Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Florida Pinellas Court System on 05/23/2021 at 20:04:16 (UTC).

JOY ROXANN JENKINS Vs. 21ST CENTURY CENTENNIAL INSURANCE COMPANY

Case Summary

On 02/22/2021 JOY ROXANN JENKINS filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against 21ST CENTURY CENTENNIAL INSURANCE COMPANY. This case was filed in Florida Pinellas Court System, Clearwater Branch Office - Circuit located in Pinellas, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is MUSCARELLA, PATRICIA ANN. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********4-CI

  • Filing Date:

    02/22/2021

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Florida Pinellas Court System

  • Courthouse:

    Clearwater Branch Office - Circuit

  • County, State:

    Pinellas, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

MUSCARELLA, PATRICIA ANN

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

JENKINS, JOY ROXANN

Tarpon Springs, FL 34689

Defendant

21ST CENTURY CENTENNIAL INSURANCE COMPANY

C/O Department Of Financial Services 200 E Gaines Street

Tallahassee, FL 32314

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

EDUARDO R LATOUR, ESQ

Attorney at LATOUR & ASSOCIATES P A

135 E Lemon St

Tarpon Springs, FL 34689

Defendant Attorneys

CAROLYNE MOOMAW, ESQ

Attorney at LAW OFFICES OF SANABRIA & MARSH

258829

Oklahoma City, OK 73125-8829

PAYONG V PUKSAHOME, ESQ

Attorney at LAW OFFICES OF SANABRIA & MARSH

258829

Oklahoma, OK 73125-8829

 

Court Documents

NOTICE

04/27/2021: NOTICE

NOTICE OF DISCLOSURE

04/12/2021: NOTICE OF DISCLOSURE

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

04/09/2021: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

04/09/2021: REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

ANSWER, AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES, DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

04/01/2021: ANSWER, AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES, DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

SUMMONS - SERVED

03/15/2021: SUMMONS - SERVED

NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION

04/12/2021: NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION

SUMMONS - ISSUED

02/22/2021: SUMMONS - ISSUED

EXHIBIT

02/22/2021: EXHIBIT

COMPLAINT

02/22/2021: COMPLAINT

CIVIL COVER SHEET - E-FILED

02/22/2021: CIVIL COVER SHEET - E-FILED

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/27/2021
  • DocketNOTICE; Doc # 11; OF CHANGE OF COUNSEL OF RECORD/FIRM NAME AND ADDRESS CHANGE/DESIGNATION OF PRIMARY E-MAIL ADDRESS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION; Doc # 7; (REMOTE)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF DISCLOSURE; Doc # 10

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2021
  • DocketREQUEST FOR PRODUCTION; Doc # 8

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES; Doc # 9; W/ATTACHMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2021
  • DocketANSWER, AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES, DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL; Doc # 6; Party: 21ST CENTURY CENTENNIAL INSURANCE COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2021
  • DocketSUMMONS - SERVED; Doc # 5; 03/21/2021; Party: 21ST CENTURY CENTENNIAL INSURANCE COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2021
  • FinancialPLAINTIFF; JENKINS, JOY ROXANN; Total Financial Assessment; 410.00; Total Payments and Credits; 410.00; Balance Due 0.00; E-FILE PAYMENT; Receipt # EF-2021-07134; JENKINS, JOY ROXANN; (410.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2021
  • FinancialPLAINTIFF; JENKINS, JOY ROXANN; Total Financial Assessment; 410.00; Total Payments and Credits; 410.00; Balance Due 0.00; Transaction Assessment; 410.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2021
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET - E-FILED; Doc # 1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2021
  • DocketCOMPLAINT; Doc # 2

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2021
  • DocketEXHIBIT; Doc # 3; A - INSURANCE POLICY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2021
  • DocketSUMMONS - ISSUED; Doc # 4; Party: 21ST CENTURY CENTENNIAL INSURANCE COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where 21st Century Centennial Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer EDUARDO R LATOUR, ESQ