This case was last updated from Pinellas County 6th Judicial Circuit Courts on 02/18/2022 at 19:56:10 (UTC).

KEITH STOLTE Vs. GEICO GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY

Case Summary

On 06/29/2021 KEITH STOLTE filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against GEICO GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY. This case was filed in Pinellas County 6th Judicial Circuit Courts, Clearwater Branch Office - Circuit located in Pinellas, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is MUSCARELLA, PATRICIA ANN. The case status is Not Classified By Court.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********5-CI

  • Filing Date:

    06/29/2021

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Pinellas, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

MUSCARELLA, PATRICIA ANN

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

STOLTE, KEITH

Clearwater, FL 33764

Defendant

GEICO GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY

200 E. Gaines Street

Tallahassee, FL 32399

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

KATHERINE C NEAL, ESQ

Attorney at CAREY LEISURE & NEAL

622 Bypass Drive Suite 100

Clearwater, FL 33764

Defendant Attorney

JESSICA BOWEN-HENTGES, ESQ

2868 Remington Green Circle S-A

Tallahassee, FL 32308

 

Court Documents

MOTION

01/13/2022: MOTION

MANDATORY CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER

12/23/2021: MANDATORY CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER

AMENDED NOTICE OF TAKING DEPO

12/14/2021: AMENDED NOTICE OF TAKING DEPO

NOTICE OF SERVICE ANSWERS INTERROGATORIES

10/20/2021: NOTICE OF SERVICE ANSWERS INTERROGATORIES

REQUEST FOR COPIES

10/19/2021: REQUEST FOR COPIES

NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION

10/19/2021: NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION

NOTICE OF PRODUCTION FROM NON-PARTY

10/13/2021: NOTICE OF PRODUCTION FROM NON-PARTY

RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

10/12/2021: RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

PLAINTIFFS NOTICE OF SERVICE

09/28/2021: PLAINTIFFS NOTICE OF SERVICE

11 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/17/2022
  • DocketORDER OF REFERRAL TO MEDIATION; Doc # 25; 05032022 1:30 VIA ZOOM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/07/2022
  • DocketDESIGNATION OF E-MAIL ADDRESS(ES); Doc # 24

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/13/2022
  • DocketMOTION; Doc # 23; PLAINTIFF S MOTION FOR CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/23/2021
  • DocketMANDATORY CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER; Doc # 22

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/14/2021
  • DocketAMENDED NOTICE OF TAKING DEPO; Doc # 21; VIA ZOOM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/20/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE ANSWERS INTERROGATORIES; Doc # 20

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/19/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION; Doc # 18; (VIDEOTAPED)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/19/2021
  • DocketREQUEST FOR COPIES; Doc # 19

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/13/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF PRODUCTION FROM NON-PARTY; Doc # 17; 10/12/21

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/12/2021
  • DocketRESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION; Doc # 16

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
7 More Docket Entries
  • 08/17/2021
  • DocketCERTIFICATE; Doc # 9; CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES TO PLAINTIFF

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/17/2021
  • DocketREQUEST FOR PRODUCTION; Doc # 10

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/17/2021
  • DocketREQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS; Doc # 11

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/30/2021
  • FinancialPLAINTIFF; STOLTE, KEITH; Total Financial Assessment; 410.00; Total Payments and Credits; 410.00; Balance Due 0.00; E-FILE PAYMENT; Receipt # EF-2021-25784; STOLTE, KEITH; (410.00)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/30/2021
  • FinancialPLAINTIFF; STOLTE, KEITH; Total Financial Assessment; 410.00; Total Payments and Credits; 410.00; Balance Due 0.00; Transaction Assessment; 410.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/29/2021
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET - E-FILED; Doc # 1

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/29/2021
  • DocketCOMPLAINT; Doc # 2

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/29/2021
  • DocketSUMMONS - ISSUED; Doc # 3; Party: GEICO GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/29/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES; Doc # 4

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/29/2021
  • DocketREQUEST FOR PRODUCTION; Doc # 5

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where GEICO GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer KATHERINE C NEAL