This case was last updated from Pinellas County 6th Judicial Circuit Courts on 01/25/2023 at 20:08:09 (UTC).

LIZA SEFERYAN Vs. PROGRESSIVE AMERICAN INSURANCE CO

Case Summary

On 10/27/2022 LIZA SEFERYAN filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against PROGRESSIVE AMERICAN INSURANCE CO. This case was filed in Pinellas County 6th Judicial Circuit Courts, Clearwater Branch Office - Circuit located in Pinellas, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is JIROTKA, GEORGE M. The case status is Not Classified By Court.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********3-CI

  • Filing Date:

    10/27/2022

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Pinellas, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

JIROTKA, GEORGE M

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SEFERYAN, LIZA

Orlando, FL 32801

Defendant

PROGRESSIVE AMERICAN INSURANCE CO

200 E. Gaines St.

Tallahassee, FL 32399

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MATTHEW A RABIN

189 S Orange Ave Suite 850

Orlando, FL 32832

Defendant Attorney

SHAQUANA C HARPER, ESQ

Attorney at LAW OFFICE OF ERICK D MARTIN BUILDING A SUITE

100 4030 Crescent Park Dr

Riverview, FL 33578

 

Court Documents

SUMMONS - ISSUED

10/27/2022: SUMMONS - ISSUED

COMPLAINT WITH DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

10/27/2022: COMPLAINT WITH DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

10/27/2022: REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

10/27/2022: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

CIVIL COVER SHEET - E-FILED

10/27/2022: CIVIL COVER SHEET - E-FILED

REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

10/27/2022: REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

01/13/2023: RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

01/13/2023: RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF

01/13/2023: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF

NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION

12/16/2022: NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION

RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

12/13/2022: RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

12/13/2022: RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

DENIAL OF AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

12/07/2022: DENIAL OF AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

CASE MANAGEMENT STATUS ORDER

12/05/2022: CASE MANAGEMENT STATUS ORDER

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

11/18/2022: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

11/18/2022: REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

11/18/2022: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

11/18/2022: REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

8 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/13/2023
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE OF; Doc # 18

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/13/2023
  • DocketRESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS; Doc # 19

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/13/2023
  • DocketRESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION; Doc # 20

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/16/2022
  • DocketNOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION; Doc # 17; LIZA SEFERYAN

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/13/2022
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE ANSWERS INTERROGATORIES; Doc # 14

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/13/2022
  • DocketRESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS; Doc # 15

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/13/2022
  • DocketRESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION; Doc # 16

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/07/2022
  • DocketDENIAL OF AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES; Doc # 13

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/05/2022
  • DocketCASE MANAGEMENT STATUS ORDER; Doc # 12

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/18/2022
  • DocketANSWER, AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES, DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL; Doc # 7; Party:; PROGRESSIVE AMERICAN INSURANCE CO

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 11/18/2022
  • DocketREQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS; Doc # 10

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/18/2022
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE; Doc # 11; AND EMAIL DESIGNATION; Party:; PROGRESSIVE AMERICAN INSURANCE CO

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/28/2022
  • FinancialPLAINTIFF; SEFERYAN, LIZA; Total Financial Assessment; 410.00; Total Payments and Credits; 410.00; Balance Due 0.00; E-FILE PAYMENT; Receipt # EF-2022-38949; SEFERYAN, LIZA; (410.00)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/28/2022
  • FinancialPLAINTIFF; SEFERYAN, LIZA; Total Financial Assessment; 410.00; Total Payments and Credits; 410.00; Balance Due 0.00; Transaction Assessment; 410.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/27/2022
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET - E-FILED; Doc # 1

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/27/2022
  • DocketCOMPLAINT WITH DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL; Doc # 2

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/27/2022
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES; Doc # 3

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/27/2022
  • DocketREQUEST FOR PRODUCTION; Doc # 4

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/27/2022
  • DocketREQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS; Doc # 5

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/27/2022
  • DocketSUMMONS - ISSUED; Doc # 6; Party:; PROGRESSIVE AMERICAN INSURANCE CO

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less