This case was last updated from Pinellas County Courts on 12/31/2020 at 10:17:33 (UTC).

JPMORGAN CHASE BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION Vs. PAUL MONSER, et al

Case Summary

On 02/18/2016 JPMORGAN CHASE BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION filed a Property - Foreclosure lawsuit against PAUL MONSER. This case was filed in Pinellas County Courts, St. Petersburg Branch Office - Circuit located in Pinellas, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is NEWTON, CYNTHIA J. The case status is Not Classified By Court.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********8-CI

  • Filing Date:

    02/18/2016

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Property - Foreclosure

  • County, State:

    Pinellas, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

NEWTON, CYNTHIA J

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

JPMORGAN CHASE BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION

U S BANK TRUST NA AS TRUSTEE FOR LSF9 MASTER PARTICIPATION TRUST

Defendants

UNKNOWN TENANTS NOW KNOWN AS MONSER, KATIE

ANY AND ALL UNKNOWN PARTIES ETC

MONSER, PAUL

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

SHAKIVA RUFF

Attorney at PHELAN HALLINAN PLC

2727 W Cypress Creek Rd

Fort Lauderdale, FL 33309

SHAKIVA LAVON BROWN

Defendant Attorneys

ANDY TREUSCH

Attorney at TREUSCH LAW P A

1535 Rambling Oaks Lane

Deland, FL 32720

SHANNAN M FIELD, ESQ

Attorney at THE LAW OFFICE OF SHANNAN M FIELD PA

2323 S Washington Ave Ste 213

Titusville, FL 32780

AARON SAOUD

Attorney at SAOUD LAW AND ASSOCIATES PA

419 W Platt St 2Nd Fl

Tampa, FL 33606

GEORGE FRANJOLA

Attorney at GILLIGAN GOODING AND FRANJOLA P A

1531 Se 36Th Avenue

Ocala, FL 34471

 

Court Documents

PLTF PET'S MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME

05/24/2016: PLTF-PET'S MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME

NOTICE OF CANCELLATION

11/02/2016: NOTICE OF CANCELLATION

VALUE OF REAL PROP MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE CLAIM

02/18/2016: VALUE OF REAL PROP-MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE CLAIM

ANSWER AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES OF

04/27/2016: ANSWER-AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES OF

LIS PENDENS

02/18/2016: LIS PENDENS

CERTIFICATE OF COMPLIANCE W FORECLOSURE PROCEDURES

04/25/2017: CERTIFICATE OF COMPLIANCE WITH FORECLOSURE PROCEDURES

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF

04/27/2016: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF

DEFAULT ENTERED BY COURT

04/10/2017: DEFAULT ENTERED BY COURT

COMPLAINT

12/20/2017: COMPLAINT

53 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/30/2018
  • DocketCORRESPONDENCE TO COURT RE; Doc # 13; PROPOSED ORDER RCVD BY COURT 012918

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/30/2018
  • DocketORDER GRANTING; Doc # 14; DEFTS MOTN TO COMPEL PLTFS COMPLIANCE W/CONFIDENTIAL STIPULATION FOR CONSENT FINAL JUDGMENT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/20/2017
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET; Doc # 11

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/20/2017
  • DocketCOMPLAINT; Doc # 12; FOR EJECTMENT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/18/2017
  • DocketNOTICE OF HEARING; Doc # 10; 012218 11:45

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/17/2017
  • DocketCASE REOPENED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/17/2017
  • DocketDEF-RESP'S MOTION TO COMPEL; Doc # 9; PLAINTIFF'S COMPLIANCE WITH CONFIDENTIAL STIPULATION FOR CONSENT FINAL JUDGMENT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/26/2017
  • DocketRETURNED ORIGINAL LOAN DOCUMENTS; Doc # 8

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/24/2017
  • DocketCANCELED; JUDICIAL ONLINE SALE; (10:00 AM) (Judicial Officer ONLINE SALE, JUDICIAL); ORDER FROM COURT; CANCELLED PER COURT ORDER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/24/2017
  • DocketORDER GRANTING; Doc # 7; MTN CANCEL SALE 102417/VACATE FINAL JUDGMENT/DISMISS ACTION WITHOUT PREJUDICE/DISCHARGE LIS PENDENS/RETURN ORIGINAL LOAN DOCUMENTS; Vol./Book 19822, Page 1305, 3 pages

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
55 More Docket Entries
  • 02/18/2016
  • DocketEXHIBIT; B MORTGAGE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/18/2016
  • DocketEXHIBIT; C PURCHASE AND ASSUMPTION AGREEMENT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/18/2016
  • DocketEXHIBIT; D ASSIGNMENT OF MORTGAGE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/18/2016
  • DocketNOTICE TO HOMEOWNER; FORM C

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/18/2016
  • DocketPLAINTIFF-LENDER CONTACT INFORMATION SHEET; FORM D

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/18/2016
  • DocketLIS PENDENS; Vol./Book 19091, Page 82, 1 pages

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/18/2016
  • DocketSUMMONS TO BE ISSUED; ISSUED ON 021916; Party: MONSER, PAUL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/18/2016
  • DocketSUMMONS TO BE ISSUED; DUPLICATE; Party: MONSER, PAUL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/18/2016
  • DocketSUMMONS TO BE ISSUED; ISSUED ON 021916; Party: UNKNOWN TENANTS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/18/2016
  • DocketVALUE OF REAL PROP-MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE CLAIM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less