Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Florida Pinellas Court System on 02/10/2021 at 22:23:26 (UTC).

LVNV FUNDING LLC Vs. NICHOLAS PRUYNE

Case Summary

On 08/31/2019 LVNV FUNDING LLC filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against NICHOLAS PRUYNE. This case was filed in Florida Pinellas Court System, Clearwater Historic Courthouse - County located in Pinellas, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is CARASSAS, JOHN. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********4-SC

  • Filing Date:

    08/31/2019

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Florida Pinellas Court System

  • Courthouse:

    Clearwater Historic Courthouse - County

  • County, State:

    Pinellas, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

CARASSAS, JOHN

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

LVNV FUNDING LLC

801 International Parkway Suite 500

Lake Mary, FL 32746

Defendant

PRUYNE, NICHOLAS

Largo, FL 33770-1023

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

MICHELLE K HINES

Attorney at MANDARICH LAW GROUP LLP

P O Box 952289

Lake Mary, FL 32795

MICHELLE K HINES, ESQ

 

Court Documents

PRAECIPE FOR RECORDATION OF JDMT AS LIEN

03/12/2020: PRAECIPE FOR RECORDATION OF JDMT AS LIEN

FINAL JUDGMENT

10/14/2019: FINAL JUDGMENT

CORRESPONDENCE TO COURT RE

10/14/2019: CORRESPONDENCE TO COURT RE

AFFIDAVIT AS TO MILITARY SERVICE

10/09/2019: AFFIDAVIT AS TO MILITARY SERVICE

PLTF-PET'S MOTION FOR FINAL JUDGMENT

10/09/2019: PLTF-PET'S MOTION FOR FINAL JUDGMENT

CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE

10/21/2019: CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE

NOTICE RETURNED SERVED

09/09/2019: NOTICE RETURNED SERVED

SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

08/31/2019: SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

EXHIBIT

08/31/2019: EXHIBIT

CIVIL COVER SHEET - E-FILED

08/31/2019: CIVIL COVER SHEET - E-FILED

STATEMENT OF CLAIM

08/31/2019: STATEMENT OF CLAIM

SMALL CLAIMS PRE-TRIAL NOTICE

SMALL CLAIMS PRE-TRIAL NOTICE

SMALL CLAIMS DEFT PRE-TRIAL NOTICE

10/01/2019: SMALL CLAIMS PRE-TRIAL

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/17/2020
  • FinancialPLAINTIFF; LVNV FUNDING LLC; Total Financial Assessment; 198.00; Total Payments and Credits; 198.00; Balance Due 0.00; Counter Payment; Receipt # CV-2020-07610; LVNV FUNDING LLC; (13.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2020
  • FinancialPLAINTIFF; LVNV FUNDING LLC; Total Financial Assessment; 198.00; Total Payments and Credits; 198.00; Balance Due 0.00; Transaction Assessment; 13.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2020
  • DocketJUDGMENT LIEN (R); Doc # 16; Vol./Book 20929, Page 43, 1 pages

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2020
  • DocketPRAECIPE FOR RECORDATION OF JDMT AS LIEN; Doc # 17

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2019
  • DocketCERTIFICATE OF SERVICE; Doc # 15; 101419

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2019
  • DocketCORRESPONDENCE TO COURT RE; Doc # 12; PROPOSED JUDGMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2019
  • DocketJUDGMENT (SRS); Doc # 13

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2019
  • DocketFINAL JUDGMENT; Doc # 14; $1552.45 PRIN $241.48 COSTS; Vol./Book 20735, Page 2229, 1 pages

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2019
  • DocketPLTF-PET'S MOTION FOR FINAL JUDGMENT; Doc # 10; BY DEFAULT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2019
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT AS TO MILITARY SERVICE; Doc # 11; WITH ATTACHMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 09/09/2019
  • DocketNOTICE TO APPEAR - SERVED; Doc # 8

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2019
  • DocketNOTICE-STMT OF CLAIM-DEFT; Doc # 5; Party: PRUYNE, NICHOLAS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2019
  • DocketNOTICE TO PLTF-PLTF ATTY; Doc # 6

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2019
  • DocketSUMMONS-NOTICE EMAILED TO ATTY-PLTF FOR SERVICE; Doc # 7; Party: PRUYNE, NICHOLAS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2019
  • FinancialPLAINTIFF; LVNV FUNDING LLC; Total Financial Assessment; 198.00; Total Payments and Credits; 198.00; Balance Due 0.00; E-FILE PAYMENT; Receipt # EF-2019-33236; LVNV FUNDING LLC; (185.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2019
  • FinancialPLAINTIFF; LVNV FUNDING LLC; Total Financial Assessment; 198.00; Total Payments and Credits; 198.00; Balance Due 0.00; Transaction Assessment; 185.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2019
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF CLAIM; Doc # 1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2019
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET - E-FILED; Doc # 2

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2019
  • DocketEXHIBIT; Doc # 3; A SUMMARY OF ACCOUNT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2019
  • DocketSUMMONS TO BE ISSUED; Doc # 4; NOT USED BY CLERK

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where LVNV FUNDING LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer HINES, MICHELLE KIM