This case was last updated from Florida Pinellas Court System on 02/04/2020 at 08:00:51 (UTC).

JULIUS E LITTLE, et al Vs. DEBORAH JUSTICE, et al

Case Summary

On 12/06/2019 JULIUS E LITTLE filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against DEBORAH JUSTICE. This case was filed in Florida Pinellas Court System, Clearwater Historic Courthouse - County located in Pinellas, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is McNARY, MYRA SCOTT. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********8-CO

  • Filing Date:

    12/06/2019

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Court:

    Florida Pinellas Court System

  • Courthouse:

    Clearwater Historic Courthouse - County

  • County, State:

    Pinellas, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

McNARY, MYRA SCOTT

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

LITTLE, JULIUS E

Temple Terrace, FL 33617

LITTLE, EVELYN A

Temple Terrace, FL 33617

Defendants

JUSTICE, DEBORAH

St. Petersburg, FL 33708

BURNS, BRITTANY

St. Petersburg, FL 33708

RAWLS, RHONDA

St. Petersburg, FL 33708

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

JOHN E McMILLAN

Attorney at JOHN E McMILLAN P A

5309 East Busch Blvd

Temple Terrace, FL 33617

 

Court Documents

ATTACHMENT

12/18/2019: ATTACHMENT

ATTACHMENT TO COMPLAINT

12/06/2019: ATTACHMENT TO COMPLAINT

AFFIDAVIT-SERVICE OF PROCESS

12/18/2019: AFFIDAVIT-SERVICE OF PROCESS

ATTACHMENT

12/18/2019: ATTACHMENT

FINAL JUDGMENT- COUNT 1 POSSESSION

01/02/2020: FINAL JUDGMENT- COUNT 1 POSSESSION

PLTF-PET'S MOTION FOR COURT DEFAULT

12/18/2019: PLTF-PET'S MOTION FOR COURT DEFAULT

DEFAULT ENTERED BY COURT

01/02/2020: DEFAULT ENTERED BY COURT

AFFIDAVIT-SERVICE OF PROCESS

12/18/2019: AFFIDAVIT-SERVICE OF PROCESS

WRIT OF POSSESSION

01/23/2020: WRIT OF POSSESSION

WRIT OF POSSESSION

01/06/2020: WRIT OF POSSESSION

SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

12/06/2019: SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

VERIFICATION. OF CLAIM AND NON-MILITARY SERVICE

12/18/2019: VERIFICATION. OF CLAIM AND NON-MILITARY SERVICE

CIVIL COVER SHEET - E-FILED

12/06/2019: CIVIL COVER SHEET - E-FILED

COMPLAINT - II COUNTS

12/06/2019: COMPLAINT - II COUNTS

ATTACHMENT

12/18/2019: ATTACHMENT

AFFIDAVIT-SERVICE OF PROCESS

12/18/2019: AFFIDAVIT-SERVICE OF PROCESS

SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

12/06/2019: SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

ATTACHMENT TO COMPLAINT

12/06/2019: ATTACHMENT TO COMPLAINT

8 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/23/2020
  • DocketWRIT OF POSSESSION; Doc # 21; RETD EXECUTED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • DocketWRIT OF POSSESSION; Doc # 20; ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2020
  • DocketDEFAULT ENTERED BY COURT; Doc # 17; Party: BURNS, BRITTANY; Party: JUSTICE, DEBORAH; Party: RAWLS, RHONDA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2020
  • DocketDEFAULT JUDGMENT (SRS DISPO); Doc # 18

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2020
  • DocketFINAL JUDGMENT- COUNT 1 POSSESSION; Doc # 19; IN FAVOR OF PLTF; Vol./Book 20835, Page 289, 1 pages

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2019
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT-SERVICE OF PROCESS; Doc # 9; 121019; Party: BURNS, BRITTANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2019
  • DocketATTACHMENT; Doc # 10; SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2019
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT-SERVICE OF PROCESS; Doc # 11; 121019; Party: RAWLS, RHONDA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2019
  • DocketATTACHMENT; Doc # 12; SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2019
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT-SERVICE OF PROCESS; Doc # 13; 121019; Party: JUSTICE, DEBORAH

    Read MoreRead Less
5 More Docket Entries
  • 12/17/2019
  • DocketANSWER; Doc # 8; Party: JUSTICE, DEBORAH

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • FinancialPLAINTIFF; LITTLE, JULIUS E; Total Financial Assessment; 215.00; Total Payments and Credits; 215.00; Balance Due 0.00; E-FILE PAYMENT; Receipt # EF-2019-46023; LITTLE, JULIUS E; (215.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • FinancialPLAINTIFF; LITTLE, JULIUS E; Total Financial Assessment; 215.00; Total Payments and Credits; 215.00; Balance Due 0.00; Transaction Assessment; 215.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • DocketSUMMONS TO BE ISSUED; Doc # 1; ISSUED; Party: JUSTICE, DEBORAH

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • DocketSUMMONS TO BE ISSUED; Doc # 2; ISSUED; Party: RAWLS, RHONDA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • DocketSUMMONS TO BE ISSUED; Doc # 3; ISSUED; Party: BURNS, BRITTANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET - E-FILED; Doc # 4

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • DocketCOMPLAINT - II COUNTS; Doc # 5

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • DocketATTACHMENT TO COMPLAINT; Doc # 6; LEASE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • DocketATTACHMENT TO COMPLAINT; Doc # 7; THREE DAY NOTICE

    Read MoreRead Less