Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Florida Pinellas Court System on 02/08/2021 at 14:15:22 (UTC).

KAITLYN COLNA, et al Vs. SECURITY FIRST INSURANCE COMPANY

Case Summary

On 06/19/2019 KAITLYN COLNA filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against SECURITY FIRST INSURANCE COMPANY. This case was filed in Florida Pinellas Court System, St. Petersburg Branch Office - Circuit located in Pinellas, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is RAMSBERGER, THOMAS M. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********4-CI

  • Filing Date:

    06/19/2019

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

  • Court:

    Florida Pinellas Court System

  • Courthouse:

    St. Petersburg Branch Office - Circuit

  • County, State:

    Pinellas, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

RAMSBERGER, THOMAS M

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

COLNA, VERNON LLOYD

St Petersburg, FL 33714

COLNA, KAITLYN

Saint Petersburg, FL 33714

Defendant

SECURITY FIRST INSURANCE COMPANY

200 E. Gaines Street

Tallahassee, FL 32399

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SARAH M MURRAY

4781 N Congress Ave Suite 215

Boynton Beach, FL 33426

Defendant Attorneys

LAUREN A KILGORE, ESQ

Attorney at COLE SCOTT & KISSANE P A

4301 W Boy Scout Blvd Ste 400

Tampa, FL 33607

ANDREW E MITCHELL, ESQ

Attorney at COLE SCOTT AND KISSANE P A

4301 W Boy Scout Blvd Ste 400

Tampa, FL 33607

 

Court Documents

NOTICE FINAL DISPOSITION OF REFERRAL

04/22/2020: NOTICE FINAL DISPOSITION OF REFERRAL

CERTIFICATE

04/13/2020: CERTIFICATE

RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

03/23/2020: RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

NOTICE OF FILING

03/23/2020: NOTICE OF FILING

NOTICE

03/09/2020: NOTICE

ORDER OF REFERRAL TO MEDIATION

02/17/2020: ORDER OF REFERRAL TO MEDIATION

REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

02/04/2020: REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

PLTF-PET'S MOTION TO COMPEL DISCOVERY

01/21/2020: PLTF-PET'S MOTION TO COMPEL DISCOVERY

AMENDED NOTICE OF TAKING DEPO

11/20/2019: AMENDED NOTICE OF TAKING DEPO

NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION

11/13/2019: NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION

DESIGNATION OF E-MAIL ADDRESS(ES)

10/07/2019: DESIGNATION OF E-MAIL ADDRESS(ES)

PRIVILEGE LOG

09/26/2019: PRIVILEGE LOG

RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

09/26/2019: RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

NOTICE OF SERVICE ANSWERS INTERROGATORIES

09/26/2019: NOTICE OF SERVICE ANSWERS INTERROGATORIES

ANSWER-AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES OF

08/28/2019: ANSWER-AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES OF

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

06/19/2019: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

COMPLAINT

06/19/2019: COMPLAINT

CIVIL COVER SHEET

06/19/2019: CIVIL COVER SHEET

18 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/09/2020
  • DocketNOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL; Doc # 33

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2020
  • DocketDISMISSED-MEDIATED SETTLEMENT BEFORE HRG (SRS DISPO); Doc # 31

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2020
  • DocketNOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL; Doc # 32; WITH PREJUDICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2020
  • DocketNOTICE OF CANCELLATION; Doc # 30; OF HEARING 04302020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2020
  • DocketNOTICE FINAL DISPOSITION OF REFERRAL; Doc # 29; REACHED FULL AGREEMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2020
  • DocketCERTIFICATE; Doc # 28; OF AUTHORITY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2020
  • DocketNOTICE OF FILING; Doc # 26; BY PLTF OF ANSWER TO INTERROGATORIES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2020
  • DocketRESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION; Doc # 27; BY PLTF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2020
  • DocketNOTICE OF HEARING; Doc # 24; 04/30/2020 3:15 BY DEFT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2020
  • DocketNOTICE; Doc # 25; OF MEDIATION 04172020 1:00

    Read MoreRead Less
15 More Docket Entries
  • 08/28/2019
  • DocketANSWER-AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES OF; Doc # 8; AND DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL; Party: SECURITY FIRST INSURANCE COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2019
  • DocketDEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL; Doc # 7

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2019
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE; Doc # 6; AND DESIGNATION OF E-MAIL ADDRESSES; Party: SECURITY FIRST INSURANCE COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2019
  • FinancialPLAINTIFF; COLNA, KAITLYN; Total Financial Assessment; 410.00; Total Payments and Credits; 410.00; Balance Due 0.00; E-FILE PAYMENT; Receipt # EF-2019-23271; COLNA, KAITLYN; (410.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2019
  • FinancialPLAINTIFF; COLNA, KAITLYN; Total Financial Assessment; 410.00; Total Payments and Credits; 410.00; Balance Due 0.00; Transaction Assessment; 410.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2019
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET; Doc # 1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2019
  • DocketCOMPLAINT; Doc # 2; WITH ATTACHMENTS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2019
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES; Doc # 3

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2019
  • DocketREQUEST FOR PRODUCTION; Doc # 4

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2019
  • DocketSUMMONS TO BE ISSUED; Doc # 5; ISSUED; Party: SECURITY FIRST INSURANCE COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Security First Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Mitchell, Andrew Elliot

Latest cases represented by Lawyer LAUREN A KILGORE, ESQ