This case was last updated from Pinellas County 6th Judicial Circuit Courts on 01/21/2023 at 06:31:54 (UTC).

KAREN PRZYBYLSKI, et al Vs. LINDA S FITZGERRELL

Case Summary

On 11/14/2022 KAREN PRZYBYLSKI, filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against LINDA S FITZGERRELL. This case was filed in Pinellas County 6th Judicial Circuit Courts, St. Petersburg Branch Office - Circuit located in Pinellas, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is RAMSBERGER, THOMAS M. The case status is Not Classified By Court.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********3-CI

  • Filing Date:

    11/14/2022

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Pinellas, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

RAMSBERGER, THOMAS M

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

PRZYBYLSKI, KAREN

St. Petersburg, FL 33710

PRZYBYLSKI, PAUL

St. Petersburg, FL 33710

Defendant

FITZGERRELL, LINDA S

St. Petersburg, FL 33710

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

DANIEL C KASARIS

Attorney at KARIKAS & KASARIS PA

3643 First Ave North

St Petersburg, FL 33713

Defendant Attorney

GEOGYMON GEORGE, ESQ

Attorney at LAW OFFICES OF SOLINA LORDEUS LASCAZE

4443 Lyons Rd Ste 206

Coconut Creek, FL 33073

 

Court Documents

COMPLAINT WITH DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

11/14/2022: COMPLAINT WITH DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

SUMMONS - ISSUED

11/14/2022: SUMMONS - ISSUED

DESIGNATION OF E-MAIL ADDRESS(ES)

11/14/2022: DESIGNATION OF E-MAIL ADDRESS(ES)

REQUEST FOR SUMMONS

11/14/2022: REQUEST FOR SUMMONS

CIVIL COVER SHEET - E-FILED

11/14/2022: CIVIL COVER SHEET - E-FILED

RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

01/19/2023: RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

NOTICE OF SERVICE ANSWERS INTERROGATORIES

01/16/2023: NOTICE OF SERVICE ANSWERS INTERROGATORIES

NOTICE OF SERVICE ANSWERS INTERROGATORIES

01/16/2023: NOTICE OF SERVICE ANSWERS INTERROGATORIES

RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

01/16/2023: RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME FILED BY

12/21/2022: MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME FILED BY

NOTICE OF FIRM NAME CHANGE

12/20/2022: NOTICE OF FIRM NAME CHANGE

NOTICE OF SERVICE ANSWERS INTERROGATORIES

01/19/2023: NOTICE OF SERVICE ANSWERS INTERROGATORIES

CASE MANAGEMENT STATUS ORDER

12/07/2022: CASE MANAGEMENT STATUS ORDER

REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

12/07/2022: REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

12/07/2022: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

12/07/2022: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

ANSWER-AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES OF

12/07/2022: ANSWER-AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES OF

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

12/07/2022: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

9 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/19/2023
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE ANSWERS INTERROGATORIES; Doc # 20

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/19/2023
  • DocketRESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION; Doc # 21

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/16/2023
  • DocketRESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION; Doc # 17

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/16/2023
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE ANSWERS INTERROGATORIES; Doc # 18

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/16/2023
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE ANSWERS INTERROGATORIES; Doc # 19

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/21/2022
  • DocketMOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME FILED BY; Doc # 16; Party:; FITZGERRELL, LINDA S

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/20/2022
  • DocketNOTICE OF FIRM NAME CHANGE; Doc # 15

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/07/2022
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES; Doc # 7; (AUTOMOBILE NEGLIGENCE)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/07/2022
  • DocketREQUEST FOR PRODUCTION; Doc # 8

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/07/2022
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE; Doc # 9; AND DISCLOSURE DESIGNATION OF PRINCIPAL EMAIL ADDRESS; Party:; FITZGERRELL, LINDA S

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
3 More Docket Entries
  • 12/07/2022
  • DocketREQUEST FOR PRODUCTION; Doc # 13

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/07/2022
  • DocketCASE MANAGEMENT STATUS ORDER; Doc # 14

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/23/2022
  • DocketSUMMONS - SERVED; Doc # 6; 11/17/2022; Party:; FITZGERRELL, LINDA S

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/14/2022
  • FinancialPLAINTIFF; PRZYBYLSKI, KAREN; Total Financial Assessment; 410.00; Total Payments and Credits; 410.00; Balance Due 0.00; E-FILE PAYMENT; Receipt # EF-2022-41141; PRZYBYLSKI, KAREN; (410.00)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/14/2022
  • FinancialPLAINTIFF; PRZYBYLSKI, KAREN; Total Financial Assessment; 410.00; Total Payments and Credits; 410.00; Balance Due 0.00; Transaction Assessment; 410.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/14/2022
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET - E-FILED; Doc # 1

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/14/2022
  • DocketCOMPLAINT WITH DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL; Doc # 2

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/14/2022
  • DocketSUMMONS - ISSUED; Doc # 3; Party:; FITZGERRELL, LINDA S

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/14/2022
  • DocketDESIGNATION OF E-MAIL ADDRESS(ES); Doc # 4

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/14/2022
  • DocketREQUEST FOR SUMMONS; Doc # 5

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer DANIEL C KASARIS