This case was last updated from Pinellas County 6th Judicial Circuit Courts on 05/13/2022 at 08:09:21 (UTC).

LVNV FUNDING LLC Vs. MARKETA TEAL

Case Summary

On 03/14/2022 LVNV FUNDING LLC filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against MARKETA TEAL. This case was filed in Pinellas County 6th Judicial Circuit Courts, Clearwater Historic Courthouse - County located in Pinellas, Florida. The case status is Not Classified By Court.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********6-SC

  • Filing Date:

    03/14/2022

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Pinellas, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

LVNV FUNDING LLC

801 International Parkway Suite 500

Lake Mary, FL 32746

Defendant

TEAL, MARKETA

Saint Petersburg, FL 33705-4333

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

ANDREA M ROEBUCK, ESQ

Attorney at MANDARICH LAW GROUP LLP

Post Office Box 952289

Lake Mary, FL 32795

Defendant Attorney

DAVID D ORR, ESQ

2706 Alt Us-19 North Suite 213

Palm Harbor, FL 34683

 

Court Documents

CIVIL COVER SHEET - E-FILED

03/14/2022: CIVIL COVER SHEET - E-FILED

STATEMENT OF CLAIM

03/14/2022: STATEMENT OF CLAIM

SUMMONS - NOT ISSUED

03/14/2022: SUMMONS - NOT ISSUED

EXHIBIT

03/14/2022: EXHIBIT

EXHIBIT

03/14/2022: EXHIBIT

CIV_CLK_Notices_SCZoom332905209

03/16/2022: SMALL CLAIMS PRE-TRIAL NOTICE

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

03/29/2022: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

SUMMONS - SERVED

03/30/2022: SUMMONS - SERVED

NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE

04/06/2022: NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/20/2022
  • DocketCANCELED; SMALL CLAIMS PRE-TRIAL; (2:30 PM) (Judicial Officer JAGGER, EDWIN); CASE DISMISSED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/06/2022
  • DocketNOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE; Doc # 8; Party: TEAL, MARKETA

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/06/2022
  • DocketSMALL CLAIMS - CASE DISMISSED - BEFORE HEARING

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/30/2022
  • DocketSUMMONS - SERVED; Doc # 7; PERSONAL; Party: TEAL, MARKETA

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/29/2022
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE; Doc # 6

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/14/2022
  • FinancialPLAINTIFF; LVNV FUNDING LLC; Total Financial Assessment; 185.00; Total Payments and Credits; 185.00; Balance Due 0.00; E-FILE PAYMENT; Receipt # EF-2022-09180; LVNV FUNDING LLC; (185.00)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/14/2022
  • FinancialPLAINTIFF; LVNV FUNDING LLC; Total Financial Assessment; 185.00; Total Payments and Credits; 185.00; Balance Due 0.00; Transaction Assessment; 185.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/14/2022
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET - E-FILED; Doc # 1

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/14/2022
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF CLAIM; Doc # 2

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/14/2022
  • DocketSUMMONS - NOT ISSUED; Doc # 3; NOT USED BY CLERK

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/14/2022
  • DocketEXHIBIT; Doc # 4; A SUMMARY OF ACCOUNT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/14/2022
  • DocketEXHIBIT; Doc # 5; B BILL OF SALE AND ASSIGNMENT OF ACCOUNTS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less