; Total Payments and Credits; 209.88; Balance Due 0.00; Transaction Assessment; 3.50

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2019
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT AS TO MILITARY SERVICE; Doc # 10; NONMILITARY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2019
  • DocketFINAL DISPOSITION FORM; Doc # 11

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2019
  • DocketFINAL JUDGMENT- COUNT 1 POSSESSION; Doc # 12; Vol./Book 20818, Page 1703, 1 pages

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2019
  • DocketPLTF-PET'S MOTION FOR FINAL JUDGMENT; Doc # 13

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2019
  • DocketPLTF-PET'S MOTION FOR COURT DEFAULT; Doc # 14; /ENTERED 121619

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2019
  • DocketPLTF-PET'S MOTION FOR DEFAULT; Doc # 15; NOT ENTERED / ANSWER FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
5 More Docket Entries
  • 12/10/2019
  • DocketSUMMONS RETURNED SERVED-POSTED; Doc # 8; 120719; Party: JOHNSON, DEREK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • FinancialPLAINTIFF; MARI JEAN HOTEL, LLC; Total Financial Assessment; 209.88; Total Payments and Credits; 209.88; Balance Due 0.00; Counter Payment; Receipt # SB-2019-20151; MARI JEAN HOTEL, LLC; (206.38)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • FinancialPLAINTIFF; MARI JEAN HOTEL, LLC; Total Financial Assessment; 209.88; Total Payments and Credits; 209.88; Balance Due 0.00; Transaction Assessment; 1.38

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • FinancialPLAINTIFF; MARI JEAN HOTEL, LLC; Total Financial Assessment; 209.88; Total Payments and Credits; 209.88; Balance Due 0.00; Transaction Assessment; 205.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • DocketCOMPLAINT - II COUNTS; Doc # 1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET; Doc # 2

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • DocketTHREE DAY NOTICE; Doc # 3

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • DocketAUTHORIZATION TO REPRESENT; Doc # 4

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED AT COUNTER; Doc # 5; FOR SERVICE BY PRIVATE PROCESS SERVER; Party: ALL OCCUPANTS; Party: JOHNSON, DEREK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • DocketCERTIFICATE OF MAILING; Doc # 6; Party: ALL OCCUPANTS; Party: JOHNSON, DEREK

    Read MoreRead Less