This case was last updated from Pinellas County 6th Judicial Circuit Courts on 03/12/2021 at 13:15:51 (UTC).

JUNE A CLARK vs. ADAM JAMES CLARK, et al

Case Summary

On 06/09/2011 JUNE A CLARK filed a Family - Minor Custody lawsuit against ADAM JAMES CLARK,. This case was filed in Pinellas County 6th Judicial Circuit Courts, Criminal Justice Center - Circuit located in Pinellas, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is DAY, JACK. The case status is Not Classified By Court.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********4-FD

  • Filing Date:

    06/09/2011

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Family - Minor Custody

  • County, State:

    Pinellas, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

DAY, JACK

 

Party Details

Petitioner

CLARK, JUNE A

Respondents

BEARDEN, MARISSA NICHOLE

CLARK, ADAM JAMES

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/21/2015
  • DocketEVIDENCE DESTROYED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/26/2015
  • DocketINTENT TO DESTROY EVIDENCE; LETTER SENT TO PARTIES/ATTORNEYS FOR PARTIES

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/29/2011
  • DocketDEFAULT ENTERED; Comment: DEFAULT ENTERED / MARISSA NICHOLE BEARDEN; VER: F; K

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/23/2011
  • DocketPLTF-PET'S MOTION FOR DEFAULT; Comment: MOTION FOR DEFAULT; VER: F; P

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/20/2011
  • DocketNOTICE OF UNAVAILABILITY; Comment: NOTICE OF UNAVAILABILITY; VER: F; P

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/07/2011
  • DocketDISPOSED BY JUDGE (SRS DISPO); Comment: CASE DISPOSED BY JUDGE; VER: N; P

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/07/2011
  • DocketORDER DENYING; Comment: ORDER DENYING PETITION FOR TEMPORARY CUSTOOR17377PG1353-001; VER: F; P; Vol./Book 17377, Page 1353, 001 pages

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/23/2011
  • DocketLIST OF EXHIBITS; (PETITIONER LIST OF EXHIBITS - EVIDENCE DESTROYED 10/21/15)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/14/2011
  • DocketNOTICE OF HEARING; Comment: NOTICE OF HEARING 082311 AT 11:00; VER: F; P

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/09/2011
  • DocketNOTICE FOR FAMILY LAW WITH MINOR CHILDREN; Comment: NOTICE FOR FAMILY LAW W/MINOR CHILDREN; VER: F; P

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 06/09/2011
  • DocketNOTICE; Comment: NOTICE FILING WAIVER AND CONSENT BY BIOLOGICAL MOTHER; VER: F; P

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/09/2011
  • DocketWAIVER; Comment: WAIVER AND CONSENT BY BIOLOGICAL FATHER; VER: F; P

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/09/2011
  • DocketNOTICE; Comment: NOTICE FILING WAIVER AND CONSENT BY BIOLOGICAL FATHER; VER: F; P

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/09/2011
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT AS TO MILITARY SERVICE; Comment: AFFIDAVIT AS TO MILITARY SERVICE; VER: F; P

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/09/2011
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT-DECLARATION UNIFORM CHILD CUSTODY; Comment: AFFIDAVIT/DECLARATION UNIFORM CHILD CUSTODY; VER: F; P

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/09/2011
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET; Comment: CIVIL COVER SHEET; VER: F; P

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/09/2011
  • DocketPETITION (SRS); Comment: PETITION; VER: F; P

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/09/2011
  • DocketCircuit Civil Filing - Fee Paid $; Comment: CIRCUIT CIVIL FILING FEE PAID $400.00; VER: N; P

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/09/2011
  • DocketTHIS CASE ASSIGNED BY CLERK TO SECTION; Comment: THIS CASE ASSIGNED BY CLERK TO SECTION U01 BY 2139 - MANUAL FD; VER: N; P

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/09/2011
  • DocketCASE FILED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less