This case was last updated from Pinellas County 6th Judicial Circuit Courts on 03/12/2021 at 16:13:20 (UTC).

LAKIESHA DEBARROS vs. TORELLE LADONN ELLINGTON

Case Summary

On 06/14/2011 LAKIESHA DEBARROS filed a Family - Other Family lawsuit against TORELLE LADONN ELLINGTON. This case was filed in Pinellas County 6th Judicial Circuit Courts, Criminal Justice Center - Circuit located in Pinellas, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is PIERCE, JAMES. The case status is Not Classified By Court.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********9-FD

  • Filing Date:

    06/14/2011

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Family - Other Family

  • County, State:

    Pinellas, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

PIERCE, JAMES

 

Party Details

Petitioner

DEBARROS, LAKIESHA

Respondent

ELLINGTON, TORELLE LADONN

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/08/2011
  • DocketORDER OF DISMISSAL; Comment: ORDER OF DISMISSAL - COPY - RETD BY PO; VER: F; P

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/08/2011
  • DocketORDER OF DISMISSAL; Comment: ORDER OF DISMISSAL - COPY - RETD BY PO; VER: F; D

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/07/2011
  • DocketFINAL DISPOSITION FORM; Comment: FINAL DISPOSITION FORM; VER: F; K

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/28/2011
  • DocketORDER OF DISMISSAL OF INJUNCTION (SRS DISPO); Comment: ORDER OF DISMISSAL OF INJUNCTION OR17298PG0035-001; VER: F; P; Vol./Book 17298, Page 0035, 001 pages

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/24/2011
  • DocketTHIS CASE ASSIGNED BY CLERK TO SECTION; Comment: CASE ASSIGNED SECTION U02 FROM SECTION 023 BY 0168 - MANUAL C; VER: N; P

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/23/2011
  • DocketHEARING; (10:00 AM) (Judicial Officer PIERCE, JAMES)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/22/2011
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT-SERVICE OF PROCESS; Comment: AFFIDAVIT/SERVICE OF PROCESS TEMP INJUNCTION; VER: F; P

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/17/2011
  • DocketORDER; Comment: ORDER DIRECTING CLERK TO REASSIGN SECTION; VER: F; P

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/17/2011
  • DocketNOTICE; Comment: NOTICE 062811 @ 1:00; VER: F; P

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/17/2011
  • DocketORDER; Comment: ORDER EXTENDING INJUNCTION FOR PROTECTION; VER: F; P

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/14/2011
  • DocketCC PETITION WITH ATTACHMENTS TO SHF; Comment: C/C PETITION W/ATTACHMENTS TO SHF; VER: F; P

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/14/2011
  • DocketNON-WAIVER OF RETURN HEARING; Comment: NON-WAIVER OF RETURN HEARING; VER: F; P

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/14/2011
  • DocketTEMPORARY INJUNCTION WITHOUT NOTICE; Comment: TEMPORARY INJUNCTION W/O NOTICE 062311/1000; VER: F; P

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/14/2011
  • DocketCASE CALENDARED FOR; Comment: CASE CALENDARED FOR 062311 10:00; VER: N; P

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/14/2011
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT-DECLARATION UNIFORM CHILD CUSTODY; Comment: AFFIDAVIT/DECLARATION UNIFORM CHILD CUSTODY; VER: F; P

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/14/2011
  • DocketCLERK'S INFORMATION SHEET; Comment: CLERKS INFORMATION SHEET; VER: F; K

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/14/2011
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET; Comment: CIVIL COVER SHEET; VER: F; P

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/14/2011
  • DocketPETITION (SRS); Comment: PETITION; VER: F; P

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/14/2011
  • DocketTHIS CASE ASSIGNED BY CLERK TO SECTION; Comment: THIS CASE ASSIGNED BY CLERK TO SECTION 023 BY 7099 - RANDOM FD; VER: N; P

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/14/2011
  • DocketCASE FILED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less