This case was last updated from Florida Pinellas Court System on 10/08/2021 at 07:09:19 (UTC).

LVNV FUNDING LLC Vs. JESSE ALLEN

Case Summary

On 09/17/2021 LVNV FUNDING LLC filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against JESSE ALLEN. This case was filed in Florida Pinellas Court System, North County Branch Office - Circuit located in Pinellas, Florida. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********9-SC

  • Filing Date:

    09/17/2021

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Pinellas, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

LVNV FUNDING LLC

C/O Andrea M Roebuck Esq Po Box 952289

Lake Mary, FL 32795

Defendant

ALLEN, JESSE

Gulfport, FL 33707

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

ANDREA M ROEBUCK, ESQ

Attorney at MANDARICH LAW GROUP LLP

Post Office Box 952289

Lake Mary, FL 32795

 

Court Documents

CIV_CLK_Notices_SCZoom330071264

09/21/2021: SMALL CLAIMS PRE-TRIAL NOTICE

EXHIBIT

09/15/2021: EXHIBIT

EXHIBIT

09/15/2021: EXHIBIT

COMPLAINT

09/15/2021: COMPLAINT

CIVIL COVER SHEET

09/15/2021: CIVIL COVER SHEET

SUMMONS NOT ISSUED

09/17/2021: SUMMONS NOT ISSUED

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/13/2021
  • DocketSMALL CLAIMS PRE-TRIAL; (10:30 AM) (Judicial Officer SMALL CLAIMS JUDGE, NORTH)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2021
  • FinancialPLAINTIFF; LVNV FUNDING LLC; Total Financial Assessment; 185.00; Total Payments and Credits; 185.00; Balance Due 0.00; Counter Payment; Receipt # CV-2021-22250; LVNV FUNDING LLC; (185.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2021
  • FinancialPLAINTIFF; LVNV FUNDING LLC; Total Financial Assessment; 185.00; Total Payments and Credits; 185.00; Balance Due 0.00; Transaction Assessment; 185.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2021
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET; Doc # 1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2021
  • DocketCOMPLAINT; Doc # 2

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2021
  • DocketEXHIBIT; Doc # 3; A ACCOUNT STATEMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2021
  • DocketEXHIBIT; Doc # 4; B BILL OF SALE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2021
  • DocketSUMMONS NOT ISSUED; Doc # 5; NOT USED BY CLERK

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where LVNV FUNDING LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer ROEBUCK , ANDREA M