This case was last updated from Florida Pinellas Court System on 12/29/2020 at 06:53:01 (UTC).

KATHLEEN ELIZABETH GARDNER, ON BEHALF OF ALYSSA JORDAN RECH, MINOR Vs. JORDAN THOMAS AULT, MINOR

Case Summary

On 11/24/2015 KATHLEEN ELIZABETH GARDNER, ON BEHALF OF ALYSSA JORDAN RECH, MINOR filed a Family - Other Family lawsuit against JORDAN THOMAS AULT, MINOR. This case was filed in Florida Pinellas Court System, Criminal Justice Center - Circuit located in Pinellas, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is COLEMAN, SHERWOOD. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********7-FD

  • Filing Date:

    11/24/2015

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Family - Other Family

  • County, State:

    Pinellas, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

COLEMAN, SHERWOOD

 

Party Details

Petitioner

GARDNER, KATHLEEN ELIZABETH ON BEHALF OF RECH, ALYSSA JORDAN, MINOR

Largo, FL 33770

Respondent

AULT, JORDAN THOMAS, MINOR BY AND THROUGH GUARDIAN-PARENT SAGE, LORI LOUISE, MOTHER

Coshocton, OH 43812

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/07/2016
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT; OF SERVICE TEMP INJ 121015

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2015
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT; OF SERVICE OF TEMP INJUNCTION 11/26/15

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2015
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT; OF SERVICE OF TEMP INJUNCTION 12/09/15

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2015
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT; OF SERVICE OF TEMP INJUNCTION 12/09/15

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2015
  • DocketFINAL DISPOSITION FORM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2015
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT; OF SERVICE OF INJ 120415

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2015
  • DocketDOMESTIC INJUNCTION - DATING VIOLENCE; (2:00 PM) (Judicial Officer COLEMAN, SHERWOOD)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2015
  • DocketFINAL JUDGMENT OF INJUNCTION-DATE VIOL (SRS DISPO); 6/9/2016; Vol./Book 19017, Page 2276, 6 pages

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2015
  • DocketAMENDED FINAL JDMT INJUNCTION-DATE VIOL; 6/9/2016; Vol./Book 19017, Page 2269, 6 pages

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2015
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2015
  • DocketCANCELED; DOMESTIC INJUNCTION - DATING VIOLENCE; (10:30 AM) (Judicial Officer MUSCARELLA, PATRICIA ANN); DATA ENTRY ERROR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2015
  • DocketPETITION (SRS)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2015
  • DocketCLERK'S INFORMATION SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2015
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2015
  • DocketNOTICE OF RELATED CASES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2015
  • DocketNON-WAIVER OF RETURN HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2015
  • DocketTEMPORARY INJUNCTION WITHOUT NOTICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2015
  • DocketCC PETITION WITH ATTACHMENTS TO SHF; FYI PINELLAS/ CC TO PETITIONER FOR OHIO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2015
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT; OF DELIVERY TO LAW ENFORCEMENT BY PETITIONER

    Read MoreRead Less