This case was last updated from Florida Pinellas Court System on 07/15/2021 at 20:03:03 (UTC).

KISHA L MORRIS, et al Vs. JENNIFER C BARNES, et al

Case Summary

On 04/16/2021 KISHA L MORRIS filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against JENNIFER C BARNES. This case was filed in Florida Pinellas Court System, St. Petersburg Branch Office - Circuit located in Pinellas, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is RAMSBERGER, THOMAS M. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********3-CI

  • Filing Date:

    04/16/2021

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Pinellas, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

RAMSBERGER, THOMAS M

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

MORRIS, GERRALD P, SR

Tampa, FL 33602

MORRIS, KISHA L

Tampa, FL 33602

Defendants

BARNES, JENNIFER C

Dade City, FL 33525

BARNES, ADAM C

Dade City, FL 33525

EMPATH HEALTH INC

5771 Roosevelt Blvd

Clearwater, FL 33760

HOSPICE OF THE FLORIDA SUNCOAST INC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant and Plaintiff Attorneys

JOHN A GUYTON III, ESQ

Attorney at RYWANT ALVAREZ JONES

302 Knights Run Ave Ste 1000

Tampa, FL 33602

BRANDON R SCHEELE, ESQ

Attorney at BANKER LOPEZ GASSLER P A

501 E Kennedy Blvd Ste 1700

Tampa, FL 33602

TODD M SMAYDA, ESQ

Attorney at QUINTAIROS PRIETO WOOD

1410 N West Shore Blvd Ste 200

Tampa, FL 33607

PETER J MOLINELLI, ESQ

Attorney at QUINTAIROS PRIETO WOOD

1410 N Westshore Blvd Ste 200

Tampa, FL 33607

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF SERVICE ANSWERS INTERROGATORIES

07/07/2021: NOTICE OF SERVICE ANSWERS INTERROGATORIES

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

07/02/2021: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

ANSWER-AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES OF

06/23/2021: ANSWER-AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES OF

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

06/23/2021: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

ORDER APPROVING

05/26/2021: ORDER APPROVING

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

07/08/2021: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

JOINT STIPULATION

05/25/2021: JOINT STIPULATION

REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

05/13/2021: REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF

05/13/2021: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF

NOTICE OF PRODUCTION FROM NON-PARTY

05/03/2021: NOTICE OF PRODUCTION FROM NON-PARTY

REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

05/03/2021: REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

SUMMONS - SERVED

04/23/2021: SUMMONS - SERVED

REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

04/23/2021: REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

04/23/2021: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

NOTICE OF FILING

04/27/2021: NOTICE OF FILING

SUMMONS - ISSUED

04/16/2021: SUMMONS - ISSUED

SUMMONS - ISSUED

04/16/2021: SUMMONS - ISSUED

CIVIL COVER SHEET - E-FILED

04/16/2021: CIVIL COVER SHEET - E-FILED

31 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/08/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE; Doc # 47; AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL AND AMENDED NOTICE OF DESIGNATION OF EMAIL; Party: BARNES, ADAM C; Party: BARNES, JENNIFER C; Party: HOSPICE OF THE FLORIDA SUNCOAST INC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE ANSWERS INTERROGATORIES; Doc # 45

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE ANSWERS INTERROGATORIES; Doc # 46

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES; Doc # 41

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES; Doc # 42

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2021
  • DocketREQUEST FOR PRODUCTION; Doc # 43

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2021
  • DocketREQUEST FOR PRODUCTION; Doc # 44

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2021
  • DocketREPLY TO AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES; Doc # 40

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2021
  • DocketDEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL; Doc # 37

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE; Doc # 38; Party: BARNES, ADAM C; Party: BARNES, JENNIFER C; Party: HOSPICE OF THE FLORIDA SUNCOAST INC

    Read MoreRead Less
29 More Docket Entries
  • 04/23/2021
  • DocketSUMMONS - SERVED; Doc # 10; 4/21/2021; Party: EMPATH HEALTH INC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE; Doc # 6; Party: EMPATH HEALTH INC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2021
  • DocketDESIGNATION OF E-MAIL ADDRESS(ES); Doc # 7

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2021
  • FinancialPLAINTIFF; MORRIS, KISHA L; Total Financial Assessment; 430.00; Total Payments and Credits; 430.00; Balance Due 0.00; E-FILE PAYMENT; Receipt # EF-2021-15050; MORRIS, KISHA L; (430.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2021
  • FinancialPLAINTIFF; MORRIS, KISHA L; Total Financial Assessment; 430.00; Total Payments and Credits; 430.00; Balance Due 0.00; Transaction Assessment; 430.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2021
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET - E-FILED; Doc # 1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2021
  • DocketSUMMONS - ISSUED; Doc # 2; Party: BARNES, JENNIFER C

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2021
  • DocketSUMMONS - ISSUED; Doc # 3; Party: BARNES, ADAM C

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2021
  • DocketSUMMONS - ISSUED; Doc # 4; Party: EMPATH HEALTH INC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2021
  • DocketCOMPLAINT; Doc # 5

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where THE HOSPICE OF FLORIDA SUNCOAST INC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer GUYTON JOHN A III