This case was last updated from Pinellas County 6th Judicial Circuit Courts on 01/21/2023 at 06:28:47 (UTC).

KEITHRA ANNETTE LINE Vs. WILLIAM FRANK PRITCHARD

Case Summary

On 11/14/2022 KEITHRA ANNETTE LINE filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against WILLIAM FRANK PRITCHARD. This case was filed in Pinellas County 6th Judicial Circuit Courts, Clearwater Branch Office - Circuit located in Pinellas, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is FRAYMAN, EVAN. The case status is Not Classified By Court.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********3-FD

  • Filing Date:

    11/14/2022

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • County, State:

    Pinellas, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

FRAYMAN, EVAN

 

Party Details

Petitioner

LINE, KEITHRA ANNETTE

Tarpon Springs, FL 34689

Respondent

PRITCHARD, WILLIAM FRANK

Kenneth City, FL 33709

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/04/2023
  • FinancialPETITIONER; LINE, KEITHRA ANNETTE; Total Financial Assessment; 13.50; Total Payments and Credits; 13.50; Balance Due 0.00; Counter Payment; Receipt # CV-2023-00128; LINE, KEITHRA ANNETTE; (3.00)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/04/2023
  • FinancialPETITIONER; LINE, KEITHRA ANNETTE; Total Financial Assessment; 13.50; Total Payments and Credits; 13.50; Balance Due 0.00; Transaction Assessment; 3.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/04/2023
  • DocketCOPY OF DRIVERS LICENSE Doc # 12; Party:; LINE, KEITHRA ANNETTE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/04/2023
  • DocketRETURNED FROM POST OFFICE Doc # 13; NOTICE TO FILE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/22/2022
  • DocketNOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE Doc # 10; 0124223 1045AM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/22/2022
  • DocketNOTICE Doc # 11; TO FILE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/19/2022
  • DocketANSWER Doc # 8; Party:; PRITCHARD, WILLIAM FRANK

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/16/2022
  • DocketSUMMONS - SERVED Doc # 9; 12092022; Party:; PRITCHARD, WILLIAM FRANK

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/14/2022
  • FinancialPETITIONER; LINE, KEITHRA ANNETTE; Total Financial Assessment; 13.50; Total Payments and Credits; 13.50; Balance Due 0.00; Counter Payment; Receipt # CV-2022-25048; LINE, KEITHRA ANNETTE; (10.50)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/14/2022
  • FinancialPETITIONER; LINE, KEITHRA ANNETTE; Total Financial Assessment; 13.50; Total Payments and Credits; 13.50; Balance Due 0.00; INDIGENT; 407.50

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/14/2022
  • FinancialPETITIONER; LINE, KEITHRA ANNETTE; Total Financial Assessment; 13.50; Total Payments and Credits; 13.50; Balance Due 0.00; Transaction Assessment; 418.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/14/2022
  • DocketAPPLICATION FOR INDIGENT STATUS APPROVED Doc # 1; Party:; LINE, KEITHRA ANNETTE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/14/2022
  • DocketSUMMONS - ISSUED Doc # 2; SENT TO PCSO; Party:; PRITCHARD, WILLIAM FRANK

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/14/2022
  • DocketPETITION FOR DISSOLUTION WITHOUT MINOR CHILDREN Doc # 3

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/14/2022
  • DocketSOCIAL SECURITY NUMBER PLAINTIFF - PETITIONER Doc # 4

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/14/2022
  • DocketNOTICE OF RELATED CASES Doc # 5

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/14/2022
  • DocketDESIGNATION OF E-MAIL ADDRESS(ES) Doc # 6; Party:; LINE, KEITHRA ANNETTE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/14/2022
  • DocketATTACHMENT Doc # 7; DEFENDANTS ARREST RECORD AND TEXT MESSAGES BETWEEN PARTIES

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less