This case was last updated from Florida Pinellas Court System on 06/27/2021 at 20:01:14 (UTC).

LEONARDO BARREDO Vs. ASHLEY GEORGE, et al

Case Summary

On 03/29/2021 LEONARDO BARREDO filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against ASHLEY GEORGE. This case was filed in Florida Pinellas Court System, St. Petersburg Branch Office - Circuit located in Pinellas, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is RAMSBERGER, THOMAS M. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********8-CI

  • Filing Date:

    03/29/2021

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Courthouse:

    St. Petersburg Branch Office - Circuit

  • County, State:

    Pinellas, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

RAMSBERGER, THOMAS M

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

BARREDO, LEONARDO

Tampa, FL 33602

Defendants

HOUSTON, LAUREN

Tampa, FL 33602

GEORGE, ASHLEY

Tampa, FL 33602

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

R RYAN SAINZ

Attorney at MORGAN & MORGAN TAMPA PA

One Tampa City Center 201 No Franklin St 7Th Floor

Tampa, FL 33602

Defendant Attorneys

CURTIS N IHLER, ESQ

Attorney at LAW OFFICE OF TERRYL BLACKMON WALKER

600 N Westshore Blvd Ste 300

Tampa, FL 33609

LISA M ORGA, ESQ

Attorney at LAW OFFICE OF TERRYL BLACKMAN WALKER

600 N Westshore Blvd Ste 300

Tampa, FL 33609

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF SERVICE ANSWERS INTERROGATORIES

06/11/2021: NOTICE OF SERVICE ANSWERS INTERROGATORIES

RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

06/02/2021: RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

06/02/2021: RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

06/23/2021: REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

05/11/2021: REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

05/11/2021: REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

05/11/2021: RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

05/11/2021: RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

SUMMONS - SERVED

05/03/2021: SUMMONS - SERVED

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

05/21/2021: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

03/29/2021: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

03/29/2021: REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

03/29/2021: REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

03/29/2021: REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

COMPLAINT

03/29/2021: COMPLAINT

SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

03/29/2021: SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

SUMMONS - ISSUED

03/29/2021: SUMMONS - ISSUED

CIVIL COVER SHEET - E-FILED

03/29/2021: CIVIL COVER SHEET - E-FILED

15 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/23/2021
  • DocketREQUEST FOR PRODUCTION; Doc # 28

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE ANSWERS INTERROGATORIES; Doc # 26; (MOTOR VEHICLE NEGLIGENCE)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2021
  • DocketRESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS; Doc # 27

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE ANSWERS INTERROGATORIES; Doc # 25

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2021
  • DocketRESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION; Doc # 23

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2021
  • DocketRESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION; Doc # 24

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE; Doc # 22; /DESIGNATION OF E-MAIL ADDRESS(ES)/NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ATTY; Party: GEORGE, ASHLEY; Party: HOUSTON, LAUREN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2021
  • DocketDEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL; Doc # 14

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE; Doc # 15; AND DESIGNATION OF E-MAIL ADDRESSES; Party: GEORGE, ASHLEY; Party: HOUSTON, LAUREN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2021
  • DocketANSWER-AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES OF; Doc # 16; Party: GEORGE, ASHLEY; Party: HOUSTON, LAUREN

    Read MoreRead Less
10 More Docket Entries
  • 03/29/2021
  • DocketSUMMONS - ISSUED; Doc # 2; Party: HOUSTON, LAUREN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2021
  • DocketSUMMONS TO BE ISSUED; Doc # 3

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2021
  • DocketCOMPLAINT; Doc # 4

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2021
  • DocketREQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS; Doc # 5

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2021
  • DocketREQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS; Doc # 6

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2021
  • DocketREQUEST FOR PRODUCTION; Doc # 7

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2021
  • DocketREQUEST FOR PRODUCTION; Doc # 8

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2021
  • DocketDESIGNATION OF E-MAIL ADDRESS(ES); Doc # 9

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES; Doc # 10

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES; Doc # 11

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer R RYAN SAINZ