Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Florida Pinellas Court System on 02/11/2021 at 07:13:47 (UTC).

LCM IMAGING INC, AS ASSIGNEE OF- FOR DONTAY BRADFORD HALL Vs. STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY

Case Summary

On 09/11/2019 LCM IMAGING INC, AS ASSIGNEE OF- FOR DONTAY BRADFORD HALL filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY. This case was filed in Florida Pinellas Court System, North County Branch Office - Circuit located in Pinellas, Florida. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********8-SC

  • Filing Date:

    09/11/2019

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Florida Pinellas Court System

  • Courthouse:

    North County Branch Office - Circuit

  • County, State:

    Pinellas, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

LCM IMAGING INC DOING BUSINESS AS ADVANCED DIAGNOSTIC GROUP AS ASSIGNEE OF- FOR HALL, DONTAY BRADFORD

6415 Lake Worth Road, Suite 305

Lake Worth, FL 33463

Defendant

STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY

C/O Fl Chief Financial Officer As Ra Po Box 6200

Tallahassee, FL 32314-6200

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

STEPHEN DEITSCH

Attorney at DEITSCH AND DEITSCH PLLC

420 South State Road 7 Suite 114

Royal Palm Beach, FL 33414

Defendant Attorney

ROBERT H OXENDINE, ESQ

Attorney at OXENDINE & OXENDINE P A

14428 Bruce B Downs Blvd

Tampa, FL 33613

 

Court Documents

RESPONSE

07/10/2020: RESPONSE

NOTICE OF FILING

06/25/2020: NOTICE OF FILING

JOINT STIPULATION

06/25/2020: JOINT STIPULATION

EXHIBIT

05/20/2020: EXHIBIT

DEF-RESP'S MOTION

05/20/2020: DEF-RESP'S MOTION

DEF-RESP'S MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME

11/15/2019: DEF-RESP'S MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME

AMENDED NOTICE OF HEARING

02/09/2021: AMENDED NOTICE OF HEARING

RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

10/11/2019: RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

AGREED ORDER

10/08/2019: AGREED ORDER

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

10/04/2019: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

10/04/2019: REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

REPLY TO AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

10/01/2019: REPLY TO AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

09/26/2019: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

DESIGNATION OF E-MAIL ADDRESS(ES)

09/26/2019: DESIGNATION OF E-MAIL ADDRESS(ES)

ANSWER-AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES OF

09/26/2019: ANSWER-AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES OF

NOTICE OF FILING

09/23/2019: NOTICE OF FILING

STATEMENT OF CLAIM

09/11/2019: STATEMENT OF CLAIM

SMALL CLAIMS DEFT PRE-TRIAL NOTICE

10/08/2019: SMALL CLAIMS PRE-TRIAL

19 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/09/2021
  • DocketAMENDED NOTICE OF HEARING; Doc # 33; 03102021 1:45

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF HEARING; Doc # 32; 03102021 1:30 (TELEPHONIC)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2020
  • DocketRESPONSE; Doc # 31; TO AMENDED AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2020
  • DocketORDER; Doc # 30; ON JOINT STIPULATION GRANTING MOTION AMEND ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2020
  • DocketPLTF-PET'S MOTION TO COMPEL; Doc # 29; DEPOSITION OF DEFT CORP REP

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2020
  • DocketCANCELED; DISMISSAL-FAILURE TO PROSECUTE-SC; (12:00 AM) (Judicial Officer CARASSAS, JOHN); CURRENT ACTIVITY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2020
  • DocketJOINT STIPULATION; Doc # 27; GRANTING DEFT MOITON TO AMEND ANSWER/AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2020
  • DocketNOTICE OF FILING; Doc # 28; GOOD CAUSE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/29/2020
  • DocketNOTICE-LACK OF PROSECUTION MAILED TO ALL PARTIES; Doc # 26

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2020
  • DocketDEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL; Doc # 22

    Read MoreRead Less
17 More Docket Entries
  • 09/26/2019
  • DocketDESIGNATION OF E-MAIL ADDRESS(ES); Doc # 7; Party: STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2019
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES; Doc # 8

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2019
  • DocketREQUEST FOR PRODUCTION; Doc # 9

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2019
  • DocketNOTICE OF FILING; Doc # 5; ATTACHED NOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROCESS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2019
  • DocketNOTICE-STMT OF CLAIM-DEFT; Doc # 2; Party: STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2019
  • DocketNOTICE TO PLTF-PLTF ATTY; Doc # 3

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2019
  • DocketSUMMONS-NOTICE EMAILED TO ATTY-PLTF FOR SERVICE; Doc # 4; Party: STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/12/2019
  • FinancialPLAINTIFF; LCM IMAGING INC; Total Financial Assessment; 90.00; Total Payments and Credits; 90.00; Balance Due 0.00; E-FILE PAYMENT; Receipt # EF-2019-34423; LCM IMAGING INC; (90.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/12/2019
  • FinancialPLAINTIFF; LCM IMAGING INC; Total Financial Assessment; 90.00; Total Payments and Credits; 90.00; Balance Due 0.00; Transaction Assessment; 90.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2019
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF CLAIM; Doc # 1; WITH ATTACHMENTS

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where LCM IMAGING, INC is a litigant

Latest cases where State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer STEPHEN DEITSCH