Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Florida Pinellas Court System on 04/23/2021 at 06:02:59 (UTC).

LVNV FUNDING LLC Vs. MICHAEL NOLEN

Case Summary

On 04/09/2021 LVNV FUNDING LLC filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against MICHAEL NOLEN. This case was filed in Florida Pinellas Court System, Clearwater Historic Courthouse - County located in Pinellas, Florida. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********7-SC

  • Filing Date:

    04/09/2021

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Florida Pinellas Court System

  • Courthouse:

    Clearwater Historic Courthouse - County

  • County, State:

    Pinellas, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

LVNV FUNDING LLC

801 International Parkway

Lake Mary, FL 32746

Defendant

NOLEN, MICHAEL

Clearwater, FL 33764-6371

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MICHELLE K HINES, ESQ

Attorney at MANDARICH LAW GROUP LLP

P O Box 952289

Lake Mary, FL 32795

 

Court Documents

NOTICE TO APPEAR - SERVED

04/19/2021: NOTICE TO APPEAR - SERVED

CIV_CLK_Notices_SCZoom327475656

04/13/2021: SMALL CLAIMS PRE-TRIAL NOTICE

EXHIBIT

04/09/2021: EXHIBIT

EXHIBIT

04/09/2021: EXHIBIT

SUMMONS NOT ISSUED

04/09/2021: SUMMONS NOT ISSUED

STATEMENT OF CLAIM

04/09/2021: STATEMENT OF CLAIM

CIVIL COVER SHEET - E-FILED

04/09/2021: CIVIL COVER SHEET - E-FILED

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/28/2021
  • DocketSMALL CLAIMS PRE-TRIAL; (10:30 AM) (Judicial Officer SMALL CLAIMS JUDGE, SOUTH)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2021
  • DocketNOTICE TO APPEAR - SERVED; Doc # 6; Party: NOLEN, MICHAEL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2021
  • FinancialPLAINTIFF; LVNV FUNDING LLC; Total Financial Assessment; 185.00; Total Payments and Credits; 185.00; Balance Due 0.00; E-FILE PAYMENT; Receipt # EF-2021-14012; LVNV FUNDING LLC; (185.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2021
  • FinancialPLAINTIFF; LVNV FUNDING LLC; Total Financial Assessment; 185.00; Total Payments and Credits; 185.00; Balance Due 0.00; Transaction Assessment; 185.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2021
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET - E-FILED; Doc # 1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2021
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF CLAIM; Doc # 2

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2021
  • DocketSUMMONS NOT ISSUED; Doc # 3; NOT USED BY CLERK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2021
  • DocketEXHIBIT; Doc # 4; A - ACCOUNT SUMMARY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2021
  • DocketEXHIBIT; Doc # 5; B - BILL OF SALE

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where LVNV FUNDING LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer HINES, MICHELLE KIM