This case was last updated from Pinellas County 6th Judicial Circuit Courts on 02/11/2021 at 01:19:09 (UTC).

KAREN MONAHAN Vs. SELECT PHYSICAL THERAPY HOLDINGS INC, DOING BUSINESS AS SELECT PHYSICAL THERAPY, ACCOUNTS RECEIVABLE RESOURCES INC, DOING BUSINESS AS AR RESOURCES

Case Summary

On 09/04/2019 KAREN MONAHAN filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against SELECT PHYSICAL THERAPY HOLDINGS INC, DOING BUSINESS AS SELECT PHYSICAL THERAPY, ACCOUNTS RECEIVABLE RESOURCES INC, DOING BUSINESS AS AR RESOURCES. This case was filed in Pinellas County 6th Judicial Circuit Courts, Clearwater Historic Courthouse - County located in Pinellas, Florida. The case status is Not Classified By Court.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********3-SC

  • Filing Date:

    09/04/2019

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Pinellas, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MONAHAN, KAREN

Defendants

SELECT PHYSICAL THERAPY HOLDINGS INC DOING BUSINESS AS SELECT PHYSICAL THERAPY

ACCOUNTS RECEIVABLE RESOURCES INC DOING BUSINESS AS AR RESOURCES

 

Court Documents

STATEMENT OF CLAIM

09/04/2019: STATEMENT OF CLAIM

EXHIBIT

09/04/2019: EXHIBIT

EXHIBIT

09/04/2019: EXHIBIT

EXHIBIT

09/04/2019: EXHIBIT

SMALL CLAIMS DEFT PRE-TRIAL NOTICE

10/03/2019: SMALL CLAIMS PRE-TRIAL

SMALL CLAIMS DEFT PRE-TRIAL NOTICE

SMALL CLAIMS DEFT PRE-TRIAL NOTICE

SMALL CLAIMS PRE-TRIAL NOTICE

SMALL CLAIMS PRE-TRIAL NOTICE

NOTICE RETURNED SERVED

09/16/2019: NOTICE RETURNED SERVED

NOTICE RETURNED SERVED

09/16/2019: NOTICE RETURNED SERVED

NOTICE OF CANCELLATION

10/02/2019: NOTICE OF CANCELLATION

NOTICE

10/02/2019: NOTICE

NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL

10/02/2019: NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/03/2019
  • DocketSMALL CLAIMS PRE TRIAL ICD; (8:30 AM) (Judicial Officer JAGGER, EDWIN); Result: SC HEARING HELD

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/02/2019
  • DocketNOTICE OF CANCELLATION; Doc # 11; OF PRE-TRIAL CONFERENCE 100319 8:30

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/02/2019
  • DocketCASE CLOSED (SRS); Doc # 12

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/02/2019
  • DocketNOTICE; Doc # 13; OF REMOVAL W/ATTACHED NOTICE AND PETITION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/02/2019
  • DocketNOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL; Doc # 14; WITH PREJUDICE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/16/2019
  • DocketNOTICE TO APPEAR - SERVED; Doc # 9; Party: SELECT PHYSICAL THERAPY HOLDINGS INC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/16/2019
  • DocketNOTICE TO APPEAR - SERVED; Doc # 10; Party: ACCOUNTS RECEIVABLE RESOURCES INC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/05/2019
  • DocketNOTICE-STMT OF CLAIM-DEFT; Doc # 5; Party: SELECT PHYSICAL THERAPY HOLDINGS INC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/05/2019
  • DocketNOTICE-STMT OF CLAIM-DEFT; Doc # 6; Party: ACCOUNTS RECEIVABLE RESOURCES INC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/05/2019
  • DocketNOTICE TO PLTF-PLTF ATTY; Doc # 7

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/05/2019
  • DocketSUMMONS-NOTICE EMAILED TO ATTY-PLTF FOR SERVICE; Doc # 8; Party: ACCOUNTS RECEIVABLE RESOURCES INC; Party: SELECT PHYSICAL THERAPY HOLDINGS INC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/04/2019
  • FinancialPLAINTIFF; MONAHAN, KAREN; Total Financial Assessment; 320.00; Total Payments and Credits; 320.00; Balance Due 0.00; E-FILE PAYMENT; Receipt # EF-2019-33489; MONAHAN, KAREN; (320.00)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/04/2019
  • FinancialPLAINTIFF; MONAHAN, KAREN; Total Financial Assessment; 320.00; Total Payments and Credits; 320.00; Balance Due 0.00; Transaction Assessment; 320.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/04/2019
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF CLAIM; Doc # 1

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/04/2019
  • DocketEXHIBIT; Doc # 2; A ACCIDENT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/04/2019
  • DocketEXHIBIT; Doc # 3; B ACCIDENT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/04/2019
  • DocketEXHIBIT; Doc # 4; C ACCOUNT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less