This case was last updated from Pinellas County Courts on 08/07/2022 at 20:13:07 (UTC).

KIM ALDRICH Vs. TERMINIX INTERNATIONAL INC

Case Summary

On 05/09/2022 KIM ALDRICH filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against TERMINIX INTERNATIONAL INC. This case was filed in Pinellas County Courts, Clearwater Historic Courthouse - County located in Pinellas, Florida. The case status is Not Classified By Court.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********2-SC

  • Filing Date:

    05/09/2022

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Pinellas, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ALDRICH, KIM

Tampa, FL 33687-6301

Defendant

TERMINIX INTERNATIONAL INC

Ct Corporation System, Registered Agent 1200 South Pine Island Road

Plantation, FL 33324

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

EUGENE P CASTAGLIUOLO, ESQ

16301

Tampa, FL 33687

 

Court Documents

CIVIL COVER SHEET - E-FILED

05/09/2022: CIVIL COVER SHEET - E-FILED

COMPLAINT WITH DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

05/09/2022: COMPLAINT WITH DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

EXHIBIT

05/09/2022: EXHIBIT

SUMMONS - NOT ISSUED

05/09/2022: SUMMONS - NOT ISSUED

CIV_CLK_Notices_SCZoom333936834

05/11/2022: SMALL CLAIMS PRE-TRIAL NOTICE

NOTICE

06/02/2022: NOTICE

SUMMONS - SERVED

06/01/2022: SUMMONS - SERVED

SUMMONS - SERVED

06/02/2022: SUMMONS - SERVED

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/02/2022
  • DocketNOTICE; Doc # 8; DECLARATION APPOINTING REPRESENTATIVE OF TERMINIX INTERNATIONAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2022
  • DocketSUMMONS - SERVED; Doc # 9; Party: TERMINIX INTERNATIONAL INC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2022
  • DocketSMALL CLAIMS PRE TRIAL ICD; (11:30 AM) (Judicial Officer SMALL CLAIMS JUDGE, SOUTH); Result: SC HEARING HELD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2022
  • DocketPRE-TRIAL CONTINUED PENDING RE; Doc # 5; PRE-TRIAL WITH JUDGE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2022
  • DocketREFERRAL TO MEDIATION FROM SC PRETRIAL; Doc # 6

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2022
  • DocketSUMMONS - SERVED; Doc # 7; 05/16/2022; Party: TERMINIX INTERNATIONAL INC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2022
  • FinancialPLAINTIFF; ALDRICH, KIM; Total Financial Assessment; 310.00; Total Payments and Credits; 310.00; Balance Due 0.00; E-FILE PAYMENT; Receipt # EF-2022-16247; ALDRICH, KIM; (310.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2022
  • FinancialPLAINTIFF; ALDRICH, KIM; Total Financial Assessment; 310.00; Total Payments and Credits; 310.00; Balance Due 0.00; Transaction Assessment; 310.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2022
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET - E-FILED; Doc # 1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2022
  • DocketCOMPLAINT WITH DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL; Doc # 2

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2022
  • DocketEXHIBIT; Doc # 3; HOME PEST INSPECTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2022
  • DocketSUMMONS - NOT ISSUED; Doc # 4; NOT USED BY CLERK

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where THE TERMINIX INTERNATIONAL INC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer CASTAGLIUOLO , EUGENE P